NAPCO, INC. v. LANDMARK TECHNOLOGY A, LLC
Plaintiff: NAPCO, INC.
Defendant: LANDMARK TECHNOLOGY A, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00025
Filed: January 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant LANDMARK TECHNOLOGY A, LLC re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Count II) filed by LANDMARK TECHNOLOGY A, LLC. (LONG, SAMUEL)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Count II) by LANDMARK TECHNOLOGY A, LLC. Response to Motion due by 3/26/2021 (LONG, SAMUEL)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE by LANDMARK TECHNOLOGY A, LLC of Constitutional Challenge to a Statute Pursuant to FRCP Rule 5.1(a) (LONG, SAMUEL)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney SAMUEL A. LONG, JR on behalf of Defendant LANDMARK TECHNOLOGY A, LLC (LONG, SAMUEL)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney KELLY ALFRED CAMERON on behalf of Plaintiff NAPCO, INC. (CAMERON, KELLY)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for LANDMARK TECHNOLOGY A, LLC. Answer due by 3/5/2021. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 2/3/2021. (Brubaker, John)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by LANDMARK TECHNOLOGY A, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(TRIMMER, CHRISTINA)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to LANDMARK TECHNOLOGY A, LLC served on 1/13/2021, answer due 2/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(TALBOT, NATALIA)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to LANDMARK TECHNOLOGY A, LLC. (Sheets, Jamie)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NAPCO, INC.. (TALBOT, NATALIA)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LANDMARK TECHNOLOGY A, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-2963303), filed by NAPCO, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(TALBOT, NATALIA)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NAPCO, INC. v. LANDMARK TECHNOLOGY A, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANDMARK TECHNOLOGY A, LLC
Represented By: CHRISTINA D. TRIMMER
Represented By: SAMUEL A. LONG, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAPCO, INC.
Represented By: NATALIA L. TALBOT
Represented By: KELLY ALFRED CAMERON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?