MOUNTAIN VALLEY PIPELINE, LLC v. EASEMENTS TO CONSTRUCT, OPERATE, AND MAINTAIN A NATURAL GAS PIPELINE OVER TRACTS OF LAND IN ROCKINGHAM COUNTY, GUILFORD AND ALAMANCE COUNTY NORTH CAROLINA INCLUDING:
Plaintiff: Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC
Defendant: 1.93 Acres of Land Owned by John Ray Cole and Ravonda Lynn Cole, 9.74 Acres of Land Owned by Jackie Burris Johnson And Ted Mack Johnson And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 0.06 Acres of Land Owned by Susano B. Jaimes, 0.80 Acres of Land Owned by Elizabeth Ann McKinney Talley, 7.33 Acres of Land Owned by Ranch Properties, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 1.504 Acres of Land Owned by Greenwood Presbyterian Church, Inc., 31.37 Acres of Land Owned by Willow Oaks Plantation, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 0.03 Acres of Land Owned by Wade L. Ray and Amber L. Ray, 1.37 Acres of Land Owned by Robert J. Mullis and Connie R. Mullis, 3.68 Acres of Land Owned by James Arthur Quesinberry And Donald Wayne Quiesinberry And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 0.18 Acres of Land Owned by Frances Gwendolyn Underwood Pruitt And Thomas Michael Pruitt, 4.32 Acres of Land Owned by Lloyd G. Tucker Sr. And Faye Isley Tucker, And Lloyd G. Tucker Jr.;, 5.06 Acres of Land Owned by Dale Frank Tate, 1.20 Acres of Land Owned by Torrey L. Roach and Amanda R. Roach, 2.13 Acres of Land Owned by Daniel A. Hughes and Margaret M. Hughes, 1.51 Acres of Land Owned by Donald L. Brown, 3.33 Acres of Land Owned by South Rock Farm LLC, 0.15 Acres of Land Owned by John Andrew Kallam And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 3.70 Acres of Land Owned by Feliciano Mares, Anna Burnett McCauley, Jacquelyn McCauley, And Samuel Owen McCauley, 0.74 Acres of Land Owned by Robert C. Warren, Jr. and Lena Kay Warren, 0.06 Acres of Land Owned by April Marie Stanfield and Ronald Stanfield, 0.07 Acres of Land Owned by Cardinal Pipeline Company, LLC, 1.53 Acres of Land Owned by Delmus Sylvester Broadnax; Bill R. Broadnax; Heirs Of Buddy Nathaniel Broadnax; Linda D. Broadnax; Jermaine Broadnax; Donnett Broadnax; Nicole Broadnax; Kimberly Broadnax;, 6.22 Acres of Land Owned by Wayne S. Apple, 3.13 Acres of Land Owned by 1804-1814 Greenstreet Associates, LP, 3.00 Acres of Land Owned by 329 Partners, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 5.71 Acres of Land Owned by South Rock Farm, LLC and Tina L. Pinnix-Broome, 1.19 Acres of Land Owned by Jerry Richmond and Penny Richmond, 23.17 Acres of Land Owned by Barry S. Frank And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 0.99 Acres of Land Owned by Melvin Eugene Sheckells And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 1.68 Acres of Land Owned by Kathryn Knapp Collins And James Knapp And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 3.64 Acres of Land Owned by Michael Glenn Wallace and Paula Rochelle Wallace, 0.33 Acres of Land Owned by Daniel Lee Bates and Emily Talbott Bates, 6.18 Acres of Land Owned by John P. McMichael and Susan L. McMichael, 0.96 Acres of Land Owned by Bret L. Stevens, Jennifer M. Stevens, Timothy G. Stevens, And Teresa S. Stevens, 1.74 Acres of Land Owned by Dora Ann Atha, Eric Dehart, Joseph Dehart, And Lisa A. Brammer And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 0.30 Acres of Land Owned by Charles A. Jones and Deborah A. Jones, 8.96 Acres of Land Owned by Joyce C. Vaughn Revocable Trust Of 1998, Kenneth Matthew Vaughn, And Debra Riffle Vaughn And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 1.93 Acres of Land Owned by Lori Dyer Webster Or Lori D. Webster And R. Alan Dyer, Co-Trustees Of The Robert W. Dyer And Betty B. Dyer Irrevocable Trust, Dated November 4, 2014, And The Robert W. Dyer, 2.94 Acres of Land Owned by The Verlie J. Hall Revocable Trust Dated 21st Day Of January, 2002 And Frank C. Hall, Trustee Of The Verlie J. Hall Revocable Trust Dated 21st Day Of January, 2002, 4.37 Acres Owned by Kenneth R. Hayes And Teresa G. Hayes, 0.37 Acres of Land Owned by George Walter Johnson, III And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 8.92 Acres of Land Owned by Second Partners. LLC, 0.31 Acres of Land Owned by Eric Kass and Brittney Kass, 3.43 Acres of Land Owned by Ramona Faye Millner Bankston And Robert Bankston, 2.12 Acres of Land Owned By Larry Wayne Pinnix And Linda Thompson Pinnix, 4.98 Acres of Land Owned by Kenneth R. Hayes And Teresa G. Hayes, 2.16 Acres of Land Owned by Sandra K. Strader, And Garry D. Strader, 3.14 Acres of Land Owned by Kenneth Wayne Bates, Georg Ann Bates, Kenneth W Bates Ii, Tracy Bates, Daniel Lee Bates, And Emily Talbott Bates, 0.11 Acres of Land Owned by Vera Kernodle Bullock, 7.32 Acres of Land Owned by Circle Bar D Ranch, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 2.01 Acres of Land Owned By Fred L. Lehman And Carol S. Lehman, 16.41 Acres of Land Owned by Alvin Herbin And Virginia B. Herbin, 5.01 Acres of Land Owned by Raven Lee Broeker And Cathi Jo Broeker, 3.04 Acres of Land Owned by The David K. Naylor 2014 Trust, U/T/A Dated August 27, 2014; David K. Naylor As Trustee Of The David K. Naylor 2014 Trust U/T/A Dated August 27, 2014; The David K. And Pame, 7.96 Acres of Land Owned by Heirs Of General O. Totten, 0.36 Acres of Land Owned by Samantha Hatt, 9.66 Acres of Land Owned by Howard L. Dunn, Jr. And Patricia L. Dunn, 2.04 Acres of Land Owned by Public Service Company Of North Carolina And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, Unknown Owners, 2.45 Acres of Land Owned by Aimee Smith Tilley And Stephen Edward Smith Ii, Anne Fairchild Cannon, Susie Fairchild Cole, Lucile Fairchild Thienemann, Martha Anne Fairchild, Rose Tiller Mcmichael, And, 0.50 Acres of Land Owned by Larry D. Shambley and Donna S. Shambley, 3.23 Acres of Land Owned by Edith Kernodle Khateeb and Hashim A. Khateeb, 2.31 Acres of Land Owned by Renee Womack, 4.90 Acres of Land Owned by Michael Stephen Madren and Patsy Madren, 1.02 Acres of Land Owned by Mark R. Hall and Lisa H. Hall, 5.97 Acres of Land Owned by Mary Nelson Underwood And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 8.34 Acres of Land Owned by Esther P. Blanchard, Perry Blanchard Slade, Jack Daniel Slade, Dayle Driver Blanchard, Marsha Blanchard Hicks, Lee Hicks, Morgan Lindsey Blanchard, 1.34 Acres of Land Owned by Kenneth Wayne Bates And Georg Ann Bates, 1.96 Acres of Land Owned by Carol Christopher Oliver, 4.29 Acres Owned by Caroline Franklin Holliday And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 1.08 Acres of Land Owned by Robert F. Rhodes, Easements to Construct, Operate, and Maintain a Natural Gas Pipeline Over Tracts of Land in Rockingham County, Guilford County and Alamance County North Carolina Including:, 4.79 Acres of Land Owned by The Robert W. Dyer And Betty B. Dyer Irrevocable Trust, Dated November 4, 2014; Lori D. Webster, Co-Trustee Of The Robert W. Dyer And Betty B. Dyer Irrevocable Trust, Dated, 2.19 Acres of Land Owned by Daniel L. Motley, Jr., 5.76 Acres of Land Owned by Beatrice E. Cochran; And Barry Cochran And Wife, Deborah V. Cochran And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 2.16 Acres of Land Owned by Carolina Franklin Holliday and Easement Claimed by Transcontinental Gas Pipeline Company, LLC, 1.44 Acres of Land Owned by Janie H. Tew, Jerry Hicks, Toni Hicks, And Tricia Cronk, 2.37 Acres of Land Owned by Marie Olivia Bass Revocable Trust U/A Dated April 9, 2015 And Marie Olivia Bass, Trustee For The Marie Olivia Bass Revocable Trust U/A Dated April 9, 2015, 0.36 Acres of Land Owned by A.S.C.S., a minor child, 3.32 Acres of Land Owned by Thomas Weaver Construction Company, Inc., 0.34 Acres of Land Owned by Pamela J. Muller, 2.22 Acres of Land Owned by Mountain Valley Pipeline LLC and Easement Claimed by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 3.14 Acres of Land Owned by Teresa Ann Clayton Freeman, Hugh W. Freeman, And Coggins Stone Street, LLC, EASEMENTS TO CONSTRUCT, OPERATE, AND MAINTAIN A NATURAL GAS PIPELINE OVER TRACTS OF LAND IN ROCKINGHAM COUNTY, GUILFORD AND ALAMANCE COUNTY NORTH CAROLINA INCLUDING:, 2.94 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY THE VERLIE J. HALL REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 21ST DAY OF JANUARY, 2002 AND FRANK C. HALL, TRUSTEE OF THE VERLIE J. HALL REVOCABLE TRUST, 4.32 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY LLOYD G. TUCKER SE. AND FAYE ISLEY TUCKER AND LLOYD G. TUCKER, JR., 3.70 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY FELICIANO MARES, ANNA BURNETT MCCAULEY, JACQUELYN MCCAULEY AND SAMUEL OWEN MCCAULEY, 1.44 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY JANIE H. TEW, JERRY HICKS, TONI HICKS AND TRICIA CRONK, 8.92 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY SECOND PARTNERS, LLC, 3.04 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY THE DAVID K. NAYLOR 2014 TRUST, U/T/A DATED AUGUST 27, 2014, DAVID K. NAYLOR AS TRUSTEE, 1.93 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY LORI DYER WEBSTER OR LORI D. WEBSTER AND R. ALAN DYER, CO-TRUSTEES OF THE ROBERT W. DYER AND BETTY B. DYER IRREVOCABLE TRUST, DATED NOVEMBER 4, 2014, 4.79 