BENITEZ BAUTISTA et al v. CUCCINELLI
Plaintiff: JESSICA MARIBEL RAMIREZ ANGELES, OFELIA DIAZ HERNANDEZ, A.R. B.M., MARTHA GRACIANO QUITERIO, ANA DUARTE GARCIA, LORENA LIMA, CRISTIAN CORTES CARMONA, ELSA GUADALUPE MEDINA, MARIA ESTHER FLORES GONZALEZ, ANA ELENA BENITEZ BAUTISTA, BRENDA MELISSA GUTIERREZ RODRIGUEZ, MARIA LUISA HERNANDEZ VALENCIA, ZAIDA ARELY PONCE CRUZ, ROSA MIRIAN LOPEZ, FLOR AMISADAY ALVAREZ PEDROZA, MARIA DEL CONSUELO PACHECO PRIETO, AIDA FLORES LORENZO, RAUL WILFREDO RIVERA OLIVA, ARGELIA BAUTISTA HERNANDEZ, IRIS SOBEYDA CASTRO FLORES, MARIA DALIA PARRA ANAYA, ALICIA LOPEZ VENTURA, CELERINA VALDEZ BAZA, ANAYELI DE PAZ OLASCOAGA, ESTELA FRANCISCO HERNANDEZ, REMBERTA MALDONADO SANCHEZ, REBECA TOLENTINO JUAREZ, KARINA URIAS MENDOZA, MARIA DEL CARMEN AGUILERA AGUIRRE, CECILIA DOMINGUEZ LOPEZ, CONSUELO HERNANDEZ ROSALES, MARICELA MORALES LUGO, YENI SANDOVAL SANTILLAN, NAYELI ORTIZ CRUZ, FATIMA REBECA RUIZ, DELFINA OCAMPO PERALTA, B.R. T.C., GUADALUPE MEZA CONTRERA, MAURINO GARCIA PARADA, ESVEYDI VALENZUELA URIAS, MARIA NORMA GOMEZ MADARIAGA, K.Y.S.G., JESUS ROSAS CANDELARIA, RODOLFO TELLEZ MORALES, TERESA DEL TRANSITO CALLE DE ROSALES, JOSE MORALES AGUILERA, A.M.B.B., MARIA ISABEL ACOSTA JAIMES, KELLI YURIDIA SANTIAGO GOMEZ, MARIA BERTHA ALONSO VELAZQUEZ, KEVIN FLORES, JOSE ALBERTO BRACHO VIVAS, J.M.O., EMELY ELIZABETH ROSALES CALLES, RODOLFO SERRANO ACOSTA, MAGDALENA MALDONADO SANCHEZ, DAMARIS PALMA CARIAS, JOSE OVIDIO ROSALES LOPEZ, A.S.G., ISABEL CRISTINA MENDOZA DE BRACHO, SHARON NICHOL MARTINEZ PALMA, ZOYLA FLOR SANTIAGO GOMEZ, J.V.C., SUSANA PATRICIA CABRERA RAMIREZ, J.E.G.D., TERESA AGUSTIN SALGADO, SALVADOR CRUZ ARMENTA, ISRAEL ADONAY ROSALES CALLES, J.A.C.C., JADE DAGALA MOJADO, HERIBERTO LOPEZ BARRIENTOS, JOSE LOPEZ ORTIZ, KATERINA FLORES, ADRIAN BECERRA SORIANO, GUADALUPE ANGEL MARTINEZ, LUIS MORALES MENDIETA, KENNEDI SERRANO ACOSTA, JOSEFINA POLANCO DE RIVERA, BLANCA CASTILLO SANTIAGO, JOAQUIN MENDOZA ORTIZ and D.G.F.O
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI and KENNETH CUCCINELLI
Case Number: 1:2020cv00339
