MCADOO v. EGOLF et al
Plaintiff: SONYA NICHOLE MCADOO
Defendant: KENNETH A. COBB, CAROLINA PLASTICS, INC., KARL F. EGOLF and KARL FRANZ EGOLF
Intervenor Defendant: PROGRESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2020cv00361
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 First MOTION Reply Brief to be Considered as Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Punitive Damages filed by KENNETH A. COBB, CAROLINA PLASTICS, INC. filed by SONYA NICHOLE MCADOO. Replies due by 7/2/2020 (MAHONEY, CARLOS)
June 16, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE Brief filed by Plaintiff SONYA NICHOLE MCADOO re #14 First MOTION to Intervene filed by PROGRESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY. Replies due by 6/30/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Kenneth Cobb, #2 Exhibit Letter from Edward Sutton)(MAHONEY, CARLOS) Modified on 6/17/2020 to link to correct pleading. (Sheets, Jamie)
June 3, 2020 Filing 22 Clerk's Entry of Default signed by JOHN S. BRUBAKER on 6/3/2020 due to his failure to answer or otherwise defendPlaintiffs Complaint. (Sheets, Jamie)
June 3, 2020 Filing 21 Corrected document re #20 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Egolf. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Entry of Default)(MAHONEY, CARLOS)
June 3, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Egolf by SONYA NICHOLE MCADOO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Entry of Default)(MAHONEY, CARLOS)
June 1, 2020 Filing 19 Corrected document re #18 Reply to Response to Motion,. (KEISTER, JEFFREY)
June 1, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY, filed by Defendants CAROLINA PLASTICS, INC., KENNETH A. COBB, to Response to #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CAROLINA PLASTICS, INC., KENNETH A. COBB. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(KEISTER, JEFFREY)
June 1, 2020 Filing 17 First MOTION Reply Brief to be Considered as Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Punitive Damages by CAROLINA PLASTICS, INC., KENNETH A. COBB. Response to Motion due by 6/22/2020 (KEISTER, JEFFREY)
May 27, 2020 Filing 16 Corrected document re #15 Brief. (ROTENSTREICH, KENNETH)
May 26, 2020 Filing 15 BRIEF re #14 First MOTION to Intervene . (ROTENSTREICH, KENNETH)
May 26, 2020 Filing 14 First MOTION to Intervene by PROGRESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY. Response to Motion due by 6/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ROTENSTREICH, KENNETH)
May 26, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KENNETH B. ROTENSTREICH on behalf of Intervenor Defendant PROGRESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY (ROTENSTREICH, KENNETH)
May 26, 2020 Filing 12 ***FILED IN ERROR*** NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KENNETH B. ROTENSTREICH on behalf of PROGRESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY. (ROTENSTREICH, KENNETH) Modified on 5/27/2020 to mark filed in error. See #13 for corrected filing. (Sheets, Jamie)
May 21, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE re #10 Brief of Word Count by Plaintiff SONYA NICHOLE MCADOO. (MAHONEY, CARLOS)
May 20, 2020 Set Motion Reply Deadline re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM: Replies due by 6/2/2020. (Sheets, Jamie)
May 19, 2020 Filing 10 BRIEF in Response to #9 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Carolina Plastics and Cobb by Plaintiff SONYA NICHOLE MCADOO filed by SONYA NICHOLE MCADOO. (MAHONEY, CARLOS) Modified on 6/3/2020 to link to Motion. (Sheets, Jamie)
April 30, 2020 Set Motion Response Deadline re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS and ANSWER: Responses due by 5/20/2020. (Sheets, Jamie)
April 29, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss and ANSWER to #4 Complaint, with Jury Demand by CAROLINA PLASTICS, INC., KENNETH A. COBB. (KEISTER, JEFFREY) Modified on 4/30/2020 to edit event type to show as motion.(Sheets, Jamie).
April 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CARLOS E. MAHONEY on behalf of Plaintiff SONYA NICHOLE MCADOO (MAHONEY, CARLOS)
April 23, 2020 Filing 7 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to CAROLINA PLASTICS, INC., KARL FRANZ EGOLF, KENNETH A. COBB. (Original document filed in Orange County Superior Court, Case Number 20CVS329, issued 3/11/2020 and listed as an Additional Attachment to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against KARL FRANZ EGOLF, CAROLINA PLASTICS, INC., KENNETH A. COBB, filed by SONYA NICHOLE MCADOO. (Original document filed in Orange County Superior Court, Case Number 20CVS329 and listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAROLINA PLASTICS, INC. (KEISTER, JEFFREY)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JEFFREY D. KEISTER on behalf of Defendants CAROLINA PLASTICS, INC., KENNETH A. COBB. (KEISTER, JEFFREY)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against SONYA NICHOLE MCADOO (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2792488), filed by KENNETH A. COBB, CAROLINA PLASTICS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavits of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil)(KEISTER, JEFFREY) Modified on 4/22/2020 to add payment information and remove duplicate text. (Sheets, Jamie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2020: #4 State Court Summons) (Sheets, Jamie).
April 22, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Sheets, Jamie)
April 22, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCADOO v. EGOLF et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONYA NICHOLE MCADOO
Represented By: CARLOS E. MAHONEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH A. COBB
Represented By: JEFFREY D. KEISTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROLINA PLASTICS, INC.
Represented By: JEFFREY D. KEISTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KARL F. EGOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KARL FRANZ EGOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: PROGRESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: KENNETH B. ROTENSTREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?