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY THE ROBERT W. DYER AND BETTY B. DYER IRREVOCABLE TRUST, DATE NOVEMBER 4, 2014; LORI D. WEBSTER, CO-TRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT W. DYER AND BETTY B. DYER IRREVOCABLE TRUST, 2.16 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY JOHN ANDREW KALLAM AND EASTMENT CLAIMED BY TRANSCONTINENTAL GAS PIPELINE COMPANY, LLC, 5.76 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY BEATRICE E. COCKRAN AND BARRY COCHRAN AND WIFE, DEBORAH V. COCKRAN AND EASEMENT CLAIMED BY TRANSCONTINENTAL GAS PIPE LINE COMPANY, LLC, 3.68 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY JAMES ARTHUR QUESINBERRY AND DONALD WAYNE QUESINBERRY AND EASEMENT CLAIMED BY TRANSCONTINENTAL GAS PIPE LINE COMPANY, LLC, 1.68 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY KATHRYN KNAPP COLLINSAND JAMES KNAPP AND EASEMENT CLAIMED BY TRANSCONTINENTAL GAS PIPE LINE COMPANY, LLC, 1.74 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY DORA ANN ATHA, ERIC DEHART, JOSEPH DEHART AND LISA A. BRAMMER AND EASEMENT CLAIMED BY TRANSCONTINENTAL GAS PIPE LINE COMPANY, LLC, 8.96 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY JOYCE C. VAUGHN REVOCABLE TRUST OF 1998, KENNETH MATTHEW VAUGHN AND DEBRA RIFFLE VAUGHN AND EASEMENT CLAIMED BY TRANSCONTINENTAL GAS PIPE LINE COMPANY, LLC, 1.53 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY DELMUS SYLVESTER BROADNAX, BILL R. BROADNAX, HEIRS OF BUDDY NATHANIEL BROADNAX, LINDA D. BROADNAX, JERMAINE BROADNAX, DONNETT BROADNAX, NICOLE BROADNAX, KIMBERLY BROADNAX, 2.16 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY SANDRA K. STRADER AND GARRY D. STRADER, 0.96 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY BRET L. STEVENS, JENNIFER M. STEVENS, TIMOTHY G. STEVENS AND TERESA S. STEVENS, 3.14 ACRES OF LANCE OWNED BY KENNETH WAYNE BATES, GEORG ANN BATES, KENNETH W. BATES LI, TRACY BATES, DANIEL LEE BATES, AND EMILY TALBOTT BATES and 2.45 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY AIMEE SMITH TILLEY AND STEPHEN EDWARD SMITH II, ANNE FAIRCHILD CANNON, SUSIE FAIRCHILD COLE, LUCILE FAIRCHILD THIENEMANN, MARTHA ANNE FAIRCHILD, ROSE TILLEY MCMICHAEL
Case Number: 1:2021cv00047
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 717
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Filing 104 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and extend other case deadlines by MOUNTAIN VALLEY PIPELINE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CROOK, MICHAEL)
January 6, 2022 Filing 103 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) 3.33 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY SOUTH ROCK FARM LLC, 5.71 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY SOUTH ROCK FARM, LLC AND TINA L. PINNIX-BROOME, 0.34 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY PAMELA J. MULLER and 2.37 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY MARIE OLIVIA BASS REVOCABLE TRUST U/A DATED APRIL 9, 2015 AND MARIE OLIVIA BASS, TRUSTEE FOR THE MARIE OLIVIA BASS REVOCABLE TRUST U/A DATED APRIL 9, 2015, filed by Plaintiff MOUNTAIN VALLEY PIPELINE, LLC (CROOK, MICHAEL)
January 6, 2022 Motion Referred to MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER RE: #104 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and extend other case deadlines. (Engle, Anita)
September 24, 2021 Filing 102 REPORT Interim Report of Mediator by Mediator JAMES L. GALE. (RAYNAL, CHARLES)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Appointing THE HONORABLE JAMES L. GALE, as the Mediator pursuant to LR 83.9d(a). Signed by John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Bond, Melisa)
July 8, 2021 MEDIATION SCHEDULING ORDER; Mediation due by 9/15/2021. (Bond, Melisa)
July 8, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. (Bond, Melisa)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 7/7/2021. The Court approves without modification the Joint Rule 26(f) Report (Docket Entry #99 ). The parties agree the appropriate plan for this case designated in LR 26.1 is Exceptional. Discovery due by 11/15/2022. Mediation due 9/15/2021. The parties agree the Honorable James L. Gale serve as mediator. The parties leave request The parties do not consent to the reference of this case to a Magistrate Judge. (Daniel, J)
June 22, 2021 Motions Referred: RE: #99 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (Garrett, Kim)
June 15, 2021 Filing 99 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by MOUNTAIN VALLEY PIPELINE, LLC.(CROOK, MICHAEL)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 04/12/2021, that Plaintiff's motion for the appointment of guardian ad litem for A.S.C.S., a minor child (Doc. #73 ), is GRANTED and W. Eric Medlin is appointed guardian ad litem to A.S.C.S. in this matter. (Taylor, Abby)
April 9, 2021 Filing 97 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney BRADLEY CRAIG FRIESEN on behalf of Defendant 5.71 Acres of Land Owned by South Rock Farm, LLC and Tina L. Pinnix-Broome (FRIESEN, BRADLEY)
April 9, 2021 Filing 96 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney BRADLEY CRAIG FRIESEN on behalf of Defendant 3.33 Acres of Land Owned by South Rock Farm LLC (FRIESEN, BRADLEY)
April 7, 2021 Filing 95 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Proof of Service as to 7.96 Acres of Land Owned by Heirs Of General O. Totten served on 3/19/2021, answer due 4/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service)(CROOK, MICHAEL)
April 7, 2021 Motion Submitted to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: #73 MOTION to Appoint ad Litem. (Engle, Anita)
April 6, 2021 Filing 94 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Proof of Service as to 8.92 Acres of Land Owned by Second Partners. LLC served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Secretary of State Acknowledgement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proof of Service)(CROOK, MICHAEL)
April 6, 2021 Filing 93 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of summons and complaint by counsel Acceptance of Notices of Condemnation on behalf of South Rock Farm, LLC on 2/10/2021. on Acceptance and Waiver of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acceptance and Waiver of Service)(CROOK, MICHAEL)
April 6, 2021 Filing 92 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Proof of Service as to 1.53 Acres of Land Owned by Delmus Sylvester Broadnax; Bill R. Broadnax; Heirs Of Buddy Nathaniel Broadnax; Linda D. Broadnax; Jermaine Broadnax; Donnett Broadnax; Nicole Broadnax; Kimberly Broadnax; served on 3/23/2021, answer due 4/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service re Bill Broadnax, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proof of Service re Linda Broadnax, #3 Exhibit 3 - Proof of Service re Jermaine Broadnax, #4 Exhibit 4 - Proof of Service re Nicole Broadnax, #5 Exhibit 5 - Proof of Service re Kimberly Broadnax, #6 Exhibit 6 - Proof of Service re Donald Broadnax, #7 Exhibit 7 - Proof of Service re Brenda Broadnax, #8 Exhibit 8 - Proof of Service re Clarence Broadnax, #9 Exhibit 9 - Proof of Service re Betty Broadnax Thomas)(CROOK, MICHAEL)
April 6, 2021 Filing 91 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Personal Service Affidavit as to 1.19 Acres of Land Owned by Jerry Richmond and Penny Richmond served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (CROOK, MICHAEL)
April 6, 2021 Filing 90 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Proof of Service as to 5.71 Acres of Land Owned by South Rock Farm, LLC and Tina L. Pinnix-Broome served on 1/23/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service)(CROOK, MICHAEL)
April 6, 2021 Filing 89 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Proof of Service as to 0.36 Acres of Land Owned by A.S.C.S., a minor child served on 1/25/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service)(CROOK, MICHAEL)
April 6, 2021 Filing 88 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Proof of Service as to 0.03 Acres of Land Owned by Wade L. Ray and Amber L. Ray served on 1/23/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service)(CROOK, MICHAEL)
April 6, 2021 Filing 87 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Proof of Service as to 1.51 Acres of Land Owned by Donald L. Brown served on 1/23/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service)(CROOK, MICHAEL)
April 6, 2021 Filing 86 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Proof of Service as to 1.504 Acres of Land Owned by Greenwood Presbyterian Church, Inc. served on 1/22/2021, answer due 2/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service)(CROOK, MICHAEL)
April 6, 2021 Filing 85 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Personal Service Affidavit as to 0.06 Acres of Land Owned by Susano B. Jaimes served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (CROOK, MICHAEL)
April 6, 2021 Filing 84 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Proof of Service as to 1.93 Acres of Land Owned by John Ray Cole and Ravonda Lynn Cole served on 1/23/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service)(CROOK, MICHAEL)