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant KENNETH CUCCINELLI, filed by BRENDA MELISSA GUTIERREZ RODRIGUEZ, MAURINO GARCIA PARADA, YENI SANDOVAL SANTILLAN, OFELIA DIAZ HERNANDEZ, LORENA LIMA, MARIA LUISA HERNANDEZ VALENCIA, MARICELA MORALES LUGO, ALICIA LOPEZ VENTURA, DELFINA OCAMPO PERALTA, MARIA DEL CARMEN AGUILERA AGUIRRE, GUADALUPE MEZA CONTRERA, NAYELI ORTIZ CRUZ, CELERINA VALDEZ BAZA, FATIMA REBECA RUIZ, JESSICA MARIBEL RAMIREZ ANGELES, FLOR AMISADAY ALVAREZ PEDROZA, BLANCA CASTILLO SANTIAGO, MARIA DALIA PARRA ANAYA, ANA DUARTE GARCIA, ISABEL CRISTINA MENDOZA DE BRACHO, CECILIA DOMINGUEZ LOPEZ, MARIA ESTHER FLORES GONZALEZ, MARIA DEL CONSUELO PACHECO PRIETO, ANA ELENA BENITEZ BAUTISTA, ESTELA FRANCISCO HERNANDEZ, IRIS SOBEYDA CASTRO FLORES, CONSUELO HERNANDEZ ROSALES, RAUL WILFREDO RIVERA OLIVA, ELSA GUADALUPE MEDINA, ANAYELI DE PAZ OLASCOAGA, ZAIDA ARELY PONCE CRUZ, REBECA TOLENTINO JUAREZ, MARTHA GRACIANO QUITERIO, ROSA MIRIAN LOPEZ, ARGELIA BAUTISTA HERNANDEZ, REMBERTA MALDONADO SANCHEZ, KARINA URIAS MENDOZA, CRISTIAN CORTES CARMONA, AIDA FLORES LORENZO, ZOYLA FLOR SANTIAGO GOMEZ, ISABEL CRISTINA MENDOZA DE BRACHO, K.Y.S.G., J.M.O., MARIA NORMA GOMEZ MADARIAGA, JOSE ALBERTO BRACHO VIVAS, J.A.C.C., MARIA BERTHA ALONSO VELAZQUEZ, RODOLFO SERRANO ACOSTA, A.M.B.B., JOSE OVIDIO ROSALES LOPEZ, KENNEDI SERRANO ACOSTA, D.G.F.O, A.S.G., ISRAEL ADONAY ROSALES CALLES, KEVIN FLORES, HERIBERTO LOPEZ BARRIENTOS, J.V.C., JADE DAGALA MOJADO, ADRIAN BECERRA SORIANO, MARIA ISABEL ACOSTA JAIMES, JOSE MORALES AGUILERA, JESUS ROSAS CANDELARIA, BLANCA CASTILLO SANTIAGO, SALVADOR CRUZ ARMENTA, LUIS MORALES MENDIETA, SUSANA PATRICIA CABRERA RAMIREZ, TERESA DEL TRANSITO CALLE DE ROSALES, DAMARIS PALMA CARIAS, RODOLFO TELLEZ MORALES, SHARON NICHOL MARTINEZ PALMA, KELLI YURIDIA SANTIAGO GOMEZ, EMELY ELIZABETH ROSALES CALLES, J.E.G.D., JOSE LOPEZ ORTIZ, KATERINA FLORES, MAGDALENA MALDONADO SANCHEZ, JOSEFINA POLANCO DE RIVERA, ESVEYDI VALENZUELA URIAS, TERESA AGUSTIN SALGADO, JOAQUIN MENDOZA ORTIZ, GUADALUPE ANGEL MARTINEZ.(BANIAS, BRADLEY)
May 5, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BRENDA MELISSA GUTIERREZ RODRIGUEZ, FLOR AMISADAY ALVAREZ PEDROZA, BLANCA CASTILLO SANTIAGO, MARIA DALIA PARRA ANAYA, MAURINO GARCIA PARADA, YENI SANDOVAL SANTILLAN, OFELIA DIAZ HERNANDEZ, ANA DUARTE GARCIA, LORENA LIMA, MARIA LUISA HERNANDEZ VALENCIA, MARICELA MORALES LUGO, ISABEL CRISTINA MENDOZA DE BRACHO, CECILIA DOMINGUEZ LOPEZ, MARIA ESTHER FLORES GONZALEZ, ALICIA LOPEZ VENTURA, MARIA DEL CONSUELO PACHECO PRIETO, ANA ELENA BENITEZ BAUTISTA, DELFINA OCAMPO PERALTA, IRIS SOBEYDA CASTRO FLORES, ESTELA FRANCISCO HERNANDEZ, MARIA DEL CARMEN AGUILERA AGUIRRE, CONSUELO HERNANDEZ ROSALES, RAUL WILFREDO RIVERA OLIVA, GUADALUPE MEZA CONTRERA, ELSA GUADALUPE