KLUTTZ v. STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Petitioner: DAVID LEE KLUTTZ
Respondent: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Case Number: 1:2020cv00647
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Order on Motion for Application to Proceed IFP, by STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DUNN, ZACHARY)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL on behalf of Respondent STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA. ZACHARY K. DUNN is substituted as counsel for Respondent. Attorney PHILLIP A. RUBIN terminated. (DUNN, ZACHARY)
August 6, 2020 Set Answer Deadline: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA answer due 9/15/2020. (Taylor, Abby)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 08/06/2020, that Petitioner's request to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. Respondent shall file an answer with this Court, pursuant to Rules 4 and 5, Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, within 40 days of the issue of this Order.(Taylor, Abby)
July 14, 2020 CASE REFERRED for Screening (Taylor, Abby)
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by DAVID LEE KLUTTZ.(Taylor, Abby)
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT re #1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP () filed by Petitioner DAVID LEE KLUTTZ. (Taylor, Abby)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by DAVID LEE KLUTTZ. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back)(Taylor, Abby)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KLUTTZ v. STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DAVID LEE KLUTTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: PHILLIP A. RUBIN
Represented By: ZACHARY K. DUNN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?