April 6, 2021 Filing 83 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Proof of Service as to 0.74 Acres of Land Owned by Robert C. Warren, Jr. and Lena Kay Warren served on 1/23/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service)(CROOK, MICHAEL)
April 6, 2021 Filing 82 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Proof of Service as to 0.34 Acres of Land Owned by Pamela J. Muller served on 1/23/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service)(CROOK, MICHAEL)
April 6, 2021 Filing 81 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Proof of Service as to 3.13 Acres of Land Owned by 1804-1814 Greenstreet Associates, LP served on 1/22/2021, answer due 2/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service)(CROOK, MICHAEL)
April 6, 2021 Filing 80 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Proof of Service as to 2.12 Acres of Land Owned By Larry Wayne Pinnix And Linda Thompson Pinnix served on 1/23/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service)(CROOK, MICHAEL)
April 6, 2021 Filing 79 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Personal Service Affidavit as to 1.96 Acres of Land Owned by Carol Christopher Oliver served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021. (CROOK, MICHAEL)
April 6, 2021 Filing 78 SERVICE by Publication filed by Plaintiff MOUNTAIN VALLEY PIPELINE, LLC. Served by publication in The Times-News Publishing Co. and The Greensboro News Record as to Unknown Heirs on date(s) March 23, 2021 and March 19, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Publisher (Alamance County), #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Publisher (Rockingham County))(CROOK, MICHAEL)
April 6, 2021 Filing 77 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) 0.96 Acres of Land Owned by Bret L. Stevens, Jennifer M. Stevens, Timothy G. Stevens, And Teresa S. Stevens, 3.43 Acres of Land Owned by Ramona Faye Millner Bankston And Robert Bankston, 3.70 Acres of Land Owned by Feliciano Mares, Anna Burnett McCauley, Jacquelyn McCauley, And Samuel Owen McCauley, 5.06 Acres of Land Owned by Dale Frank Tate, 0.18 Acres of Land Owned by Frances Gwendolyn Underwood Pruitt And Thomas Michael Pruitt and 0.80 Acres of Land Owned by Elizabeth Ann McKinney Talley, filed by Plaintiff MOUNTAIN VALLEY PIPELINE, LLC (CROOK, MICHAEL)
April 6, 2021 Filing 76 DECLARATION of Katie M. Iams filed by Plaintiff MOUNTAIN VALLEY PIPELINE, LLC re #73 MOTION to Appoint ad Litem filed by MOUNTAIN VALLEY PIPELINE, LLC. (CROOK, MICHAEL)
April 6, 2021 Filing 75 DECLARATION of W. Eric Medlin filed by Plaintiff MOUNTAIN VALLEY PIPELINE, LLC re #73 MOTION to Appoint ad Litem filed by MOUNTAIN VALLEY PIPELINE, LLC. (CROOK, MICHAEL)
April 6, 2021 Filing 74 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff MOUNTAIN VALLEY PIPELINE, LLC re #73 MOTION to Appoint ad Litem filed by MOUNTAIN VALLEY PIPELINE, LLC. (CROOK, MICHAEL)
April 6, 2021 Filing 73 MOTION to Appoint ad Litem by MOUNTAIN VALLEY PIPELINE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CROOK, MICHAEL)
March 30, 2021 Filing 72 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney RYAN A. PITTMAN on behalf of Defendants 0.03 Acres of Land Owned by Wade L. Ray and Amber L. Ray, 0.06 Acres of Land Owned by April Marie Stanfield and Ronald Stanfield, 0.06 Acres of Land Owned by Susano B. Jaimes, 0.07 Acres of Land Owned by Cardinal Pipeline Company, LLC, 0.11 Acres of Land Owned by Vera Kernodle Bullock, 0.15 Acres of Land Owned by John Andrew Kallam And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 0.18 Acres of Land Owned by Frances Gwendolyn Underwood Pruitt And Thomas Michael Pruitt, 0.30 Acres of Land Owned by Charles A. Jones and Deborah A. Jones, 0.31 Acres of Land Owned by Eric Kass and Brittney Kass, 0.33 Acres of Land Owned by Daniel Lee Bates and Emily Talbott Bates, 0.34 Acres of Land Owned by Pamela J. Muller, 0.36 Acres of Land Owned by A.S.C.S., a minor child, 0.36 Acres of Land Owned by Samantha Hatt, 0.37 Acres of Land Owned by George Walter Johnson, III And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 0.50 Acres of Land Owned by Larry D. Shambley and Donna S. Shambley, 0.74 Acres of Land Owned by Robert C. Warren, Jr. and Lena Kay Warren, 0.80 Acres of Land Owned by Elizabeth Ann McKinney Talley, 0.96 Acres of Land Owned by Bret L. Stevens, Jennifer M. Stevens, Timothy G. Stevens, And Teresa S. Stevens, 0.99 Acres of Land Owned by Melvin Eugene Sheckells And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 1.02 Acres of Land Owned by Mark R. Hall and Lisa H. Hall, 1.08 Acres of Land Owned by Robert F. Rhodes, 1.19 Acres of Land Owned by Jerry Richmond and Penny Richmond, 1.20 Acres of Land Owned by Torrey L. Roach and Amanda R. Roach, 1.34 Acres of Land Owned by Kenneth Wayne Bates And Georg Ann Bates, 1.37 Acres of Land Owned by Robert J. Mullis and Connie R. Mullis, 1.44 Acres of Land Owned by Janie H. Tew, Jerry Hicks, Toni Hicks, And Tricia Cronk, 1.504 Acres of Land Owned by Greenwood Presbyterian Church, Inc., 1.51 Acres of Land Owned by Donald L. Brown, 1.53 Acres of Land Owned by Delmus Sylvester Broadnax; Bill R. Broadnax; Heirs Of Buddy Nathaniel Broadnax; Linda D. Broadnax; Jermaine Broadnax; Donnett Broadnax; Nicole Broadnax; Kimberly Broadnax;, 1.68 Acres of Land Owned by Kathryn Knapp Collins And James Knapp And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 1.74 Acres of Land Owned by Dora Ann Atha, Eric Dehart, Joseph Dehart, And Lisa A. Brammer And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 1.93 Acres of Land Owned by John Ray Cole and Ravonda Lynn Cole, 1.93 Acres of Land Owned by Lori Dyer Webster Or Lori D. Webster And R. Alan Dyer, Co-Trustees Of The Robert W. Dyer And Betty B. Dyer Irrevocable Trust, Dated November 4, 2014, And The Robert W. Dyer, 1.96 Acres of Land Owned by Carol Christopher Oliver, 16.41 Acres of Land Owned by Alvin Herbin And Virginia B. Herbin, 2.01 Acres of Land Owned By Fred L. Lehman And Carol S. Lehman, 2.04 Acres of Land Owned by Public Service Company Of North Carolina And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 2.12 Acres of Land Owned By Larry Wayne Pinnix And Linda Thompson Pinnix, 2.13 Acres of Land Owned by Daniel A. Hughes and Margaret M. Hughes, 2.16 Acres of Land Owned by Carolina Franklin Holliday and Easement Claimed by Transcontinental Gas Pipeline Company, LLC, 2.16 Acres of Land Owned by Sandra K. Strader, And Garry D. Strader, 2.19 Acres of Land Owned by Daniel L. Motley, Jr., 2.22 Acres of Land Owned by Mountain Valley Pipeline LLC and Easement Claimed by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 2.31 Acres of Land Owned by Renee Womack, 2.37 Acres of Land Owned by Marie Olivia Bass Revocable Trust U/A Dated April 9, 2015 And Marie Olivia Bass, Trustee For The Marie Olivia Bass Revocable Trust U/A Dated April 9, 2015, 2.45 Acres of Land Owned by Aimee Smith Tilley And Stephen Edward Smith Ii, Anne Fairchild Cannon, Susie Fairchild Cole, Lucile Fairchild Thienemann, Martha Anne Fairchild, Rose Tiller Mcmichael, And, 2.94 Acres of Land Owned by The Verlie J. Hall Revocable Trust Dated 21st Day Of January, 2002 And Frank C. Hall, Trustee Of The Verlie J. Hall Revocable Trust Dated 21st Day Of January, 2002, 23.17 Acres of Land Owned by Barry S. Frank And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 3.00 Acres of Land Owned by 329 Partners, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 3.04 Acres of Land Owned by The David K. Naylor 2014 Trust, U/T/A Dated August 27, 2014; David K. Naylor As Trustee Of The David K. Naylor 2014 Trust U/T/A Dated August 27, 2014; The David K. And Pame, 3.13 Acres of Land Owned by 1804-1814 Greenstreet Associates, LP, 3.14 Acres of Land Owned by Kenneth Wayne Bates, Georg Ann Bates, Kenneth W Bates Ii, Tracy Bates, Daniel Lee Bates, And Emily Talbott Bates, 3.14 Acres of Land Owned by Teresa Ann Clayton Freeman, Hugh W. Freeman, And Coggins Stone Street, LLC, 3.23 Acres of Land Owned by Edith Kernodle Khateeb and Hashim A. Khateeb, 3.32 Acres of Land Owned by Thomas Weaver Construction Company, Inc., 3.33 Acres of Land Owned by South Rock Farm LLC, 3.43 Acres of Land Owned by Ramona Faye Millner Bankston And Robert Bankston, 3.64 Acres of Land Owned by Michael Glenn Wallace and Paula Rochelle Wallace, 3.68 Acres of Land Owned by James Arthur Quesinberry And Donald Wayne Quiesinberry And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 3.70 Acres of Land Owned by Feliciano Mares, Anna Burnett McCauley, Jacquelyn McCauley, And Samuel Owen McCauley, 31.37 Acres of Land Owned by Willow Oaks Plantation, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 4.29 Acres Owned by Caroline Franklin Holliday And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 4.32 Acres of Land Owned by Lloyd G. Tucker Sr. And Faye Isley Tucker, And Lloyd G. Tucker Jr.;, 4.37 Acres Owned by Kenneth R. Hayes And Teresa G. Hayes, 4.79 Acres of Land Owned by The Robert W. Dyer And Betty B. Dyer Irrevocable Trust, Dated November 4, 2014; Lori D. Webster, Co-Trustee Of The Robert W. Dyer And Betty B. Dyer Irrevocable Trust, Dated, 4.90 Acres of Land Owned by Michael Stephen Madren and Patsy Madren, 4.98 Acres of Land