MEDINA, NAYELI ORTIZ CRUZ, ANAYELI DE PAZ OLASCOAGA, CELERINA VALDEZ BAZA, ZAIDA ARELY PONCE CRUZ, FATIMA REBECA RUIZ, REBECA TOLENTINO JUAREZ, MARTHA GRACIANO QUITERIO, ROSA MIRIAN LOPEZ, ARGELIA BAUTISTA HERNANDEZ, REMBERTA MALDONADO SANCHEZ, JESSICA MARIBEL RAMIREZ ANGELES, CRISTIAN CORTES CARMONA, KARINA URIAS MENDOZA, AIDA FLORES LORENZO. KENNETH CUCCINELLI served on 4/23/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. on Summons as to US Attorney's Office (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service)(BANIAS, BRADLEY) (Main Document 7 replaced on 5/6/2020) (Hicks, Samantha).
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ANNA M. CUSHMAN on behalf of Plaintiffs MARIA DEL CARMEN AGUILERA AGUIRRE, FLOR AMISADAY ALVAREZ PEDROZA, ARGELIA BAUTISTA HERNANDEZ, ANA ELENA BENITEZ BAUTISTA, IRIS SOBEYDA CASTRO FLORES, CRISTIAN CORTES CARMONA, OFELIA DIAZ HERNANDEZ, CECILIA DOMINGUEZ LOPEZ, ANA DUARTE GARCIA, MARIA ESTHER FLORES GONZALEZ, AIDA FLORES LORENZO, ESTELA FRANCISCO HERNANDEZ, MAURINO GARCIA PARADA, MARTHA GRACIANO QUITERIO, ELSA GUADALUPE MEDINA, BRENDA MELISSA GUTIERREZ RODRIGUEZ, CONSUELO HERNANDEZ ROSALES, MARIA LUISA HERNANDEZ VALENCIA, LORENA LIMA, ALICIA LOPEZ VENTURA, REMBERTA MALDONADO SANCHEZ, ISABEL CHRISTINA MENDOZA DE BRACHO, GUADALUPE MEZA CONTRERA, ROSA MIRIAN LOPEZ, MARICELA MORALES LUGO, DELFINA OCAMPO PERALTA, ANAYELI DE PAZ OLASCOAGA, NAYELI ORTIZ CRUZ, MARIA DEL CONSUELO PACHECO PRIETO, MARIA DALIA PARRA ANAYA, ZAIDA ARELY PONCE CRUZ, JESSICA MARIBEL RAMIREZ ANGELES, FATIMA REBECA RUIZ, RAUL WILFREDO RIVERA OLIVA, YENI SANDOVAL SANTILLAN, BLANCA CASTILLO SANITAGO, REBECA TOLENTINO JUAREZ, KARINA URIAS MENDOZA, CELERINA VALDEZ BAZA (CUSHMAN, ANNA)
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
April 17, 2020 Filing 4 *FILED IN ERROR* NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ANNA M. CUSHMAN on behalf of Plaintiffs MARIA DEL CARMEN AGUILERA AGUIRRE, FLOR AMISADAY ALVAREZ PEDROZA, ARGELIA BAUTISTA HERNANDEZ, ANA ELENA BENITEZ BAUTISTA, IRIS SOBEYDA CASTRO FLORES, CRISTIAN CORTES CARMONA, OFELIA DIAZ HERNANDEZ, CECILIA DOMINGUEZ LOPEZ, ANA DUARTE GARCIA, MARIA ESTHER FLORES GONZALEZ, AIDA FLORES LORENZO, ESTELA FRANCISCO HERNANDEZ, MAURINO GARCIA PARADA, MARTHA GRACIANO QUITERIO, ELSA GUADALUPE MEDINA, BRENDA MELISSA GUTIERREZ RODRIGUEZ, CONSUELO HERNANDEZ ROSALES, MARIA LUISA HERNANDEZ VALENCIA, LORENA LIMA, ALICIA LOPEZ VENTURA, REMBERTA