RANKIN BEY v. STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Petitioner: NAPOLEON J. RANKIN BEY
Respondent: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Case Number: 1:2021cv00045
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Referring Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Filing 4 USCA ORDER Movant has filed a motion under 28 U.S.C. 2244 for an order authorizing the district court to consider a second or successive application for relief under 28 U.S.C. 2254. The court denies the motion. USCA Case Number 21-111. (Sheets, Jamie)
January 20, 2021 USCA 2244 CASE DOCKETED as to NAPOLEON J. RANKIN BEY. USCA Case Manager: Taline Fischer. USCA Case Number 21-111. (Sheets, Jamie)
January 15, 2021 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 5:21-hc-02009. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - it is ORDERED that the entire record in this matter is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/15/2021. Copy sent to petitioner via US Mail. (Indig, A.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 1/15/2021.]
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Napoleon J. Rankin Bey. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 1/15/2021.]
January 15, 2021 CASE REFERRED for Screening (Taylor, Abby)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RANKIN BEY v. STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NAPOLEON J. RANKIN BEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?