Owned by Kenneth R. Hayes And Teresa G. Hayes, 5.01 Acres of Land Owned by Raven Lee Broeker And Cathi Jo Broeker, 5.06 Acres of Land Owned by Dale Frank Tate, 5.71 Acres of Land Owned by South Rock Farm, LLC and Tina L. Pinnix-Broome, 5.76 Acres of Land Owned by Beatrice E. Cochran; And Barry Cochran And Wife, Deborah V. Cochran And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 5.97 Acres of Land Owned by Mary Nelson Underwood And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 6.18 Acres of Land Owned by John P. McMichael and Susan L. McMichael, 6.22 Acres of Land Owned by Wayne S. Apple, 7.32 Acres of Land Owned by Circle Bar D Ranch, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 7.33 Acres of Land Owned by Ranch Properties, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 7.96 Acres of Land Owned by Heirs Of General O. Totten, 8.34 Acres of Land Owned by Esther P. Blanchard, Perry Blanchard Slade, Jack Daniel Slade, Dayle Driver Blanchard, Marsha Blanchard Hicks, Lee Hicks, Morgan Lindsey Blanchard, 8.92 Acres of Land Owned by Second Partners. LLC, 8.96 Acres of Land Owned by Joyce C. Vaughn Revocable Trust Of 1998, Kenneth Matthew Vaughn, And Debra Riffle Vaughn And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 9.66 Acres of Land Owned by Howard L. Dunn, Jr. And Patricia L. Dunn, 9.74 Acres of Land Owned by Jackie Burris Johnson And Ted Mack Johnson And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, EASEMENTS TO CONSTRUCT, OPERATE, AND MAINTAIN A NATURAL GAS PIPELINE OVER TRACTS OF LAND IN ROCKINGHAM COUNTY, GUILFORD AND ALAMANCE COUNTY NORTH CAROLINA INCLUDING:, Unknown Owners ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3018963.) (PITTMAN, RYAN)
March 30, 2021 Filing 71 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney JOHN D. DALE on behalf of Defendants 0.07 Acres of Land Owned by Cardinal Pipeline Company, LLC, 0.15 Acres of Land Owned by John Andrew Kallam And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 0.37 Acres of Land Owned by George Walter Johnson, III And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 0.99 Acres of Land Owned by Melvin Eugene Sheckells And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 1.68 Acres of Land Owned by Kathryn Knapp Collins And James Knapp And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 1.74 Acres of Land Owned by Dora Ann Atha, Eric Dehart, Joseph Dehart, And Lisa A. Brammer And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 2.04 Acres of Land Owned by Public Service Company Of North Carolina And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 2.16 Acres of Land Owned by Carolina Franklin Holliday and Easement Claimed by Transcontinental Gas Pipeline Company, LLC, 2.22 Acres of Land Owned by Mountain Valley Pipeline LLC and Easement Claimed by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 23.17 Acres of Land Owned by Barry S. Frank And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 3.00 Acres of Land Owned by 329 Partners, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 3.68 Acres of Land Owned by James Arthur Quesinberry And Donald Wayne Quiesinberry And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 31.37 Acres of Land Owned by Willow Oaks Plantation, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 4.29 Acres Owned by Caroline Franklin Holliday And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 5.76 Acres of Land Owned by Beatrice E. Cochran; And Barry Cochran And Wife, Deborah V. Cochran And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 5.97 Acres of Land Owned by Mary Nelson Underwood And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 7.32 Acres of Land Owned by Circle Bar D Ranch, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 7.33 Acres of Land Owned by Ranch Properties, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 8.96 Acres of Land Owned by Joyce C. Vaughn Revocable Trust Of 1998, Kenneth Matthew Vaughn, And Debra Riffle Vaughn And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 9.74 Acres of Land Owned by Jackie Burris Johnson And Ted Mack Johnson And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3018954.) (DALE, JOHN)
March 30, 2021 Filing 70 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney JOHN D. RUSSELL on behalf of Defendants 0.07 Acres of Land Owned by Cardinal Pipeline Company, LLC, 0.15 Acres of Land Owned by John Andrew Kallam And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 0.37 Acres of Land Owned by George Walter Johnson, III And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 0.99 Acres of Land Owned by Melvin Eugene Sheckells And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 1.68 Acres of Land Owned by Kathryn Knapp Collins And James Knapp And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 1.74 Acres of Land Owned by Dora Ann Atha, Eric Dehart, Joseph Dehart, And Lisa A. Brammer And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 2.04 Acres of Land Owned by Public Service Company Of North Carolina And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 2.16 Acres of Land Owned by Carolina Franklin Holliday and Easement Claimed by Transcontinental Gas Pipeline Company, LLC, 2.22 Acres of Land Owned by Mountain Valley Pipeline LLC and Easement Claimed by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 23.17 Acres of Land Owned by Barry S. Frank And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 3.00 Acres of Land Owned by 329 Partners, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 3.68 Acres of Land Owned by James Arthur Quesinberry And Donald Wayne Quiesinberry And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 31.37 Acres of Land Owned by Willow Oaks Plantation, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 4.29 Acres Owned by Caroline Franklin Holliday And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 5.76 Acres of Land Owned by Beatrice E. Cochran; And Barry Cochran And Wife, Deborah V. Cochran And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 5.97 Acres of Land Owned by Mary Nelson Underwood And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 7.32 Acres of Land Owned by Circle Bar D Ranch, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 7.33 Acres of Land Owned by Ranch Properties, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 8.96 Acres of Land Owned by Joyce C. Vaughn Revocable Trust Of 1998, Kenneth Matthew Vaughn, And Debra Riffle Vaughn And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 9.74 Acres of Land Owned by Jackie Burris Johnson And Ted Mack Johnson And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3018944.) (RUSSELL, JOHN)
March 30, 2021 Filing 69 ***FILED IN ERROR***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney JOHN D. DALE on behalf of Defendants 0.07 Acres of Land Owned by Cardinal Pipeline Company, LLC, 0.15 Acres of Land Owned by John Andrew Kallam And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 0.37 Acres of Land Owned by George Walter Johnson, III And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 0.99 Acres of Land Owned by Melvin Eugene Sheckells And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 1.68 Acres of Land Owned by Kathryn Knapp Collins And James Knapp And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 1.74 Acres of Land Owned by Dora Ann Atha, Eric Dehart, Joseph Dehart, And Lisa A. Brammer And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 2.04 Acres of Land Owned by Public Service Company Of North Carolina And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 2.16 Acres of Land Owned by Carolina Franklin Holliday and Easement Claimed by Transcontinental Gas Pipeline Company, LLC, 2.22 Acres of Land Owned by Mountain Valley Pipeline LLC and Easement Claimed by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 23.17 Acres of Land Owned by Barry S. Frank And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 3.00 Acres of Land Owned by 329 Partners, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 3.68 Acres of Land Owned by James Arthur Quesinberry And Donald Wayne Quiesinberry And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 31.37 Acres of Land Owned by Willow Oaks Plantation, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 4.29 Acres Owned by Caroline Franklin Holliday And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 5.76 Acres of Land Owned by Beatrice E. Cochran; And Barry Cochran And Wife, Deborah V. Cochran And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 5.97 Acres of Land Owned by Mary Nelson Underwood And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 7.32 Acres of Land Owned by Circle Bar D Ranch, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 7.33 Acres of Land Owned by Ranch Properties, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 8.96 Acres of Land Owned by Joyce C. Vaughn Revocable Trust Of 1998, Kenneth Matthew Vaughn, And Debra Riffle Vaughn And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 9.74 Acres of Land Owned by Jackie Burris Johnson And Ted Mack Johnson And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC (DALE, JOHN) Modified on 3/30/2021 (Taylor, Abby).
