ALLEN et al v. CITY OF GRAHAM, NC et al
Plaintiff: Future Alamance, Tabatha Davis, Dejuana Bigelow, Sylvester Allen, Jr., OLIVIA DAVIS, ANGELA WILLIS and TALAUN WOODS
Defendant: City of Graham, NC, ALAMANCE COUNTY, SHERIFF TERRY S. JOHNSON, Alamance County Deputy Sheriffs John and Jane Does #16-30, Kristi Cole, Graham Police Officers John and Jane Does #1-15, MARY KRISTINE (KRISTY) COLE, JONATHAN FRANKS, CLIFF PARKER, JOAQUIN VELEZ, GRAHAM POLICE OFFICERS JOHN AND JANE DOES #21-40, CITY OF GRAHAM, TERRY A. JOHNSON and ALAMANCE COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPUTIES JOHN AND JANE DOES #1 through #20
Case Number: 1:2020cv00997
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE of SUMMONS by DEJUANA BIGELOW, SYLVESTER ALLEN, JR, OLIVIA DAVIS, TABATHA DAVIS, TALAUN WOODS, ANGELA WILLIS, FUTURE ALAMANCE. JOAQUIN VELEZ waiver sent on 12/14/2020, answer due 2/12/2021. re #24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants, filed by TABATHA DAVIS, DEJUANA BIGELOW, SYLVESTER ALLEN, JR, FUTURE ALAMANCE, TALAUN WOODS, ANGELA WILLIS, OLIVIA DAVIS(SUMTER, GERALDINE)
December 18, 2020 Filing 26 Summons Issued as to JONATHAN FRANKS. (Sheets, Jamie)
December 14, 2020 Filing 25 First AMENDED COMPLAINT Justice 4 the Next Generation et al against defendant All Defendants, filed by GREGORY DRUMWRIGHT, FAITH COOK, QUENCLYN ELLISON, ME.Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00997-CCE-LPA, 1:20-cv-00998-CCE-LPA(HADDIX, ELIZABETH)
December 11, 2020 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants, filed by TABATHA DAVIS, DEJUANA BIGELOW, SYLVESTER ALLEN, JR, FUTURE ALAMANCE, TALAUN WOODS, ANGELA WILLIS, OLIVIA DAVIS.(SUMTER, GERALDINE)
December 11, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney ASHOK CHANDRAN on behalf of Plaintiffs SYLVESTER ALLEN, JR, DEJUANA BIGELOW, TABATHA DAVIS, FUTURE ALAMANCE ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-2948474.) (CHANDRAN, ASHOK)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that the motions are GRANTED and these cases are consolidated for all pre-trial proceedings, and, subject to review closer to trial, for trial. Allen v. City, 20cv997, is designated as the lead case. Henceforth all pleadings, motions, briefs, and other allowable filings shall be filed in that case only. Signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 12/04/2020. Related Case 1:20CV998.(Taylor, Abby)
December 2, 2020 Filing 21 Corrected document re #20 Brief,. (FLANAGAN, PATRICK)
December 2, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting #18 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants City of Graham, Kristi Cole, Alamance County, and Terry S. Johnson shall answer or otherwise respond by 01/18/2021. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 12/02/2020. (AULD, L.)
December 2, 2020 Motions Submitted: #19 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 1:20-cv-00998 to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
December 1, 2020 Filing 20 BRIEF re #19 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 1:20-cv-00998 by Defendants ALAMANCE COUNTY, CITY OF GRAHAM, NC, KRISTI COLE, TERRY S. JOHNSON filed by ALAMANCE COUNTY, CITY OF GRAHAM, NC, KRISTI COLE, TERRY S. JOHNSON. (FLANAGAN, PATRICK)
December 1, 2020 Filing 19 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 1:20-cv-00998 by ALAMANCE COUNTY, CITY OF GRAHAM, NC, KRISTI COLE, TERRY S. JOHNSON. Response to Motion due by 12/22/2020 (FLANAGAN, PATRICK)
November 30, 2020 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by ALAMANCE COUNTY, CITY OF GRAHAM, NC, KRISTI COLE, TERRY S. JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FLANAGAN, PATRICK)
November 30, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney PAUL GERARD GESSNER on behalf of Defendants ALAMANCE COUNTY, TERRY S. JOHNSON (GESSNER, PAUL)
November 30, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney CLYDE BALLINGER ALBRIGHT on behalf of Defendant TERRY S. JOHNSON (ALBRIGHT, CLYDE)
November 30, 2020 Motions Referred: RE: #18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Sanders, Marlene)
November 24, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney WILLIAM L. HILL on behalf of Defendant ALAMANCE COUNTY (HILL, WILLIAM)
November 23, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to TERRY S. JOHNSON served on 11/18/2020, answer due 12/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back)(Taylor, Abby)
November 20, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ANTHONY JOSEPH BILLER on behalf of Defendants CITY OF GRAHAM, NC, KRISTI COLE (BILLER, ANTHONY)
November 20, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to ALAMANCE COUNTY served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020; CITY OF GRAHAM, NC served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020; KRISTI COLE served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/1/2020; TERRY S. JOHNSON served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cole USPS Tracking, #2 Exhibit Johnson USPS Tracking, #3 Exhibit Alamance County USPS Tracking, #4 Exhibit City of Graham USPS Tracking)(SUMTER, GERALDINE)
November 19, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney LEAH C. ADEN on behalf of Plaintiffs SYLVESTER ALLEN, JR, DEJUANA BIGELOW, TABATHA DAVIS, FUTURE ALAMANCE ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-2936039.) (ADEN, LEAH)
