PACCHIANA v. PACCHIANA
Plaintiff: GREGG J. PACCHIANA
Defendant: GLENN PACCHIANA
Case Number: 1:2020cv00859
Filed: September 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney JONATHAN WILLIAM MASSELL on behalf of Plaintiff GREGG J. PACCHIANA (MASSELL, JONATHAN)
November 12, 2020 Filing 11 BRIEF re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant GLENN PACCHIANA filed by GLENN PACCHIANA. (BUCKLEY, THOMAS)
November 12, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by GLENN PACCHIANA. Response to Motion due by 12/3/2020 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Glenn Pacchiana)(BUCKLEY, THOMAS)
November 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney DAVID B. GELFARB on behalf of Defendant GLENN PACCHIANA ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-2930003.) (GELFARB, DAVID)
October 22, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond by 11/12/2020. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 10/22/2020. (AULD, L.)
October 22, 2020 Motions Referred: RE: #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, , to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Garrett, Kim)
October 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ALLEGRA A. SINCLAIR on behalf of Defendant GLENN PACCHIANA (SINCLAIR, ALLEGRA)
October 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by GLENN PACCHIANA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(BUCKLEY, THOMAS)
October 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney THOMAS MORE BUCKLEY on behalf of Defendant GLENN PACCHIANA (BUCKLEY, THOMAS)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to GLENN PACCHIANA served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - WY Service, #2 Exhibit B - NY Service)(BOYCE, ROBERT)
September 21, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Sheets, Jamie)
September 21, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie)
September 21, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to GLENN PACCHIANA. (Sheets, Jamie)
September 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GLENN PACCHIANA( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2896580.), filed by GREGG J. PACCHIANA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - email correspondence of August, 2019, #2 Exhibit B - email correspondence, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit proposed Summons)(BOYCE, ROBERT) Modified on 9/21/2020 to correctly reflect who the complaint is against. (Garland, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PACCHIANA v. PACCHIANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGG J. PACCHIANA
Represented By: ROBERT DANIEL BOYCE
Represented By: JONATHAN WILLIAM MASSELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENN PACCHIANA
Represented By: THOMAS MORE BUCKLEY
Represented By: DAVID B. GELFARB
Represented By: ALLEGRA A. SINCLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?