March 30, 2021 Filing 68 ***FILED IN ERROR***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney JOHN D. RUSSELL on behalf of Defendants 0.07 Acres of Land Owned by Cardinal Pipeline Company, LLC, 0.15 Acres of Land Owned by John Andrew Kallam And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 0.37 Acres of Land Owned by George Walter Johnson, III And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 0.99 Acres of Land Owned by Melvin Eugene Sheckells And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 1.68 Acres of Land Owned by Kathryn Knapp Collins And James Knapp And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 1.74 Acres of Land Owned by Dora Ann Atha, Eric Dehart, Joseph Dehart, And Lisa A. Brammer And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 2.04 Acres of Land Owned by Public Service Company Of North Carolina And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 2.16 Acres of Land Owned by Carolina Franklin Holliday and Easement Claimed by Transcontinental Gas Pipeline Company, LLC, 2.22 Acres of Land Owned by Mountain Valley Pipeline LLC and Easement Claimed by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 23.17 Acres of Land Owned by Barry S. Frank And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 3.00 Acres of Land Owned by 329 Partners, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 3.68 Acres of Land Owned by James Arthur Quesinberry And Donald Wayne Quiesinberry And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 31.37 Acres of Land Owned by Willow Oaks Plantation, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 4.29 Acres Owned by Caroline Franklin Holliday And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 5.76 Acres of Land Owned by Beatrice E. Cochran; And Barry Cochran And Wife, Deborah V. Cochran And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 5.97 Acres of Land Owned by Mary Nelson Underwood And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 7.32 Acres of Land Owned by Circle Bar D Ranch, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 7.33 Acres of Land Owned by Ranch Properties, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 8.96 Acres of Land Owned by Joyce C. Vaughn Revocable Trust Of 1998, Kenneth Matthew Vaughn, And Debra Riffle Vaughn And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 9.74 Acres of Land Owned by Jackie Burris Johnson And Ted Mack Johnson And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC (RUSSELL, JOHN) Modified on 3/30/2021 (Taylor, Abby).
March 30, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) re #69 Notice of Attorney Appearance, #68 Notice of Attorney Appearance. FILED IN ERROR. Attorneys John Russell and John Dale must refile their Notice of Appearances using the event: Notice of Special Appearance and pay the fee for their appearance as out of state attorneys. (Taylor, Abby)
March 25, 2021 Filing 67 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney KYLE F. HEUSER on behalf of Defendants 0.07 Acres of Land Owned by Cardinal Pipeline Company, LLC, 0.15 Acres of Land Owned by John Andrew Kallam And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 0.37 Acres of Land Owned by George Walter Johnson, III And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 0.99 Acres of Land Owned by Melvin Eugene Sheckells And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 1.68 Acres of Land Owned by Kathryn Knapp Collins And James Knapp And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 1.74 Acres of Land Owned by Dora Ann Atha, Eric Dehart, Joseph Dehart, And Lisa A. Brammer And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 2.04 Acres of Land Owned by Public Service Company Of North Carolina And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 2.16 Acres of Land Owned by Carolina Franklin Holliday and Easement Claimed by Transcontinental Gas Pipeline Company, LLC, 2.22 Acres of Land Owned by Mountain Valley Pipeline LLC and Easement Claimed by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 23.17 Acres of Land Owned by Barry S. Frank And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 3.00 Acres of Land Owned by 329 Partners, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 3.68 Acres of Land Owned by James Arthur Quesinberry And Donald Wayne Quiesinberry And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 31.37 Acres of Land Owned by Willow Oaks Plantation, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 4.29 Acres Owned by Caroline Franklin Holliday And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 5.76 Acres of Land Owned by Beatrice E. Cochran; And Barry Cochran And Wife, Deborah V. Cochran And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 5.97 Acres of Land Owned by Mary Nelson Underwood And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 7.32 Acres of Land Owned by Circle Bar D Ranch, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 7.33 Acres of Land Owned by Ranch Properties, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 8.96 Acres of Land Owned by Joyce C. Vaughn Revocable Trust Of 1998, Kenneth Matthew Vaughn, And Debra Riffle Vaughn And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 9.74 Acres of Land Owned by Jackie Burris Johnson And Ted Mack Johnson And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC (HEUSER, KYLE)
March 15, 2021 Filing 66 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, with Jury Demand by 2.16 Acres of Land Owned by Sandra K. Strader, And Garry D. Strader. (DAUM, SHILOH)
March 15, 2021 Filing 65 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, with Jury Demand by 2.19 Acres of Land Owned by Daniel L. Motley, Jr.. (DAUM, SHILOH)
March 15, 2021 Filing 64 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, with Jury Demand by 5.01 Acres of Land Owned by Raven Lee Broeker And Cathi Jo Broeker. (DAUM, SHILOH)
March 15, 2021 Filing 63 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, with Jury Demand by 0.11 Acres of Land Owned by Vera Kernodle Bullock. (DAUM, SHILOH)
March 15, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney SHILOH A. DAUM on behalf of Defendants 0.11 Acres of Land Owned by Vera Kernodle Bullock, 2.16 Acres of Land Owned by Sandra K. Strader, And Garry D. Strader, 2.19 Acres of Land Owned by Daniel L. Motley, Jr., 5.01 Acres of Land Owned by Raven Lee Broeker And Cathi Jo Broeker (DAUM, SHILOH)
March 12, 2021 Filing 61 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by 0.07 Acres of Land Owned by Cardinal Pipeline Company, LLC. (WILLIAMS, KEVIN)
March 12, 2021 Filing 60 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by 0.15 Acres of Land Owned by John Andrew Kallam And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 0.37 Acres of Land Owned by George Walter Johnson, III And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 0.99 Acres of Land Owned by Melvin Eugene Sheckells And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 1.68 Acres of Land Owned by Kathryn Knapp Collins And James Knapp And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 1.74 Acres of Land Owned by Dora Ann Atha, Eric Dehart, Joseph Dehart, And Lisa A. Brammer And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 2.04 Acres of Land Owned by Public Service Company Of North Carolina And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 2.16 Acres of Land Owned by Carolina Franklin Holliday and Easement Claimed by Transcontinental Gas Pipeline Company, LLC, 2.22 Acres of Land Owned by Mountain Valley Pipeline LLC and Easement Claimed by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 23.17 Acres of Land Owned by Barry S. Frank And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 3.00 Acres of Land Owned by 329 Partners, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 3.68 Acres of Land Owned by James Arthur Quesinberry And Donald Wayne Quiesinberry And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 31.37 Acres of Land Owned by Willow Oaks Plantation, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 4.29 Acres Owned by Caroline Franklin Holliday And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 5.76 Acres of Land Owned by Beatrice E. Cochran; And Barry Cochran And Wife, Deborah V. Cochran And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 5.97 Acres of Land Owned by Mary Nelson Underwood And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 7.32 Acres of Land Owned by Circle Bar D Ranch, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 7.33 Acres of Land Owned by Ranch Properties, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 8.96 Acres of Land Owned by Joyce C. Vaughn Revocable Trust Of 1998, Kenneth Matthew Vaughn, And Debra Riffle Vaughn And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 9.74 Acres of Land Owned by Jackie Burris Johnson And Ted Mack Johnson And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC. (WILLIAMS, KEVIN)
March 5, 2021 Filing 59 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #6 Notice of Condemnation, with Jury Demand , ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , #6 Notice of Condemnation, with Jury Demand by 1.34 Acres of Land Owned by Kenneth Wayne Bates And Georg Ann Bates. (FINAN, CHRISTOPHER)
March 5, 2021 Filing 58 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #6 Notice of Condemnation, with Jury Demand , ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #6 Notice of Condemnation, with Jury Demand by 3.14 Acres of Land Owned by Kenneth Wayne Bates, Georg Ann Bates, Kenneth W Bates Ii, Tracy Bates, Daniel Lee Bates, And Emily Talbott Bates. (FINAN, CHRISTOPHER)
March 5, 2021 Filing 57 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #6 Notice of Condemnation,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, with Jury Demand , ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #6 Notice of Condemnation,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, with Jury Demand by 0.33 Acres of Land Owned by Daniel Lee Bates and Emily Talbott Bates. (FINAN, CHRISTOPHER)
March 5, 2021 Filing 56 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #6 Notice of Condemnation, with Jury Demand , ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #6 Notice of Condemnation, with Jury Demand by 4.37 Acres Owned by Kenneth R. Hayes And Teresa G. Hayes, 4.98 Acres of Land Owned by Kenneth R. Hayes And Teresa G. Hayes. (FINAN, CHRISTOPHER)
