GORDON v. ETHERIDGE et al
Trustee: BRIAN RICHARD ANDERSON
Appellee: SANDRA LYNN ETHERIDGE and RODNEY WAYNE ETHERIDGE
Appellant: HARRY G. GORDON
Interested Party: WILLIAM P. MILLER and NCM - BANKRUPTCY COURT
Case Number: 1:2020cv00757
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 09/15/2020, The record on appeal needs to be settled, and the Clerk's Office has already set a schedule for the settling of the record on appeal in case number 1:20CV407, docket entry 17. Once the court rules to settle the record on appeal in 1:20CV407, Plaintiff-Appellant' opening brief in 1:20CV757 will be due in thirty (30) days. Any opposition briefs will be due thirty (30) days after the filing of the Plaintiff-Appellant's brief. Any reply brief will be due fourteen (14) days after filing of any response.(Taylor, Abby)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1-13-20, before Judge Kahn. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/14/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Transcript re 8-19-20, #2 Transcript re 3-3-20) (Whitesell, Susan)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. Bankruptcy Record Part 5 filed. Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court hereby certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket on file. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet Adversary 19-2008) (Whitesell, Susan)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. Bankruptcy Record Part 4 filed. Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court hereby certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket on file. (Attachments: #1 1-Adversary Exhibit A, #2 1-Adversary Exhibit B, #3 32-Proposed Consolidated Amened Complaint, #4 32-Adversary Exhibit A, #5 32-Adversary Exhibit B, #6 32-Adversary Exhibit C, #7 32-Adversary Exhibit D, #8 32-Adversary Exhibit E) (Whitesell, Susan)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. Bankruptcy Record Part 3 filed. Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court hereby certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket on file. (Attachments: #1 61-Exhibit A, #2 61-Exhibit B, #3 61-Exhibit C, #4 61-Exhibit D, #5 61-Exhibit E, #6 63-Response by Benjamin Busch, #7 68-Memorandum Opinion on Application for Compensation for Harry Gordon, #8 70-Motion to Extend Time to Appeall, #9 71-Order Granting Motion to Extend Time, #10 73-Motion for Leave to Appeal, #11 73-Exhiit A Excerpt from doc, #12 73-Exhibit B Order, #13 74-Notice of Appeal, #14 75-Certificate of service re Motion for Leave to Appeal, #15 77-Certificate of Readiness and Completion of Record re Motion for Leave to Appeal) (Whitesell, Susan)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. Bankruptcy Record Part 2 filed. Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court hereby certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket on file. (Attachments: #1 37-Exhibit Memorandum of Settlement by Trustee, #2 Proof of Claim 5 by Harry Gordon, #3 39-Objection to Motion to Approve Settlement by BA, #4 40-Affidavit of Harry Gordon, #5 41-Response by Harry Gordon, #6 43-Order Granting Motion for Settlement Agreement, #7 45-Application for Compensation for Harry Gordon, #8 49-Objection by BA, #9 50-Supplemental Affidavit, #10 51-Response by Harry Gordon, #11 55-Amended Response by Harry Gordon, #12 55-Exhibit 1, #13 55-Exhibit 2, #14 57-Order Directing Plaintiff to file Consolidated proposed Amended Complaint and Contunuing Hearing) (Whitesell, Susan)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. Bankruptcy Record Part 1 filed. Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court hereby certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket on file. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Addisonal Designations, #2 84-Appellees Designations, #3 104-Appellees Designation, #4 1-Petition, #5 11-Application to Employ Harry Gordon, #6 13-Order Granting Application to Employ, #7 16-Motion to Reconsider, #8 17-Hearing set Motion to Reconsider, #9 20-Affidavit Rodney Wayne Etheridge, #10 21-Response to Application to Employ Harry Gordon, #11 21-Exhibit, #12 23-Order Deny Motion to Reconsider, #13 25-Motion to Extend Time to File Complaint, #14 26-Notice of Tentative Heairng re Motion to Extend Time, #15 28-Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement, #16 29-Order Granting Motion to Extend Time) (Whitesell, Susan)
August 21, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. (Garland, Leah)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL filed by HARRY G. GORDON. (Garland, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GORDON v. ETHERIDGE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: BRIAN RICHARD ANDERSON
Represented By: BRIAN RICHARD ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SANDRA LYNN ETHERIDGE
Represented By: BENJAMIN D. BUSH
Represented By: BENJAMIN D. BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RODNEY WAYNE ETHERIDGE
Represented By: BENJAMIN D. BUSH
Represented By: BENJAMIN D. BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: HARRY G. GORDON
Represented By: HARRY G. GORDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: WILLIAM P. MILLER
Represented By: WILLIAM P. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NCM - BANKRUPTCY COURT
Represented By: NCM - BANKRUPTCY COURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?