ALLEN v. 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: JUDY A. ALLEN
Defendant: FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, VIACOMCBS INC., 3M COMPANY, ITT CORPORATION, COVIL CORPORATION, VIACOM, INC., successor-by-merger to CBS CORPORATION, a Pennsylvania corporation, ITT FLUID PRODUCTS CORP., CRANE CO., BELL AND GOSSETT COMPANY, DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GRINNELL LLC doing business as GRINNELL CORPORATION, ITT MARLOW, SOUTHERN INSULATION, INC., MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY, CBS CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC., WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION and also as successor-in-interest to BF STURTEVANT, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., ITT INDUSTRIES INC., EMERSON ELECTRIC CO., PNEUMO ABEX, LLC, FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, ABLEST INC., HOFFMAN SPECIALTY MFG. CORP., METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, FLUOR CORPORATION, GOULDS PUMPS, INC., EATON CORPORATION and IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01150
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
2 Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 Case Reassigned to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR. CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER no longer assigned to the case. (Marsh, Keah)
January 27, 2021 Filing 67 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney DAVID C. HUMEN on behalf of Plaintiff JUDY A. ALLEN ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-2974646.) (HUMEN, DAVID)
January 27, 2021 Filing 66 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney KIMBERLY SULLIVAN on behalf of Defendant PNEUMO ABEX, LLC (SULLIVAN, KIMBERLY)
January 27, 2021 Filing 65 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant PNEUMO ABEX, LLC by PNEUMO ABEX, LLC.(MCLEOD, YANCEY)
January 27, 2021 Filing 64 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney YANCEY A. MCLEOD, III on behalf of Defendant PNEUMO ABEX, LLC ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-2974214.) (MCLEOD, YANCEY)
January 27, 2021 Filing 63 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by PNEUMO ABEX, LLC. (O'NEILL, M.)
January 27, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney M. ELIZABETH O'NEILL on behalf of Defendant PNEUMO ABEX, LLC (O'NEILL, M.)
January 26, 2021 Filing 61 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CRANE CO.. (MATHER, EMILY)
January 26, 2021 Filing 60 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CRANE CO.. (MATHER, EMILY)
January 26, 2021 Filing 59 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney EMILY K. MATHER on behalf of Defendant CRANE CO. (MATHER, EMILY)
January 26, 2021 Filing 58 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney MARLA T. RESCHLY on behalf of Defendant CRANE CO. (RESCHLY, MARLA)
January 22, 2021 Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (COLTRAIN, KEITH)
January 22, 2021 Filing 56 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand and to Cross-Claims of any and all other Defendants and Third-Party Defendants by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (COLTRAIN, KEITH)
January 22, 2021 Filing 55 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney KEITH E. COLTRAIN on behalf of Defendant METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (COLTRAIN, KEITH)
January 22, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney PHILIP C. REID on behalf of Defendant EMERSON ELECTRIC CO. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-2971101.) (REID, PHILIP)
January 21, 2021 Filing 53 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney RHYAN J. LINDLEY on behalf of Defendant EMERSON ELECTRIC CO. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-2970912.) (LINDLEY, RHYAN)
January 21, 2021 Filing 52 **FILED IN ERROR** NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney RHYAN J. LINDLEY on behalf of Defendant EMERSON ELECTRIC CO. (LINDLEY, RHYAN) Modified on 1/21/2021 to mark filed in error (See #53 ). (Engle, Anita)
January 21, 2021 Filing 51 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EMERSON ELECTRIC CO.. (O'NEILL, M.)
January 21, 2021 Filing 50 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by EMERSON ELECTRIC CO.. (O'NEILL, M.)
January 21, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney M. ELIZABETH O'NEILL on behalf of Defendant EMERSON ELECTRIC CO. (O'NEILL, M.)