March 4, 2021 Filing 55 NOTICE by MOUNTAIN VALLEY PIPELINE, LLC Certificate for Service by Publication Under Rule 71.1(d)(3)(B)(i) (CROOK, MICHAEL)
March 4, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ZACHARY WAYNE GREEN on behalf of Defendants 0.33 Acres of Land Owned by Daniel Lee Bates and Emily Talbott Bates, 1.34 Acres of Land Owned by Kenneth Wayne Bates And Georg Ann Bates, 3.14 Acres of Land Owned by Kenneth Wayne Bates, Georg Ann Bates, Kenneth W Bates Ii, Tracy Bates, Daniel Lee Bates, And Emily Talbott Bates, 4.37 Acres Owned by Kenneth R. Hayes And Teresa G. Hayes, 4.98 Acres of Land Owned by Kenneth R. Hayes And Teresa G. Hayes (GREEN, ZACHARY)
March 3, 2021 Filing 53 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by 6.18 Acres of Land Owned by John P. McMichael and Susan L. McMichael. (KESHIAN, RICHARD)
February 24, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney STEVEN C. NEWTON, II on behalf of Defendant 3.14 Acres of Land Owned by Teresa Ann Clayton Freeman, Hugh W. Freeman, And Coggins Stone Street, LLC (NEWTON, STEVEN)
February 17, 2021 Filing 51 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney CHRISTINA E. LOLLAR on behalf of Defendant 0.06 Acres of Land Owned by April Marie Stanfield and Ronald Stanfield (LOLLAR, CHRISTINA)
February 17, 2021 Filing 50 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #6 Notice of Condemnation, with Jury Demand , ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #6 Notice of Condemnation, with Jury Demand by 0.06 Acres of Land Owned by April Marie Stanfield and Ronald Stanfield. (LOLLAR, CHRISTINA)
February 16, 2021 Filing 49 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by 0.31 Acres of Land Owned by Eric Kass and Brittney Kass, 0.50 Acres of Land Owned by Larry D. Shambley and Donna S. Shambley, 1.20 Acres of Land Owned by Torrey L. Roach and Amanda R. Roach, 1.37 Acres of Land Owned by Robert J. Mullis and Connie R. Mullis, 1.93 Acres of Land Owned by Lori Dyer Webster Or Lori D. Webster And R. Alan Dyer, Co-Trustees Of The Robert W. Dyer And Betty B. Dyer Irrevocable Trust, Dated November 4, 2014, And The Robert W. Dyer, 16.41 Acres of Land Owned by Alvin Herbin And Virginia B. Herbin, 2.01 Acres of Land Owned By Fred L. Lehman And Carol S. Lehman, 2.13 Acres of Land Owned by Daniel A. Hughes and Margaret M. Hughes, 2.94 Acres of Land Owned by The Verlie J. Hall Revocable Trust Dated 21st Day Of January, 2002 And Frank C. Hall, Trustee Of The Verlie J. Hall Revocable Trust Dated 21st Day Of January, 2002, 3.64 Acres of Land Owned by Michael Glenn Wallace and Paula Rochelle Wallace, 4.32 Acres of Land Owned by Lloyd G. Tucker Sr. And Faye Isley Tucker, And Lloyd G. Tucker Jr.;, 4.79 Acres of Land Owned by The Robert W. Dyer And Betty B. Dyer Irrevocable Trust, Dated November 4, 2014; Lori D. Webster, Co-Trustee Of The Robert W. Dyer And Betty B. Dyer Irrevocable Trust, Dated, 4.90 Acres of Land Owned by Michael Stephen Madren and Patsy Madren, 6.22 Acres of Land Owned by Wayne S. Apple, 8.34 Acres of Land Owned by Esther P. Blanchard, Perry Blanchard Slade, Jack Daniel Slade, Dayle Driver Blanchard, Marsha Blanchard Hicks, Lee Hicks, Morgan Lindsey Blanchard, 9.66 Acres of Land Owned by Howard L. Dunn, Jr. And Patricia L. Dunn. (JOHNS, CHRISTOPHER)
February 16, 2021 Filing 48 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant 3.32 Acres of Land Owned by Thomas Weaver Construction Company, Inc.. (LOLLAR, CHRISTINA)
February 16, 2021 Filing 47 RESPONSE by Defendant 1.44 Acres of Land Owned by Janie H. Tew, Jerry Hicks, Toni Hicks, And Tricia Cronk re #6 Notice of Condemnation. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back)(Taylor, Abby)
February 16, 2021 Filing 46 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by 2.31 Acres of Land Owned by Renee Womack. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back)(Taylor, Abby)
February 16, 2021 Filing 45 Notice of Signed Pro Se Electronic Service Consent by 2.31 Acres of Land Owned by Renee Womack. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(Taylor, Abby)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #41 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for 0.11 Acres of Land Owned by Vera Kernodle Bullock; 2.16 Acres of Land Owned by Sandra K. Strader, And Garry D. Strader; 2.19 Acres of Land Owned by Daniel L. Motley, Jr.; and 5.01 Acres of Land Owned by Raven Lee Broeker And Cathi Jo Broeker. Answer due by 3/15/2021. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 2/16/2021. (Brubaker, John)
February 15, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney CHRISTEN M. HEBERT on behalf of Defendants 1.20 Acres of Land Owned by Torrey L. Roach and Amanda R. Roach, 1.37 Acres of Land Owned by Robert J. Mullis and Connie R. Mullis ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-2987781.) (HEBERT, CHRISTEN)
February 15, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney CHRISTOPHER S. JOHNS on behalf of Defendants 1.20 Acres of Land Owned by Torrey L. Roach and Amanda R. Roach, 1.37 Acres of Land Owned by Robert J. Mullis and Connie R. Mullis ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-2987780.) (JOHNS, CHRISTOPHER)
February 15, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney DONAVAN J. HYLARIDES on behalf of Defendants 1.20 Acres of Land Owned by Torrey L. Roach and Amanda R. Roach, 1.37 Acres of Land Owned by Robert J. Mullis and Connie R. Mullis (HYLARIDES, DONAVAN)
February 15, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by 0.11 Acres of Land Owned by Vera Kernodle Bullock, 2.16 Acres of Land Owned by Sandra K. Strader, And Garry D. Strader, 2.19 Acres of Land Owned by Daniel L. Motley, Jr., 5.01 Acres of Land Owned by Raven Lee Broeker And Cathi Jo Broeker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Extending Time to Answer)(ALTMAN, DURWOOD)
February 15, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney SCOTT F. WYATT on behalf of Defendants 1.20 Acres of Land Owned by Torrey L. Roach and Amanda R. Roach, 1.37 Acres of Land Owned by Robert J. Mullis and Connie R. Mullis (WYATT, SCOTT)
February 12, 2021 Filing 39 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #6 Notice of Condemnation, with Jury Demand , ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #6 Notice of Condemnation, with Jury Demand by 2.45 Acres of Land Owned by Aimee Smith Tilley And Stephen Edward Smith Ii, Anne Fairchild Cannon, Susie Fairchild Cole, Lucile Fairchild Thienemann, Martha Anne Fairchild, Rose Tiller Mcmichael, And. (LOLLAR, CHARLES)
February 12, 2021 Filing 38 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #6 Notice of Condemnation, with Jury Demand , ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #6 Notice of Condemnation, with Jury Demand by 0.36 Acres of Land Owned by Samantha Hatt. (LOLLAR, CHARLES)
February 12, 2021 Filing 37 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #6 Notice of Condemnation, with Jury Demand , ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #6 Notice of Condemnation, with Jury Demand by 1.44 Acres of Land Owned by Janie H. Tew, Jerry Hicks, Toni Hicks, And Tricia Cronk. (LOLLAR, CHARLES)
February 12, 2021 Filing 36 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #6 Notice of Condemnation, with Jury Demand , ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #6 Notice of Condemnation, with Jury Demand by 0.30 Acres of Land Owned by Charles A. Jones and Deborah A. Jones. (LOLLAR, CHARLES)
February 12, 2021 Filing 35 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #6 Notice of Condemnation, with Jury Demand , ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #6 Notice of Condemnation, with Jury Demand by 3.32 Acres of Land Owned by Thomas Weaver Construction Company, Inc. (LOLLAR, CHARLES)
February 12, 2021 Filing 34 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #6 Notice of Condemnation, with Jury Demand , ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #6 Notice of Condemnation, with Jury Demand by 3.23 Acres of Land Owned by Edith Kernodle Khateeb and Hashim A. Khateeb. (LOLLAR, CHARLES)
February 12, 2021 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #6 Notice of Condemnation, with Jury Demand , ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #6 Notice of Condemnation, with Jury Demand by 3.04 Acres of Land Owned by The David K. Naylor 2014 Trust, U/T/A Dated August 27, 2014; David K. Naylor As Trustee Of The David K. Naylor 2014 Trust U/T/A Dated August 27, 2014; The David K. And Pame. (LOLLAR, CHARLES)
February 12, 2021 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant 0.07 Acres of Land Owned by Cardinal Pipeline Company, LLC (WILLIAMS, KEVIN)
February 12, 2021 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendants 0.15 Acres of Land Owned by John Andrew Kallam And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 0.37 Acres of Land Owned by George Walter Johnson, III And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 0.99 Acres of Land Owned by Melvin Eugene Sheckells And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 1.68 Acres of Land Owned by Kathryn Knapp Collins And James Knapp And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 1.74 Acres of Land Owned by Dora Ann Atha, Eric Dehart, Joseph Dehart, And Lisa A. Brammer And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 2.04 Acres of Land Owned by Public Service Company Of North Carolina And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 2.16 Acres of Land Owned by Carolina Franklin Holliday and Easement Claimed by Transcontinental Gas Pipeline Company, LLC, 2.22 Acres of Land Owned by Mountain Valley Pipeline LLC and Easement Claimed by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 23.17 Acres of Land Owned by Barry S. Frank And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 3.00 Acres of Land Owned by 329 Partners, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 3.68 Acres of Land Owned by James Arthur Quesinberry And Donald Wayne Quiesinberry And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 31.37 Acres of Land Owned by Willow Oaks Plantation, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 4.29 Acres Owned by Caroline Franklin Holliday And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 5.76 Acres of Land Owned by Beatrice E. Cochran; And Barry Cochran And Wife, Deborah V. Cochran And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 5.97 Acres of Land Owned by Mary Nelson Underwood And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 7.32 Acres of Land Owned by Circle Bar D Ranch, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 7.33 Acres of Land Owned by Ranch Properties, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 8.96 Acres of Land Owned by Joyce C. Vaughn Revocable Trust Of 1998, Kenneth Matthew Vaughn, And Debra Riffle Vaughn And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 9.74 Acres of Land Owned by Jackie Burris Johnson And Ted Mack Johnson And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC (WILLIAMS, KEVIN)