November 19, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney ANUJA DIWAKAR THATTE on behalf of Plaintiffs SYLVESTER ALLEN, JR, DEJUANA BIGELOW, TABATHA DAVIS, FUTURE ALAMANCE ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-2936030.) (THATTE, ANUJA)
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney CLARENCE W. PHILLIPS on behalf of Plaintiffs SYLVESTER ALLEN, JR, DEJUANA BIGELOW, TABATHA DAVIS, FUTURE ALAMANCE ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-2935262.) (PHILLIPS, CLARENCE)
November 18, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney MARIANNE E. SPENCER on behalf of Plaintiffs SYLVESTER ALLEN, JR, DEJUANA BIGELOW, TABATHA DAVIS, FUTURE ALAMANCE ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-2935254.) (SPENCER, MARIANNE)
November 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney MORGAN E. LEWIS on behalf of Plaintiffs SYLVESTER ALLEN, JR, DEJUANA BIGELOW, TABATHA DAVIS, FUTURE ALAMANCE ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-2935217.) (LEWIS, MORGAN)
November 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney PATRICK HOUGHTON FLANAGAN on behalf of Defendants ALAMANCE COUNTY, TERRY S. JOHNSON (FLANAGAN, PATRICK)
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff FUTURE ALAMANCE. (SUMTER, GERALDINE)
November 4, 2020 Filing 4 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Hicks, Samantha)
November 3, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CITY OF GRAHAM, NC, KRISTI COLE, ALAMANCE COUNTY, TERRY S. JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Chief Kristi Cole, #2 Summons - Alamance County, #3 Summons - Sheriff Terry S. Johnson) (Hicks, Samantha)
November 3, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Hicks, Samantha)
November 3, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Hicks, Samantha)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2923680.)(Related Case # 1:20-cv-613), filed by Tabatha Davis, Dejuana Bigelow, Sylvester Allen, Jr, Future Alamance.(SUMTER, GERALDINE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALLEN et al v. CITY OF GRAHAM, NC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Graham, NC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAMANCE COUNTY
Represented By: PAUL GERARD GESSNER
Represented By: WILLIAM L. HILL
Represented By: PATRICK HOUGHTON FLANAGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERIFF TERRY S. JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alamance County Deputy Sheriffs John and Jane Does #16-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham Police Officers John and Jane Does #1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY KRISTINE (KRISTY) COLE
Represented By: ANTHONY JOSEPH BILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONATHAN FRANKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLIFF PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOAQUIN VELEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAHAM POLICE OFFICERS JOHN AND JANE DOES #21-40
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF GRAHAM
Represented By: ANTHONY JOSEPH BILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRY A. JOHNSON
Represented By: CLYDE BALLINGER ALBRIGHT
Represented By: PAUL GERARD GESSNER
Represented By: PATRICK HOUGHTON FLANAGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAMANCE COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPUTIES JOHN AND JANE DOES #1 through #20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Future Alamance
Represented By: GERALDINE SUMTER
Represented By: MARIANNE E. SPENCER
Represented By: ANUJA DIWAKAR THATTE
Represented By: CLARENCE W. PHILLIPS
Represented By: MORGAN E. LEWIS
Represented By: ASHOK CHANDRAN
Represented By: LEAH C. ADEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabatha Davis
Represented By: GERALDINE SUMTER
Represented By: MARIANNE E. SPENCER
Represented By: ANUJA DIWAKAR THATTE
Represented By: CLARENCE W. PHILLIPS
Represented By: MORGAN E. LEWIS
Represented By: ASHOK CHANDRAN
Represented By: LEAH C. ADEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dejuana Bigelow
Represented By: GERALDINE SUMTER
Represented By: MARIANNE E. SPENCER
Represented By: ANUJA DIWAKAR THATTE
Represented By: CLARENCE W. PHILLIPS
Represented By: MORGAN E. LEWIS
Represented By: ASHOK CHANDRAN
Represented By: LEAH C. ADEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvester Allen, Jr.
Represented By: GERALDINE SUMTER
Represented By: MARIANNE E. SPENCER
Represented By: ANUJA DIWAKAR THATTE
Represented By: CLARENCE W. PHILLIPS
Represented By: MORGAN E. LEWIS
Represented By: ASHOK CHANDRAN
Represented By: LEAH C. ADEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OLIVIA DAVIS
Represented By: MARIANNE E. SPENCER
Represented By: ANUJA DIWAKAR THATTE
Represented By: CLARENCE W. PHILLIPS
Represented By: MORGAN E. LEWIS
Represented By: GERALDINE SUMTER
Represented By: ASHOK CHANDRAN
Represented By: LEAH C. ADEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA WILLIS
Represented By: MARIANNE E. SPENCER
Represented By: ANUJA DIWAKAR THATTE
Represented By: CLARENCE W. PHILLIPS
Represented By: MORGAN E. LEWIS
Represented By: GERALDINE SUMTER
Represented By: ASHOK CHANDRAN
Represented By: LEAH C. ADEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TALAUN WOODS
Represented By: MARIANNE E. SPENCER
Represented By: ANUJA DIWAKAR THATTE
Represented By: CLARENCE W. PHILLIPS
Represented By: MORGAN E. LEWIS
Represented By: GERALDINE SUMTER
Represented By: ASHOK CHANDRAN
Represented By: LEAH C. ADEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?