January 21, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney KIMBERLY SULLIVAN on behalf of Defendant EMERSON ELECTRIC CO. (SULLIVAN, KIMBERLY)
January 21, 2021 Filing 47 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VIACOMCBS INC.. (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
January 21, 2021 Filing 46 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
January 21, 2021 Filing 45 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by VIACOMCBS INC.. (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
January 21, 2021 Filing 44 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
January 21, 2021 Filing 43 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant 3M COMPANY (SCHULZ, JONATHAN)
January 21, 2021 Filing 42 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by 3M COMPANY. (SCHULZ, JONATHAN)
January 21, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney JONATHAN E. SCHULZ on behalf of Defendant 3M COMPANY (SCHULZ, JONATHAN)
January 19, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney CURTIS J. SHIPLEY on behalf of Defendant COVIL CORPORATION (SHIPLEY, CURTIS)
January 19, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney SCOTTIE F. LEE on behalf of Defendant COVIL CORPORATION (LEE, SCOTTIE)
January 19, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney LESLIE C. PACKER on behalf of Defendant COVIL CORPORATION (PACKER, LESLIE)
January 19, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ASHLEY KAMPHAUS BRATHWAITE on behalf of Defendant COVIL CORPORATION (BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY)
January 19, 2021 Filing 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant COVIL CORPORATION (BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY)
January 19, 2021 Filing 35 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by COVIL CORPORATION. (BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY)
January 19, 2021 Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GRINNELL LLC. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
January 19, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR on behalf of Defendant ITT CORPORATION (STARR, WILLIAM)
January 19, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR on behalf of Defendant GRINNELL LLC (STARR, WILLIAM)
January 19, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR on behalf of Defendant GOULDS PUMPS, INC. (STARR, WILLIAM)
January 19, 2021 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ITT CORPORATION. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
January 19, 2021 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ITT CORPORATION. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
January 19, 2021 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by GRINNELL LLC. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
January 19, 2021 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GOULDS PUMPS, INC.. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
January 19, 2021 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by GOULDS PUMPS, INC.. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
January 19, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney RICHARD T. BOYETTE on behalf of Defendant EATON CORPORATION (BOYETTE, RICHARD)
January 19, 2021 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant EATON CORPORATION (DEAN, LAURA)
January 19, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by EATON CORPORATION. (DEAN, LAURA)
January 19, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney LAURA E. DEAN on behalf of Defendant EATON CORPORATION (DEAN, LAURA)
January 19, 2021 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SOUTHERN INSULATION, INC.. (WILLIAMSON, STEPHEN)
January 19, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by SOUTHERN INSULATION, INC.. (WILLIAMSON, STEPHEN)
January 19, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney SCOTT E. FRICK on behalf of Defendants DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC., FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-2967813.) (FRICK, SCOTT)
January 19, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney MOFFATT G. MCDONALD on behalf of Defendants DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC., FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-2967803.) (MCDONALD, MOFFATT)
January 19, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney W. DAVID CONNER on behalf of Defendants DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC., FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-2967790.) (CONNER, W.)