MALDONADO SANCHEZ, ISABEL CHRISTINA MENDOZA DE BRACHO, GUADALUPE MEZA CONTRERA, ROSA MIRIAN LOPEZ, MARICELA MORALES LUGO, DELFINA OCAMPO PERALTA, ANAYELI DE PAZ OLASCOAGA, NAYELI ORTIZ CRUZ, MARIA DEL CONSUELO PACHECO PRIETO, MARIA DALIA PARRA ANAYA, ZAIDA ARELY PONCE CRUZ, JESSICA MARIBEL RAMIREZ ANGELES, FATIMA REBECA RUIZ, RAUL WILFREDO RIVERA OLIVA, YENI SANDOVAL SANTILLAN, BLANCA CASTILLO SANITAGO, REBECA TOLENTINO JUAREZ, KARINA URIAS MENDOZA, CELERINA VALDEZ BAZA (CUSHMAN, ANNA) Modified on 4/17/2020 - Attorney to file corrected notice. (Hicks, Samantha)
April 17, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie)
April 17, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
April 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to KENNETH CUCCINELLI, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons - US Attorney, #2 Summons - US Attorney General) (Sheets, Jamie)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2789448.), filed by ZAIDA ARELY PONCE CRUZ, DELFINA OCAMPO PERALTA, ELSA GUADALUPE MEDINA, NAYELI ORTIZ CRUZ, ANA DUARTE GARCIA, YENI SANDOVAL SANTILLAN, IRIS SOBEYDA CASTRO FLORES, A.R. B.M., ESTELA FRANCISCO HERNANDEZ, LORENA LIMA, REMBERTA MALDONADO SANCHEZ, CONSUELO HERNANDEZ ROSALES, MARTHA GRACIANO QUITERIO, B.R. T.C., RAUL WILFREDO RIVERA OLIVA, CELERINA VALDEZ BAZA, MAURINO GARCIA PARADA, MARIA ESTHER FLORES GONZALEZ, BRENDA MELISSA GUTIERREZ RODRIGUEZ, ANA ELENA BENITEZ BAUTISTA, ANAYELI DE PAZ OLASCOAGA, AIDA FLORES LORENZO, MARICELA MORALES LUGO, ROSA MIRIAN LOPEZ, JESSICA MARIBEL RAMIREZ ANGELES, GUADALUPE MEZA CONTRERA, MARIA DALIA PARRA ANAYA, REBECA TOLENTINO JUAREZ, ALICIA LOPEZ VENTURA, CRISTIAN CORTES CARMONA, MARIA DEL CONSUELO PACHECO PRIETO, MARIA DEL CARMEN AGUILERA AGUIRRE, CECILIA DOMINGUEZ LOPEZ, MARIA LUISA HERNANDEZ VALENCIA, KARINA URIAS MENDOZA, FATIMA REBECA RUIZ, ARGELIA BAUTISTA HERNANDEZ, OFELIA DIAZ HERNANDEZ, FLOR AMISADAY ALVAREZ PEDROZA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Co-Counsel Notice of Appearance, #3 Exhibit Proposed Summons, #4 Exhibit Proposed Summons, #5 Exhibit Proposed Summons)(BANIAS, BRADLEY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BENITEZ BAUTISTA et al v. CUCCINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSICA MARIBEL RAMIREZ ANGELES
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OFELIA DIAZ HERNANDEZ
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.R. B.M.
