HAWKINS v. SAUL
Plaintiff: NICOLE HAWKINS
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL and ANDREW M. SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv01253
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Referring Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Filing 8 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #7 Affidavit of Service . (CLAUSON, VAUGHN)
January 27, 2020 Answer updated for ANDREW M. SAUL to 3/6/2020. (Sheets, Jamie)
January 27, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to ANDREW M. SAUL served on 1/6/2020, answer due 2/12/2020. (CLAUSON, VAUGHN) Modified on 1/27/2020 to edit service date. (Sheets, Jamie).
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to ANDREW M. SAUL, SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: #1 Summons USA, #2 Summons USAG)(Butler, Carol) (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/30/2019) (Butler, Carol).
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs is GRANTED, and Plaintiff is hereby permitted to proceed in this action in forma pauperis, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). Plaintiff is responsible for preparing and serving the Complaint and Summons upon the Defendant. Signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 12/27/2019. (Butler, Carol)
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Butler, Carol)
December 23, 2019 Motions Referred to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE RE: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Garland, Leah)
December 23, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Garland, Leah)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney VAUGHN S. CLAUSON on behalf of Plaintiff Nicole Hawkins (CLAUSON, VAUGHN)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Nicole Hawkins. (CLAUSON, VAUGHN)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL, filed by Nicole Hawkins.(CLAUSON, VAUGHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAWKINS v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICOLE HAWKINS
Represented By: VAUGHN S. CLAUSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?