February 12, 2021 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #6 Notice of Condemnation, with Jury Demand by 1.08 Acres of Land Owned by Robert F. Rhodes. (LOLLAR, CHARLES)
February 12, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney BRADLEY CRAIG FRIESEN on behalf of Defendant 2.37 Acres of Land Owned by Marie Olivia Bass Revocable Trust U/A Dated April 9, 2015 And Marie Olivia Bass, Trustee For The Marie Olivia Bass Revocable Trust U/A Dated April 9, 2015 (FRIESEN, BRADLEY)
February 12, 2021 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant 3.14 Acres of Land Owned by Teresa Ann Clayton Freeman, Hugh W. Freeman, And Coggins Stone Street, LLC (WARD, JOHN)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for 1.34 Acres of Land Owned by Kenneth Wayne Bates And Georg Ann Bates; 3.14 Acres of Land Owned by Kenneth Wayne Bates, Georg Ann Bates, Kenneth W Bates Ii, Tracy Bates, Daniel Lee Bates, And Emily Talbott Bates; and 4.37 Acres Owned by Kenneth R. Hayes And Teresa G. Hayes. Answer due by 3/6/2021. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 2/12/2021. (Brubaker, John)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for Cardinal Pipeline Company, LLC and Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC. Answer due by 3/14/2021. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 2/12/2021. (Brubaker, John)
February 11, 2021 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #6 Notice of Condemnation with Jury Demand by 1.02 Acres of Land Owned by Mark R. Hall and Lisa H. Hall. (LOLLAR, CHARLES) Modified on 2/12/2021 to remove duplicate text. (Garland, Leah)
February 11, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney CHARLES M. LOLLAR, SR on behalf of Defendants 0.30 Acres of Land Owned by Charles A. Jones and Deborah A. Jones, 0.36 Acres of Land Owned by Samantha Hatt, 1.02 Acres of Land Owned by Mark R. Hall and Lisa H. Hall, 1.08 Acres of Land Owned by Robert F. Rhodes, 1.44 Acres of Land Owned by Janie H. Tew, Jerry Hicks, Toni Hicks, And Tricia Cronk, 2.45 Acres of Land Owned by Aimee Smith Tilley And Stephen Edward Smith Ii, Anne Fairchild Cannon, Susie Fairchild Cole, Lucile Fairchild Thienemann, Martha Anne Fairchild, Rose Tiller Mcmichael, And, 3.23 Acres of Land Owned by Edith Kernodle Khateeb and Hashim A. Khateeb, 3.32 Acres of Land Owned by Thomas Weaver Construction Company, Inc., Select Role Type Charles M Lollar (LOLLAR, CHARLES)
February 11, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney CHRISTINA E. LOLLAR on behalf of Defendants 0.30 Acres of Land Owned by Charles A. Jones and Deborah A. Jones, 0.36 Acres of Land Owned by Samantha Hatt, 1.02 Acres of Land Owned by Mark R. Hall and Lisa H. Hall, 1.08 Acres of Land Owned by Robert F. Rhodes, 1.44 Acres of Land Owned by Janie H. Tew, Jerry Hicks, Toni Hicks, And Tricia Cronk, 2.45 Acres of Land Owned by Aimee Smith Tilley And Stephen Edward Smith Ii, Anne Fairchild Cannon, Susie Fairchild Cole, Lucile Fairchild Thienemann, Martha Anne Fairchild, Rose Tiller Mcmichael, And, 3.04 Acres of Land Owned by The David K. Naylor 2014 Trust, U/T/A Dated August 27, 2014; David K. Naylor As Trustee Of The David K. Naylor 2014 Trust U/T/A Dated August 27, 2014; The David K. And Pame, 3.23 Acres of Land Owned by Edith Kernodle Khateeb and Hashim A. Khateeb, 3.32 Acres of Land Owned by Thomas Weaver Construction Company, Inc. (LOLLAR, CHRISTINA)
February 11, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by 0.33 Acres of Land Owned by Daniel Lee Bates and Emily Talbott Bates, 1.34 Acres of Land Owned by Kenneth Wayne Bates And Georg Ann Bates, 3.14 Acres of Land Owned by Kenneth Wayne Bates, Georg Ann Bates, Kenneth W Bates Ii, Tracy Bates, Daniel Lee Bates, And Emily Talbott Bates, 4.37 Acres Owned by Kenneth R. Hayes And Teresa G. Hayes, 4.98 Acres of Land Owned by Kenneth R. Hayes And Teresa G. Hayes. (FINAN, CHRISTOPHER)
February 11, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ROBERT AKIN BRINSON on behalf of Defendants 0.33 Acres of Land Owned by Daniel Lee Bates and Emily Talbott Bates, 1.34 Acres of Land Owned by Kenneth Wayne Bates And Georg Ann Bates, 3.14 Acres of Land Owned by Kenneth Wayne Bates, Georg Ann Bates, Kenneth W Bates Ii, Tracy Bates, Daniel Lee Bates, And Emily Talbott Bates, 4.37 Acres Owned by Kenneth R. Hayes And Teresa G. Hayes, 4.98 Acres of Land Owned by Kenneth R. Hayes And Teresa G. Hayes (BRINSON, ROBERT)
February 11, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney CHRISTOPHER CHARLES FINAN on behalf of Defendants 0.33 Acres of Land Owned by Daniel Lee Bates and Emily Talbott Bates, 1.34 Acres of Land Owned by Kenneth Wayne Bates And Georg Ann Bates, 3.14 Acres of Land Owned by Kenneth Wayne Bates, Georg Ann Bates, Kenneth W Bates Ii, Tracy Bates, Daniel Lee Bates, And Emily Talbott Bates, 4.37 Acres Owned by Kenneth R. Hayes And Teresa G. Hayes, 4.98 Acres of Land Owned by Kenneth R. Hayes And Teresa G. Hayes (FINAN, CHRISTOPHER)
February 11, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by 0.07 Acres of Land Owned by Cardinal Pipeline Company, LLC, 0.15 Acres of Land Owned by John Andrew Kallam And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 0.37 Acres of Land Owned by George Walter Johnson, III And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 0.99 Acres of Land Owned by Melvin Eugene Sheckells And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 1.68 Acres of Land Owned by Kathryn Knapp Collins And James Knapp And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 1.74 Acres of Land Owned by Dora Ann Atha, Eric Dehart, Joseph Dehart, And Lisa A. Brammer And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 2.04 Acres of Land Owned by Public Service Company Of North Carolina And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 2.16 Acres of Land Owned by Carolina Franklin Holliday and Easement Claimed by Transcontinental Gas Pipeline Company, LLC, 2.22 Acres of Land Owned by Mountain Valley Pipeline LLC and Easement Claimed by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 23.17 Acres of Land Owned by Barry S. Frank And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 3.00 Acres of Land Owned by 329 Partners, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 3.68 Acres of Land Owned by James Arthur Quesinberry And Donald Wayne Quiesinberry And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 31.37 Acres of Land Owned by Willow Oaks Plantation, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 4.29 Acres Owned by Caroline Franklin Holliday And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 5.76 Acres of Land Owned by Beatrice E. Cochran; And Barry Cochran And Wife, Deborah V. Cochran And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 5.97 Acres of Land Owned by Mary Nelson Underwood And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 7.32 Acres of Land Owned by Circle Bar D Ranch, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 7.33 Acres of Land Owned by Ranch Properties, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 9.74 Acres of Land Owned by Jackie Burris Johnson And Ted Mack Johnson And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WILLIAMS, KEVIN)
February 11, 2021 Filing 20 ***FILED IN ERROR***CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendants 0.07 Acres of Land Owned by Cardinal Pipeline Company, LLC, 0.15 Acres of Land Owned by John Andrew Kallam And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 0.37 Acres of Land Owned by George Walter Johnson, III And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 0.99 Acres of Land Owned by Melvin Eugene Sheckells And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 1.68 Acres of Land Owned by Kathryn Knapp Collins And James Knapp And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 1.74 Acres of Land Owned by Dora Ann Atha, Eric Dehart, Joseph Dehart, And Lisa A. Brammer And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 2.04 Acres of Land Owned by Public Service Company Of North Carolina And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 2.16 Acres of Land Owned by Carolina Franklin Holliday and Easement Claimed by Transcontinental Gas Pipeline Company, LLC, 2.22 Acres of Land Owned by Mountain Valley Pipeline LLC and Easement Claimed by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 23.17 Acres of Land Owned by Barry S. Frank And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 3.00 Acres of Land Owned by 329 Partners, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 3.68 Acres of Land Owned by James Arthur Quesinberry And Donald Wayne Quiesinberry And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 31.37 Acres of Land Owned by Willow Oaks Plantation, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 4.29 Acres Owned by Caroline Franklin Holliday And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 5.76 Acres of Land Owned by Beatrice E. Cochran; And Barry Cochran And Wife, Deborah V. Cochran And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 5.97 Acres of Land Owned by Mary Nelson Underwood And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 7.32 Acres of Land Owned by Circle Bar D Ranch, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 7.33 Acres of Land Owned by Ranch Properties, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 8.96 Acres of Land Owned by Joyce C. Vaughn Revocable Trust Of 1998, Kenneth Matthew Vaughn, And Debra Riffle Vaughn And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 9.74 Acres of Land Owned by Jackie Burris Johnson And Ted Mack Johnson And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC (WILLIAMS, KEVIN) Modified on 2/12/2021 to mark as Filed in Error and to remove document from public view. Attorney instructed to properly re-file. (Garland, Leah).
