ANGELL v. ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: JAMES B. ANGELL
Defendant: ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Debtor: MIGUEL ARQUIMEDES CACERES
Interested Party: WILLIAM P. MILLER
Case Number: 1:2020cv00654
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 8/28/2020. The motion to withdraw the reference (Doc. #2 ) is DENIED without prejudice to renewal. The Bankruptcy Court for the Middle District of North Carolina will oversee all pre-trial matters, including issuing findings of fact and conclusions of law on the issue of whether Allstate has consented and otherwise as needed and appropriate. (Daniel, J)
August 26, 2020 Filing 49 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in Adversary Proceeding No. 20-09007 - Doc. 24 Order on Motion to Determine Whether Bankruptcy Court May Enter Final Judgment or Order (Marsh, Keah)
August 26, 2020 Filing 48 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in Adversary Proceeding No. 20-09007 - Doc. 23 Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Determine Whether Bankruptcy Court May Enter Final Judgment or Order (Marsh, Keah)
August 26, 2020 Filing 47 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in Adversary Proceeding No. 20-09007 - Doc. 18 Defendant's Motion to Determine Whether Bankruptcy Court May Enter Final Judgment or Order and Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Marsh, Keah)
August 17, 2020 Motions Submitted: #2 MOTION to Withdraw Reference to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
August 7, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ROBERT HENRY JESSUP, IV on behalf of Plaintiff JAMES B. ANGELL, Trustee JAMES B. ANGELL (JESSUP, ROBERT)
July 17, 2020 Filing 45 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in 18-80776 - Doc. 148 Stipulated Protective Order. (Hervey, Marie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 44 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in 18-80776 - Doc. 146 Order Denying Trustee's Motion for Order to Show Cause, Granting Motion to Compel and directing Allstate to produce documents it withheld on basis of privilege. (Hervey, Marie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 43 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in 18-80776 - Doc. 144 Order Regarding Motion for Order to Show Cause and Motion to Compel. (Hervey, Marie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 42 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in 18-80776 - Doc. 143 Audio File for Hearing held on 11/12/19 regarding Amended Motion to Compel Allstate to Show Cause. (Hervey, Marie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 41 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in 18-80776 - Court Minutes for Hearing Held on 11/12/19 regarding Amended Motion to Compel Allstate to Show Cause. (Hervey, Marie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 40 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in 18-80776 - Doc. 142 Joint Motion for Protective Order. (Hervey, Marie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 39 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in 18-80776 - Doc. 141 Allstate's Response Brief in Opposition to Amended Motion to Compel Allstate to Show Cause. (Hervey, Marie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 38 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in 18-80776 - Doc. 134 Amended Motion to Compel Allstate to Show Cause. (Hervey, Marie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 37 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in 18-80776 - Doc. 131 Order Granting Motion for 2004 Examination of Camilla DeBoard. (Hervey, Marie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 36 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in 18-80776 - Doc. 129 Order Granting Motion for 2004 Examination of Amanda Wells. (Hervey, Marie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 35 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in 18-80776 - Doc. 128 Audio File for Hearing on Motion for 2004 Examination of Amanda Wells and Motion for 2004 Examination of Camilla DeBoard. (Hervey, Marie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 34 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in 18-80776 - Court Minutes from Hearing on Motion for 2004 Examination of Amanda Wells and Motion for 2004 Examination of Camilla DeBoard. (Hervey, Marie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 33 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in 18-80776 - Doc. 126 Order Granting Motion for Turnover of Property from Teague Law Firm. (Hervey, Marie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 32 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in 18-80776 - Doc. 124 Order Granting Motion for Turnover of Property from Walker Allen Firm. (Hervey, Marie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 31 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in 18-80776 - Doc. 116 Motion for 2004 Examination of Camilla DeBoard. (Hervey, Marie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 30 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in 18-80776 - Doc. 115 Motion for 2004 Examination of Amanda Wells. (Hervey, Marie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 29 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in 18-80776 - Doc. 112 Order Granting in part and Denying in part Motion for 2004 Examination of Allstate. (Hervey, Marie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 28 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in 18-80776 - Doc. 111 Audio File for Hearing held on 7/24/19. (Hervey, Marie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 27 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in 