January 19, 2021 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
January 19, 2021 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
January 19, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
January 19, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
January 19, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
January 19, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
January 19, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
January 19, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
January 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney JASMINE M. PITT on behalf of Defendant IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. (PITT, JASMINE)
January 8, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC..(BENNETT, JOSHUA)
January 8, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.. (BENNETT, JOSHUA)
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney JESSICA M. DEAN on behalf of Plaintiff JUDY A. ALLEN ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-2958795.) (DEAN, JESSICA)
December 28, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Reissued as to 3M COMPANY, ABLEST INC., EMERSON ELECTRIC CO., FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, GRINNELL LLC, ITT CORPORATION, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, PNEUMO ABEX, LLC, VIACOMCBS INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons - ABLEST INC, #2 Summons - EMERSON ELECTRIC, #3 Summons - FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, #4 Summons - GRINNELL LLC, #5 Summons - ITT CORPORATION, #6 Summons - METLIFE, #7 Summons - PNEUMO ABEX LLC, #8 Summons - VIACOMCBS INC) (Hicks, Samantha)
December 22, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
December 22, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Ablest Inc., #2 Summons - Covil Corporation, #3 Summons - Crane Co., #4 Summons - Daniel International Corporation, #5 Summons - Eaton Corporation, #6 Summons - Emerson Electric Co., #7 Summons - Fluor Constructors International, #8 Summons - Fluor Constructors International, Inc., #9 Summons - Fluor Daniel Services Corporation, #10 Summons - Fluor Enterprises, Inc., #11 Summons - General Electric Company, #12 Summons - Goulds Pumps, Inc., #13 Summons - Grinnell LLC, #14 Summons - IMO Industries, Inc., #15 Summons - ITT Corporation, #16 Summons - Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, #17 Summons - Pneumo Abex, LLC, #18 Summons - Southern Insulation, Inc., #19 Summons - ViacomCBS Inc.) (Sheets, Jamie)
December 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT CIVIL ACTION COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-2954144), filed by JUDY A. ALLEN. (GRAHAM, WILLIAM)
December 22, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Sheets, Jamie)
December 22, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALLEN v. 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: W. DAVID CONNER
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BARTON MAJOR
Represented By: SCOTT E. FRICK
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIACOMCBS INC.
Represented By: JENNIFER M. TECHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: JONATHAN E. SCHULZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT CORPORATION
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COVIL CORPORATION
Represented By: SCOTTIE F. LEE
Represented By: CURTIS J. SHIPLEY
Represented By: ASHLEY KAMPHAUS BRATHWAITE
Represented By: LESLIE C. PACKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIACOM, INC., successor-by-merger to CBS CORPORATION, a Pennsylvania corporation
Represented By: JENNIFER M. TECHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT FLUID PRODUCTS CORP.
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Represented By: MARLA T. RESCHLY
Represented By: EMILY K. MATHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BELL AND GOSSETT COMPANY
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Represented By: W. DAVID CONNER
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BARTON MAJOR
Represented By: SCOTT E. FRICK
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: JENNIFER M. TECHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRINNELL LLC doing business as GRINNELL CORPORATION
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT MARLOW
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHERN INSULATION, INC.
Represented By: STEPHEN B. WILLIAMSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Represented By: JONATHAN E. SCHULZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation
Represented By: JENNIFER M. TECHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: W. DAVID CONNER
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BARTON MAJOR
Represented By: SCOTT E. FRICK
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION and also as successor-in-interest to BF STURTEVANT
Represented By: JENNIFER M. TECHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: W. DAVID CONNER
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BARTON MAJOR
Represented By: SCOTT E. FRICK
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT INDUSTRIES INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMERSON ELECTRIC CO.
Represented By: PHILIP C. REID
Represented By: RHYAN J. LINDLEY
Represented By: KIMBERLY SULLIVAN
Represented By: M. ELIZABETH O'NEILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNEUMO ABEX, LLC
Represented By: KIMBERLY SULLIVAN
Represented By: M. ELIZABETH O'NEILL
Represented By: YANCEY A. MCLEOD, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION
Represented By: W. DAVID CONNER
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BARTON MAJOR
Represented By: SCOTT E. FRICK
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABLEST INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOFFMAN SPECIALTY MFG. CORP.
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: KEITH E. COLTRAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR CORPORATION
Represented By: W. DAVID CONNER
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BARTON MAJOR
Represented By: SCOTT E. FRICK
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EATON CORPORATION
Represented By: LAURA E. DEAN
Represented By: RICHARD T. BOYETTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: JOSHUA HAMILTON BENNETT
Represented By: JASMINE M. PITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDY A. ALLEN
Represented By: WILLIAM MARC GRAHAM
Represented By: DAVID C. HUMEN
Represented By: JESSICA M. DEAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?