RICHARDS et al v. TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ADRIENNE RICHARDS, KHALIAH GLANTON, ASHLEY IFILL, SHAKIA HAYDEN, JONATHAN JOHNSON, SHAMIKA LEDBETTER, COLEMAN FRAZIER, NICOLE MULL, LEQUITA MARSHALL MCKINNON, EBONY GOODE, DAWN REDDICK-UMOJA, ROBERT KNUCKLES, MARCINA NORMAN, ANNIE LEE GILCHRIST, RHONDA MILLER, DOMINIC FUMBANKS, OSCAR WILLOUGHBY, JR., ANTONIO GREEN, ANGELA CLINTON, JERRY SCOTT, LOUVENIA GRAVES, EVELIS MASON, KELVIN SMITH, ANNIE BAILEY, ANTHONY JORDAN, SHONDA PULLIAM, JAMES ROBERSON, EUGENA ROBINSON, JENNIFER HILL, NAUTICA PEAY, NANCY PERSON, JOCELYN SPIKES, SONEJA MORGAN, AMANDA HALL, COLLIS SCOTT, LOUIS TERRELL, PAMELA FARRINGTON, MARELYS MORA, BRITTNEY COOKE, ROSALIND DANIELS, FRANKLIN PHILLIPS, LARRY LIVINGSTON, JOSHUA NOEL, PERCIVAL THOMAS, JAYTONIUS MATTHEWSON, CANDACE INGLE, ROBIN STONE EDWARDS, DAVID SEALEY, TIFFANY GERRES, GRACE WOODARD, TIANA HART, AIMEE ANDERSON, JANICE GREEN, T'KEYAH WILLIAMS, EVELYN LAWRENCE, SHANON BLUE, DEBORA JACKSON, BRANDON PASS, TONI POSTON, BRIANNA HESTER, RONALD WILLIAMS, TALAYA ROGERS JONES, DERRICK HATCHER, JONATHAN WINDHAM, TASHIKA JOHNSON GRAHAM, LARRY HARRIS, ERIC SANDERS, KEOLIKA LITTLE, MARJORIE FERGUSON, PORCHA PRATT, JASMINE PERKINS, ANTHONY KIRKPATRICK, MICHAEL WHITE, CALVIN GRAHAM, ANTHONY PRICE, JR., ARTHUR HILL, JR., SHEILA MUNGO, ERNEST GUERRIER, TOMMY WHITENER, CARLA WRIGHT, ALDRIDGE REED, KENYADA HARDY, ERNEST GREEN, JR., JOY REYES DIAZ, KEVIN WHITE, BRITTANY SMITH, HERCULES STEPHEN, SAMANTHA MULLINS, DARRELL LEGRAND, DIANNA ELLIS, PORSILYNE PERSON, LLOYD ROME, TIMESHIA HARVEY, SHALELIA ANDREA BRASWELL, DARLIENE NICHOLSON, KEITH ROYSTER, PAUL BENTON, EMMA RICHARDSON, ASHLEY SHELTON, CORLETHA HOLLEY, SHEMEIKA GOODEN, PATRICE SUMMERS, DANIEL STANDBACK, MELVITA SCOTT, DAVID REID, JAMES GRAY, SANDRA BROWN, JIHAD HASAN, SHAKEYIA EDDINGTON, BELINDA SMITH, CECILIA DOWNEY, RODNEY BAILEY, ANTOINETTE FLOWERS, CHRISTINE ARCHIE, MONTINA HAIRSTON, EDDIE TANNER, ROBERTA WATLINGTON, BARRY MULLINS, SHIRRELL BALDWIN, ROBERT KELLY, EDSEL NORWOOD, LATOYA LEACH, GREGORY JOSEPH, HENRY TUCKER, ASHLEY MCCLUNEY, SIERRA HUNT, ALEX CUNNINGHAM, ERIC WADE, ALICIA MALONE, LYNEE KIMBLE, MERESA REDMOND, SHARIA BROWN, NIQUISHA STROUD, BOBBY BELL, MARIA BROWN, MICHAEL CAMERON, DARRYL COULTER, MARLISHA THORPE, MICHAEL WOODARD, DELILA CHAPMAN, HARRIETT THOMPSON, LEVONNE DURHAM, DARREN MCDOUGLE, STACI FLORENCE, KRISTY CUTHBERTSON, ALBERTHA AUSTIN, QUENTEDA SHARPE, JACKIE BITTLE and JEROME SCOTT
Defendant: TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC. and TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00347
Filed: April 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 TEXT ORDER re #18 Joint Status Report. Based upon the representations made in the Joint Status Report, the parties shall have up to and including January 18, 2021, within which to gather additional identifying information and attempt to locate loan agreements for the two remaining Unidentified Plaintiffs, if any. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 11/10/2020. (Lee, Pedra)
November 9, 2020 Filing 18 JOINT STATUS REPORT filed by all parties.. (EVANS, JASON)
October 27, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICEAS TO CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS by Plaintiffs TIMESHIA HARVEY, NIQUISHA STROUD. (From Technical Failure Email Inbox) (Hicks, Samantha)
October 9, 2020 TEXT ORDER re #16 Status Report. The parties shall have an additional thirty (30) days from the date of this Order within which to gather additional identifying information and attempt to locate loan agreements for the Unidentified Plaintiffs, if any. The parties shall file a status report no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 10/9/2020. (Lee, Pedra)
October 9, 2020 Filing 16 JOINT STATUS REPORT. (Garland, Leah)
October 9, 2020 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Technical Difficulties by Attorney Jason D. Evans. (Garland, Leah)
July 20, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/3/2020. (Taylor, Abby)
July 20, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Joint motion to Stay. Based upon the representations of the parties, this matter is substantially similar to two other matters pending before this Court, Goines, et al. v. TitleMax of Virginia, et al. (No. 1:19-cv-00489-LCB-JLW) (Goines) and Nicholson et al. v. TitleMax of Virginia, et al. (No. 1:19-cv-00490-LCB-JLW) (Nicholson). In light of prior Orders in Goines and Nicholson, a scheduling order will not be entered in this matter at this time. Defendants in the instant matter agree to produce a copy of any loan agreements that can be identified for Plaintiffs in this matter within sixty (60) days hereof to Plaintiffs' counsel and to identify the names of any Plaintiffs for which a loan agreement is not located. As to any Plaintiff having an identifiable loan subject to arbitration, this action is hereby stayed pending resolution of arbitration in accordance with the parties' arbitration agreements. The parties shall file a status report within seventy-five (75) days of this Order informing the Court as to any Plaintiff which a loan agreement has not been located. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall file a joint status report of arbitration every ninety (90) days and notify the Court of any arbitration awards within seven (7) days after arbitration has concluded. Failure to file such reports may result in dismissal. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 7/20/2020.(Lee, Pedra)
July 17, 2020 Motions Referred: RE: #13 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (Garrett, Kim)
July 17, 2020 Filing 14 BRIEF re #13 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties in support of Joint Motion to Stay by Counter Claimants TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC., Defendants TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC. filed by TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC.. (EVANS, JASON)