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTHA GRACIANO QUITERIO
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANA DUARTE GARCIA
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORENA LIMA
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRISTIAN CORTES CARMONA
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELSA GUADALUPE MEDINA
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA ESTHER FLORES GONZALEZ
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANA ELENA BENITEZ BAUTISTA
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA MELISSA GUTIERREZ RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA LUISA HERNANDEZ VALENCIA
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZAIDA ARELY PONCE CRUZ
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSA MIRIAN LOPEZ
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLOR AMISADAY ALVAREZ PEDROZA
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA DEL CONSUELO PACHECO PRIETO
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIDA FLORES LORENZO
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAUL WILFREDO RIVERA OLIVA
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARGELIA BAUTISTA HERNANDEZ
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRIS SOBEYDA CASTRO FLORES
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA DALIA PARRA ANAYA
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALICIA LOPEZ VENTURA
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CELERINA VALDEZ BAZA
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANAYELI DE PAZ OLASCOAGA
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTELA FRANCISCO HERNANDEZ
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REMBERTA MALDONADO SANCHEZ
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBECA TOLENTINO JUAREZ
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARINA URIAS MENDOZA
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA DEL CARMEN AGUILERA AGUIRRE
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CECILIA DOMINGUEZ LOPEZ
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONSUELO HERNANDEZ ROSALES
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARICELA MORALES LUGO
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YENI SANDOVAL SANTILLAN
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAYELI ORTIZ CRUZ
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FATIMA REBECA RUIZ
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DELFINA OCAMPO PERALTA
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.R. T.C.
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GUADALUPE MEZA CONTRERA
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAURINO GARCIA PARADA
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESVEYDI VALENZUELA URIAS
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA NORMA GOMEZ MADARIAGA
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.Y.S.G.
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESUS ROSAS CANDELARIA
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODOLFO TELLEZ MORALES
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERESA DEL TRANSITO CALLE DE ROSALES
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE MORALES AGUILERA
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.M.B.B.
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA ISABEL ACOSTA JAIMES
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELLI YURIDIA SANTIAGO GOMEZ
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA BERTHA ALONSO VELAZQUEZ
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN FLORES
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE ALBERTO BRACHO VIVAS
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.M.O.
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMELY ELIZABETH ROSALES CALLES
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODOLFO SERRANO ACOSTA
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAGDALENA MALDONADO SANCHEZ
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAMARIS PALMA CARIAS
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE OVIDIO ROSALES LOPEZ
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.S.G.
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISABEL CRISTINA MENDOZA DE BRACHO
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON NICHOL MARTINEZ PALMA
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZOYLA FLOR SANTIAGO GOMEZ
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.V.C.
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSANA PATRICIA CABRERA RAMIREZ
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.E.G.D.
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERESA AGUSTIN SALGADO
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SALVADOR CRUZ ARMENTA
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISRAEL ADONAY ROSALES CALLES
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.A.C.C.
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JADE DAGALA MOJADO
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HERIBERTO LOPEZ BARRIENTOS
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE LOPEZ ORTIZ
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATERINA FLORES
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADRIAN BECERRA SORIANO
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GUADALUPE ANGEL MARTINEZ
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS MORALES MENDIETA
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNEDI SERRANO ACOSTA
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEFINA POLANCO DE RIVERA
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLANCA CASTILLO SANTIAGO
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: ANNA M. CUSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOAQUIN MENDOZA ORTIZ
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.G.F.O
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH CUCCINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?