PRESNELL v. SNAP-ON SECURECORP., INC.
Plaintiff: James Presnell
Defendant: Snap-on Securecorp., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00234
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Filing 13 Corrected document re #12 Response in Opposition to Motion. (SHERIFF, TIMOTHY)
April 28, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by SNAP-ON SECURECORP., INC. filed by JAMES PRESNELL. Replies due by 5/12/2020 (SHERIFF, TIMOTHY)
March 26, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MARY GRACE MILLER on behalf of Defendant SNAP-ON SECURECORP., INC. (MILLER, MARY GRACE)
March 26, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CHARLES K. SEYFARTH on behalf of Defendant SNAP-ON SECURECORP., INC. (SEYFARTH, CHARLES)
March 25, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE by JAMES PRESNELL. (SHERIFF, TIMOTHY) Modified docket text on 3/26/2020 to match document filed. (Daniel, J)
March 18, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant SNAP-ON SECURECORP., INC. re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by SNAP-ON SECURECORP., INC.. (SAMUEL-PRIESTLEY, ARETINA)
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by SNAP-ON SECURECORP., INC.. Response to Motion due by 4/8/2020 (SAMUEL-PRIESTLEY, ARETINA)
March 13, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie)
March 13, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to SNAP-ON SECURECORP., INC. (Original document filed in Guilford County Superior Court, Case Number 20-CVS-2948, issued 1/31/2020 and listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie)
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against SNAP-ON SECURECORP., INC., filed by JAMES PRESNELL. (Original document filed in Guilford County Superior Court, Case Number 20-CVS-2948 and listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #1 Petition for Removal Exhibit B - State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal. (SAMUEL-PRIESTLEY, ARETINA)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SNAP-ON SECURECORP., INC. (SAMUEL-PRIESTLEY, ARETINA)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against JAMES PRESNELL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2771057), filed by SNAP-ON SECURECORP., INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons & Complaint) (SAMUEL-PRIESTLEY, ARETINA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRESNELL v. SNAP-ON SECURECORP., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Presnell
Represented By: TIMOTHY A. SHERIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snap-on Securecorp., Inc.
Represented By: ARETINA K. SAMUEL-PRIESTLEY
Represented By: MARY GRACE MILLER
Represented By: CHARLES K. SEYFARTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?