July 17, 2020 Filing 13 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC.. (EVANS, JASON)
July 15, 2020 TEXT ORDER An initial pretrial conference hearing is scheduled in this matter on July 22, 2020. The Parties are ORDERED to submit their Joint Rule 26(f) Report, or Individual Rule 26(f) Reports no later than Friday, July 17, 2020 at Noon. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 7/15/20. (Garrett, Kim)
June 12, 2020 Reset Hearings: Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 7/22/2020 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim)
June 11, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion to Continue Initial Pretrial Conference. For good cause shown, the Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing shall be continued to July 22, 2020 at 9:30am in Durham, Courtroom Second Floor. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 6/11/2020.(Lee, Pedra)
June 11, 2020 Motion Referred: RE: #12 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Pretrial Conference, to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Blay, Debbie)
June 11, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Pretrial Conference by ADRIENNE RICHARDS. (BROWN, ANDREW)
June 9, 2020 TEXT ORDER issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 6/9/20. An initial pretrial conference hearing is scheduled in this matter on June 17, 2020. The Parties are ORDERED to submit their Joint Rule 26(f) Report, or Individual Rule 26(f) Reports no later than Friday, June 12, 2020 at Noon.(Garrett, Kim)
May 21, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. For good cause shown, Attorneys Christopher W. Jones, Samuel B. Hartzell, and Scott D. Anderson and the law firm Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP are TERMINATED as counsel for Defendants/Counter-Claimants TitleMax of Virginia, Inc., TitleMax of South Carolina, Inc., and TMX Finance of Virginia, Inc. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 5/21/2020.(Lee, Pedra)
May 20, 2020 Motion Referred: RE: #10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney SAMUEL B. HARTZELL , to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Blay, Debbie)
May 20, 2020 Filing 11 BRIEF re #10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney SAMUEL B. HARTZELL by Counter Claimants TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC., Defendants TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC. filed by TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC.. (HARTZELL, SAMUEL)
May 20, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney SAMUEL B. HARTZELL by on behalf of TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC.. Responses due by 6/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HARTZELL, SAMUEL)
May 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JACOB R. FRANCHEK on behalf of Counter Claimants TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC., Defendants TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC. (FRANCHEK, JACOB)
May 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 6/17/2020 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim)
May 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JASON D. EVANS on behalf of Counter Claimants TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC., Defendants TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC. (EVANS, JASON)
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint Reply to Counterclaim by all Plaintiffs by ADRIENNE RICHARDS. (BROWN, ANDREW)
May 11, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Complaint , Counterclaim against by TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC.. (HARTZELL, SAMUEL)
April 21, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Hicks, Samantha)
April 21, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Hicks, Samantha)
April 21, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Hicks, Samantha)
April 21, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Original document filed in Guilford County Superior Court on 4/9/2020 in Case Number 20CVS4498 and is listed as Exhibit B to the #1 Petition for Removal) (Hicks, Samantha)
April 21, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by ADRIENNE RICHARDS, et al. (Original document filed in Guilford County Superior Court, Case Number 20CVS4498 and is listed as Exhibit A to the #1 Petition for Removal) (Hicks, Samantha)
April 20, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2791072.)(Related Case # 1:19cv00489, 1:19cv00490), filed by TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC., TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(HARTZELL, SAMUEL) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/21/2020: #3 Exhibit B - State Summons) (Hicks, Samantha).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RICHARDS et al v. TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADRIENNE RICHARDS
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KHALIAH GLANTON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHLEY IFILL
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAKIA HAYDEN
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN JOHNSON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAMIKA LEDBETTER
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLEMAN FRAZIER
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICOLE MULL
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEQUITA MARSHALL MCKINNON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EBONY GOODE
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAWN REDDICK-UMOJA
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT KNUCKLES
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCINA NORMAN
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNIE LEE GILCHRIST
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RHONDA MILLER
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOMINIC FUMBANKS
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OSCAR WILLOUGHBY, JR.