18-80776 - Court Minutes for Hearing on 7/22/19 regarding Motion for 2004 Examination of Allstate and 3 Motions for Turnover. (Hervey, Marie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 26 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in 18-80776 - Doc. 99 Allstate's Opposition Response to Motion for Turnover of Property. (Hervey, Marie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 25 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in 18-80776 - Doc. 95 Audio File for Hearing on 5/24/19 regarding Motion for 2004 Examination of Allstate. (Hervey, Marie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 24 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document for 18-80776 - Court Minutes from Hearing on 5/23/19 regarding Motion for 2004 Examination of Allstate. (Hervey, Marie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 23 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in 18-80776 - Doc. 94 Motion for Turnover of Property from Ivey, McClellan, Gatton & Siegmund, LLP. (Hervey, Marie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 22 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in 18-80776 - Doc. 93 Order Granting Motion for out of state counsel to appear pro hac vice for Allstate.(Hervey, Marie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 21 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in 18-80776 - Doc. 91 Response to Motion for 2004 Examination of Allstate, filed by Allstate.(Hervey, Marie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 20 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in 18-80776 - Doc. 90 Motion by out of state Counsel to appear pro hac vice for Allstate (Hervey, Marie)
July 16, 2020 Filing 19 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in 18-80776 - Doc. 86 Motion for Turnover of Property from Walker, Allen, Grice, Ammons & Foy, LLP. (Hervey, Marie)
July 16, 2020 Filing 18 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in 18-80776 - Doc. 84 Exhibits for Motion for Turnover of Property from Teague,Rotenstreich, Stanaland, Fox & Holt, PLLC. (Hervey, Marie)
July 16, 2020 Filing 17 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in 18-80776 - Doc. 83 Motion for Turnover of Property from Teague, rotenstreich, Stanaland, Fox & Holt, PLLC. (Hervey, Marie)
July 16, 2020 Filing 16 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in 18-80776 - Doc. 75 Order Granting Motion to Continue Hearing on Motion for 2004 of Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Hervey, Marie)
July 16, 2020 Filing 15 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in 18-80776 - Doc. 74 Motion to Continue Hearing on Motion for 2004 Examination of Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Hervey, Marie)
July 16, 2020 Filing 14 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in 18-80776 - Doc. 61 Motion for 2004 Examination of Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Hervey, Marie)
July 16, 2020 Filing 13 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in 18-80776 - Doc 49 Transcript from Hearing Held 2/5/19. (Hervey, Marie)
July 16, 2020 Filing 12 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document in 18-80776 - Doc. 48 Order Granting Motion to Withdaw as Attorney for Charles Ivey. (Hervey, Marie)
July 16, 2020 Filing 11 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Docket for 18-80776 - Doc. 47 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Charles Ivey. (Hervey, Marie)
July 16, 2020 Filing 10 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Court Minutes from Hearing on 2/5/19 in case 18-80776. (Hervey, Marie)
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document - Doc. 11 Joint Scheduling Memorandum. (Hervey, Marie)
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document - Doc. 7 Answer filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Hervey, Marie)
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Document - Doc. 2 AP Memo. (Hervey, Marie)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Main Doc. #1 Complaint filed by James B. Angell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit) (Hervey, Marie)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Transmitting copy #19 Reply of Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. The Bankruptcy Court hereby certifies that this is a true and accurate copy. (Hervey, Marie)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Transmitting copy of Response of James B. Angell to #9 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. The Bankruptcy Court hereby certifies that this is a true and accurate copy. (Hervey, Marie)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court hereby certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket file. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Designations) (Hervey, Marie)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Hervey, Marie)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 Certificate of Readiness and Completion of Record for Motion for Withdrawal of Reference filed by the Bankruptcy Court. (Garland, Leah)
July 15, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Garland, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANGELL v. ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES B. ANGELL
Represented By: JAMES BIGELOW ANGELL
Represented By: ROBERT HENRY JESSUP, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: MIGUEL ARQUIMEDES CACERES
Represented By: WENDELL LESLIE SCHOLLANDER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: THOMAS W. CURVIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: WILLIAM P. MILLER
Represented By: WILLIAM P. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?