MINGO et al v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) et al
Plaintiff: Jace Hyman, Jaden Hyman, W. DANIEL GRIST, AMANDA MINGO and YASMEEN MURRAY-HYMAN
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, ANDRE CHAMBERS, NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK), NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION, NORTH CAROLINA RAILROAD COMPANY and CITY OF DURHAM
Case Number: 1:2020cv00226
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ANDREW B. SPRADLIN on behalf of Defendants ANDRE CHAMBERS, NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (SPRADLIN, ANDREW)
April 22, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MEGAN E. COOK on behalf of Defendant CITY OF DURHAM (COOK, MEGAN)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Appointing RENE STEMPLE TREHY as the Mediator pursuant to LR 83.9d(a). Signed by John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court.
April 20, 2020 MEDIATION SCHEDULING ORDER ; Mediation due by 2/26/2021. (Gammon, Cheryl)
April 20, 2020 Set Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings: Responses to Dispositive Motions due by 4/28/2021. Replies to Dispositive Motions due by 5/14/2021. (Garland, Leah)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 4/20/20 approving #19 RULE 26F (JOINT) without modification. Discovery shall be established as Exceptional. mediation shall be conducted at the close of discovery, the exact date to be set by the mediator after consultation with the parties. By consent the parties agree that the mediator shall be Rene Trehy. The parties do not consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction at this time. Trial of this action is expected to take approximately two weeks. A jury trial has been demanded. Plaintiff's Amended Pleadings due by 5/15/2020. Defendant's Amended Pleadings due by 6/15/2020. Discovery due by 2/26/2021. Joinder of Parties for Plaintiff due by 5/15/2020. Joinder of Parties for Defendant due by 6/15/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/28/2021. (Garland, Leah)
April 20, 2020 Motions Referred: RE: #19 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (Garrett, Kim)
April 17, 2020 Filing 19 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by ANDRE CHAMBERS, NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY.(STEWART, WILLIAM)
April 15, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 5/20/2020 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim)
April 13, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, with Jury Demand (Second Amended Complaint) by CITY OF DURHAM. (ISENBERG, NATALIA)
March 30, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WILLIAM D. ACTON, JR on behalf of Plaintiffs W. DANIEL GRIST, AMANDA MINGO, YASMEEN MURRAY-HYMAN (ACTON, WILLIAM)
March 27, 2020 Filing 15 ***FILED IN ERROR***NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WILLIAM D. ACTON, JR on behalf of Plaintiffs W. DANIEL GRIST, AMANDA MINGO, YASMEEN MURRAY-HYMAN (ACTON, WILLIAM) Modified on 3/30/2020 to mark as Filed in Error and to remove document from public view. Attorney instructed to properly re-file. (Garland, Leah)
March 26, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant CITY OF DURHAM (ISENBERG, NATALIA)
March 26, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney NATALIA K. ISENBERG on behalf of Defendant CITY OF DURHAM (ISENBERG, NATALIA)
March 25, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) NORTH CAROLINA RAILROAD COMPANY, filed by Plaintiffs W. DANIEL GRIST, AMANDA MINGO, YASMEEN MURRAY-HYMAN (DEVORE, FRED)
March 17, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORPORATION for NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY.. (STEWART, WILLIAM)
March 17, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION. (STEWART, WILLIAM)
March 17, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, with Jury Demand by ANDRE CHAMBERS, NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (STEWART, WILLIAM)
March 15, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Second Amended Complaint for NORTH CAROLINA RAILROAD COMPANY. Answer due by 4/7/2020. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 3/15/2020. (Brubaker, John)
March 13, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NORTH CAROLINA RAILROAD COMPANY. (DILLON, MARY)
March 13, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, by NORTH CAROLINA RAILROAD COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DILLON, MARY)
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 ECF 30 Day Notice as to Attorney WILLIAM D. ACTON, JR. ECF 30 Day Notice due by 4/13/2020. (Sheets, Jamie)
March 12, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Sheets, Jamie)
March 12, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ANDRE CHAMBERS, NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Original filed in Durham County Superior Court, Case number 19-CVS-1982, issued 1/27/2020, and listed as Exhibit C to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by YASMEEN MURRAY-HYMAN, AMANDA MINGO, W. DANIEL GRIST. (Original filed in Durham County Superior Court, Case number 19-CVS-1982, and is listed as Exhibit C to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against AMANDA MINGO, W. DANIEL GRIST, YASMEEN MURRAY-HYMAN (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2769289), filed by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK), ANDRE CHAMBERS, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C-Second Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit D-Affidavit of William H. Herrmann, #5 Exhibit E-State Court Notice of Removal)(STEWART, WILLIAM) Modified on 3/12/2020 to replace documents with redacted versions. (Sheets, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MINGO et al v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: WILLIAM WOODLEY STEWART, JR.
Represented By: ANDREW B. SPRADLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDRE CHAMBERS
Represented By: WILLIAM WOODLEY STEWART, JR.
Represented By: ANDREW B. SPRADLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Represented By: WILLIAM WOODLEY STEWART, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Represented By: WILLIAM WOODLEY STEWART, JR.
Represented By: ANDREW B. SPRADLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH CAROLINA RAILROAD COMPANY
Represented By: MARY MARGARET DILLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF DURHAM
Represented By: NATALIA K. ISENBERG
Represented By: MEGAN E. COOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jace Hyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaden Hyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W. DANIEL GRIST
Represented By: FRED WILLIAM DEVORE, III
Represented By: WILLIAM D. ACTON, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMANDA MINGO
Represented By: FRED WILLIAM DEVORE, III
Represented By: WILLIAM D. ACTON, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YASMEEN MURRAY-HYMAN
Represented By: FRED WILLIAM DEVORE, III
Represented By: WILLIAM D. ACTON, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?