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTONIO GREEN
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA CLINTON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERRY SCOTT
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOUVENIA GRAVES
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVELIS MASON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELVIN SMITH
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNIE BAILEY
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY JORDAN
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHONDA PULLIAM
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES ROBERSON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EUGENA ROBINSON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER HILL
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAUTICA PEAY
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCY PERSON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOCELYN SPIKES
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONEJA MORGAN
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMANDA HALL
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLLIS SCOTT
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOUIS TERRELL
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMELA FARRINGTON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARELYS MORA
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRITTNEY COOKE
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSALIND DANIELS
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANKLIN PHILLIPS
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY LIVINGSTON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA NOEL
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PERCIVAL THOMAS
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAYTONIUS MATTHEWSON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CANDACE INGLE
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBIN STONE EDWARDS
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID SEALEY
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIFFANY GERRES
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRACE WOODARD
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIANA HART
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIMEE ANDERSON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANICE GREEN
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T'KEYAH WILLIAMS
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVELYN LAWRENCE
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANON BLUE
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORA JACKSON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON PASS
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONI POSTON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIANNA HESTER
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD WILLIAMS
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TALAYA ROGERS JONES
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DERRICK HATCHER
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN WINDHAM
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TASHIKA JOHNSON GRAHAM
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY HARRIS
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC SANDERS
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEOLIKA LITTLE
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARJORIE FERGUSON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PORCHA PRATT
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASMINE PERKINS
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY KIRKPATRICK
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL WHITE
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALVIN GRAHAM
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY PRICE, JR.
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARTHUR HILL, JR.
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHEILA MUNGO
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERNEST GUERRIER
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOMMY WHITENER
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLA WRIGHT
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALDRIDGE REED
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENYADA HARDY
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERNEST GREEN, JR.
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOY REYES DIAZ
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN WHITE
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRITTANY SMITH
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HERCULES STEPHEN
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMANTHA MULLINS
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARRELL LEGRAND
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANNA ELLIS
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PORSILYNE PERSON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LLOYD ROME
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMESHIA HARVEY
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHALELIA ANDREA BRASWELL
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARLIENE NICHOLSON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEITH ROYSTER
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL BENTON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMMA RICHARDSON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHLEY SHELTON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORLETHA HOLLEY
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHEMEIKA GOODEN
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICE SUMMERS
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL STANDBACK
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELVITA SCOTT
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID REID
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES GRAY
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA BROWN
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIHAD HASAN
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAKEYIA EDDINGTON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BELINDA SMITH
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CECILIA DOWNEY
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODNEY BAILEY
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTOINETTE FLOWERS
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINE ARCHIE
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTINA HAIRSTON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDDIE TANNER
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERTA WATLINGTON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARRY MULLINS
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHIRRELL BALDWIN
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT KELLY
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDSEL NORWOOD
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LATOYA LEACH
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY JOSEPH
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY TUCKER
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHLEY MCCLUNEY
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIERRA HUNT
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEX CUNNINGHAM
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC WADE
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALICIA MALONE
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYNEE KIMBLE
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERESA REDMOND
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARIA BROWN
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NIQUISHA STROUD
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOBBY BELL
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA BROWN
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL CAMERON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARRYL COULTER
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARLISHA THORPE
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL WOODARD
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DELILA CHAPMAN
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARRIETT THOMPSON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEVONNE DURHAM
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARREN MCDOUGLE
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STACI FLORENCE
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTY CUTHBERTSON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBERTHA AUSTIN
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QUENTEDA SHARPE
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACKIE BITTLE
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEROME SCOTT
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC.
Represented By: SAMUEL B. HARTZELL
Represented By: JACOB R. FRANCHEK
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC.
Represented By: SAMUEL B. HARTZELL
Represented By: JACOB R. FRANCHEK
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC.
Represented By: SAMUEL B. HARTZELL
Represented By: JACOB R. FRANCHEK
Represented By: JASON D. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?