ESTATE OF DORLA EVANS BOYLES et al v. GREE USA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF DORLA EVANS BOYLES and PATRICK BOYLES
Defendant: MJC AMERICA, LTD, GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES, INC. OF ZHUHAI, GREE USA, INC. and HONG KONG GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCE SALES, LTD
Case Number: 1:2020cv00276
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Filing 15 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT signed by John S. Brubaker, Clerk on 5/11/2020, pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, default is hereby entered against Defendant Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, Ltd. (Garland, Leah)
May 11, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT signed by John S. Brubaker, Clerk on 5/11/2020, pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, default is hereby entered against Defendant Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai. (Garland, Leah)
May 11, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT signed by John S. Brubaker, Clerk on 5/11/2020, pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, default is hereby entered against Defendant Gree USA, Inc. (Garland, Leah)
May 9, 2020 Filing 12 BRIEF re #10 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Gree Electric, #11 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Gree Hong Kong, #9 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Gree USA by Plaintiffs PATRICK BOYLES, ESTATE OF DORLA EVANS BOYLES filed by PATRICK BOYLES, ESTATE OF DORLA EVANS BOYLES. (FITZGERALD, ANDREW)
May 9, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Gree Hong Kong by PATRICK BOYLES, ESTATE OF DORLA EVANS BOYLES. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Andrew Fitzgerald, #2 Unpublished case)(FITZGERALD, ANDREW)
May 9, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Gree Electric by PATRICK BOYLES, ESTATE OF DORLA EVANS BOYLES. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Andrew Fitzgerald, #2 Unpublished case)(FITZGERALD, ANDREW)
May 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Gree USA by PATRICK BOYLES, ESTATE OF DORLA EVANS BOYLES. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Andrew Fitzgerald, #2 Unpublished case)(FITZGERALD, ANDREW)
April 14, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to HONG KONG GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCE SALES, LTD served on 4/13/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (FITZGERALD, ANDREW)
April 14, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES, INC. OF ZHUHAI served on 4/13/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (FITZGERALD, ANDREW)
April 14, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to GREE USA, INC. served on 4/13/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (FITZGERALD, ANDREW)
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Reissued as to GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES, INC. OF ZHUHAI. (Sheets, Jamie)
March 27, 2020 Case Assigned to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Sheets, Jamie)
March 27, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to GREE USA, INC., MJC AMERICA, LTD., GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES, INC. OF ZHUHAI, HONG KONG GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCE SALES, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Summons - MJC America, Ltd., #2 Summons - Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai, #3 Summons - Homg Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, Ltd.) (Sheets, Jamie)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2779360), filed by ESTATE OF DORLA EVANS BOYLES, PATRICK BOYLES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (FITZGERALD, ANDREW) Modified on 3/27/2020 to add payment information (Sheets, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ESTATE OF DORLA EVANS BOYLES et al v. GREE USA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF DORLA EVANS BOYLES
Represented By: ANDREW L. FITZGERALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK BOYLES
Represented By: ANDREW L. FITZGERALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJC AMERICA, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES, INC. OF ZHUHAI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREE USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONG KONG GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCE SALES, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?