February 11, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney KEVIN GUY WILLIAMS on behalf of Defendants 0.07 Acres of Land Owned by Cardinal Pipeline Company, LLC, 0.15 Acres of Land Owned by John Andrew Kallam And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 0.37 Acres of Land Owned by George Walter Johnson, III And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 0.99 Acres of Land Owned by Melvin Eugene Sheckells And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 1.68 Acres of Land Owned by Kathryn Knapp Collins And James Knapp And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 1.74 Acres of Land Owned by Dora Ann Atha, Eric Dehart, Joseph Dehart, And Lisa A. Brammer And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 2.04 Acres of Land Owned by Public Service Company Of North Carolina And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 2.16 Acres of Land Owned by Carolina Franklin Holliday and Easement Claimed by Transcontinental Gas Pipeline Company, LLC, 2.22 Acres of Land Owned by Mountain Valley Pipeline LLC and Easement Claimed by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 23.17 Acres of Land Owned by Barry S. Frank And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 3.00 Acres of Land Owned by 329 Partners, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 3.68 Acres of Land Owned by James Arthur Quesinberry And Donald Wayne Quiesinberry And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 31.37 Acres of Land Owned by Willow Oaks Plantation, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 4.29 Acres Owned by Caroline Franklin Holliday And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 5.76 Acres of Land Owned by Beatrice E. Cochran; And Barry Cochran And Wife, Deborah V. Cochran And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 5.97 Acres of Land Owned by Mary Nelson Underwood And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 7.32 Acres of Land Owned by Circle Bar D Ranch, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 7.33 Acres of Land Owned by Ranch Properties, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 8.96 Acres of Land Owned by Joyce C. Vaughn Revocable Trust Of 1998, Kenneth Matthew Vaughn, And Debra Riffle Vaughn And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC, 9.74 Acres of Land Owned by Jackie Burris Johnson And Ted Mack Johnson And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC (WILLIAMS, KEVIN)
February 11, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and #6 Notice of Condemnation, with Jury Demand by 3.14 Acres of Land Owned by Teresa Ann Clayton Freeman, Hugh W. Freeman, And Coggins Stone Street, LLC. (WARD, JOHN) Modified on 2/12/2021 to reflect Answer is related to #6 Notice of Condemnation per filer. (Butler, Carol)
February 10, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney CHRISTEN M. HEBERT on behalf of Defendants 0.31 Acres of Land Owned by Eric Kass and Brittney Kass, 0.50 Acres of Land Owned by Larry D. Shambley and Donna S. Shambley, 1.93 Acres of Land Owned by Lori Dyer Webster Or Lori D. Webster And R. Alan Dyer, Co-Trustees Of The Robert W. Dyer And Betty B. Dyer Irrevocable Trust, Dated November 4, 2014, And The Robert W. Dyer, 16.41 Acres of Land Owned by Alvin Herbin And Virginia B. Herbin, 2.01 Acres of Land Owned By Fred L. Lehman And Carol S. Lehman, 2.13 Acres of Land Owned by Daniel A. Hughes and Margaret M. Hughes, 2.94 Acres of Land Owned by The Verlie J. Hall Revocable Trust Dated 21st Day Of January, 2002 And Frank C. Hall, Trustee Of The Verlie J. Hall Revocable Trust Dated 21st Day Of January, 2002, 3.64 Acres of Land Owned by Michael Glenn Wallace and Paula Rochelle Wallace, 4.32 Acres of Land Owned by Lloyd G. Tucker Sr. And Faye Isley Tucker, And Lloyd G. Tucker Jr.;, 4.79 Acres of Land Owned by The Robert W. Dyer And Betty B. Dyer Irrevocable Trust, Dated November 4, 2014; Lori D. Webster, Co-Trustee Of The Robert W. Dyer And Betty B. Dyer Irrevocable Trust, Dated, 4.90 Acres of Land Owned by Michael Stephen Madren and Patsy Madren, 6.22 Acres of Land Owned by Wayne S. Apple, 8.34 Acres of Land Owned by Esther P. Blanchard, Perry Blanchard Slade, Jack Daniel Slade, Dayle Driver Blanchard, Marsha Blanchard Hicks, Lee Hicks, Morgan Lindsey Blanchard, 9.66 Acres of Land Owned by Howard L. Dunn, Jr. And Patricia L. Dunn ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-2984921.) (HEBERT, CHRISTEN)
February 10, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney CHRISTOPHER S. JOHNS on behalf of Defendants 0.31 Acres of Land Owned by Eric Kass and Brittney Kass, 0.50 Acres of Land Owned by Larry D. Shambley and Donna S. Shambley, 1.93 Acres of Land Owned by Lori Dyer Webster Or Lori D. Webster And R. Alan Dyer, Co-Trustees Of The Robert W. Dyer And Betty B. Dyer Irrevocable Trust, Dated November 4, 2014, And The Robert W. Dyer, 16.41 Acres of Land Owned by Alvin Herbin And Virginia B. Herbin, 2.01 Acres of Land Owned By Fred L. Lehman And Carol S. Lehman, 2.13 Acres of Land Owned by Daniel A. Hughes and Margaret M. Hughes, 2.94 Acres of Land Owned by The Verlie J. Hall Revocable Trust Dated 21st Day Of January, 2002 And Frank C. Hall, Trustee Of The Verlie J. Hall Revocable Trust Dated 21st Day Of January, 2002, 3.64 Acres of Land Owned by Michael Glenn Wallace and Paula Rochelle Wallace, 4.32 Acres of Land Owned by Lloyd G. Tucker Sr. And Faye Isley Tucker, And Lloyd G. Tucker Jr.;, 4.79 Acres of Land Owned by The Robert W. Dyer And Betty B. Dyer Irrevocable Trust, Dated November 4, 2014; Lori D. Webster, Co-Trustee Of The Robert W. Dyer And Betty B. Dyer Irrevocable Trust, Dated, 4.90 Acres of Land Owned by Michael Stephen Madren and Patsy Madren, 6.22 Acres of Land Owned by Wayne S. Apple, 8.34 Acres of Land Owned by Esther P. Blanchard, Perry Blanchard Slade, Jack Daniel Slade, Dayle Driver Blanchard, Marsha Blanchard Hicks, Lee Hicks, Morgan Lindsey Blanchard, 9.66 Acres of Land Owned by Howard L. Dunn, Jr. And Patricia L. Dunn ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-2984889.) (JOHNS, CHRISTOPHER)
February 3, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney DONAVAN J. HYLARIDES on behalf of Defendants 0.31 Acres of Land Owned by Eric Kass and Brittney Kass, 0.50 Acres of Land Owned by Larry D. Shambley and Donna S. Shambley, 1.93 Acres of Land Owned by Lori Dyer Webster Or Lori D. Webster And R. Alan Dyer, Co-Trustees Of The Robert W. Dyer And Betty B. Dyer Irrevocable Trust, Dated November 4, 2014, And The Robert W. Dyer, 16.41 Acres of Land Owned by Alvin Herbin And Virginia B. Herbin, 2.01 Acres of Land Owned By Fred L. Lehman And Carol S. Lehman, 2.13 Acres of Land Owned by Daniel A. Hughes and Margaret M. Hughes, 2.94 Acres of Land Owned by The Verlie J. Hall Revocable Trust Dated 21st Day Of January, 2002 And Frank C. Hall, Trustee Of The Verlie J. Hall Revocable Trust Dated 21st Day Of January, 2002, 3.64 Acres of Land Owned by Michael Glenn Wallace and Paula Rochelle Wallace, 4.32 Acres of Land Owned by Lloyd G. Tucker Sr. And Faye Isley Tucker, And Lloyd G. Tucker Jr.;, 4.79 Acres of Land Owned by The Robert W. Dyer And Betty B. Dyer Irrevocable Trust, Dated November 4, 2014; Lori D. Webster, Co-Trustee Of The Robert W. Dyer And Betty B. Dyer Irrevocable Trust, Dated, 4.90 Acres of Land Owned by Michael Stephen Madren and Patsy Madren, 6.22 Acres of Land Owned by Wayne S. Apple, 8.34 Acres of Land Owned by Esther P. Blanchard, Perry Blanchard Slade, Jack Daniel Slade, Dayle Driver Blanchard, Marsha Blanchard Hicks, Lee Hicks, Morgan Lindsey Blanchard, 9.66 Acres of Land Owned by Howard L. Dunn, Jr. And Patricia L. Dunn (HYLARIDES, DONAVAN)
February 3, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney SCOTT F. WYATT on behalf of Defendants 0.31 Acres of Land Owned by Eric Kass and Brittney Kass, 0.50 Acres of Land Owned by Larry D. Shambley and Donna S. Shambley, 1.93 Acres of Land Owned by Lori Dyer Webster Or Lori D. Webster And R. Alan Dyer, Co-Trustees Of The Robert W. Dyer And Betty B. Dyer Irrevocable Trust, Dated November 4, 2014, And The Robert W. Dyer, 16.41 Acres of Land Owned by Alvin Herbin And Virginia B. Herbin, 2.01 Acres of Land Owned By Fred L. Lehman And Carol S. Lehman, 2.13 Acres of Land Owned by Daniel A. Hughes and Margaret M. Hughes, 2.94 Acres of Land Owned by The Verlie J. Hall Revocable Trust Dated 21st Day Of January, 2002 And Frank C. Hall, Trustee Of The Verlie J. Hall Revocable Trust Dated 21st Day Of January, 2002, 3.64 Acres of Land Owned by Michael Glenn Wallace and Paula Rochelle Wallace, 4.32 Acres of Land Owned by Lloyd G. Tucker Sr. And Faye Isley Tucker, And Lloyd G. Tucker Jr.;, 4.79 Acres of Land Owned by The Robert W. Dyer And Betty B. Dyer Irrevocable Trust, Dated November 4, 2014; Lori D. Webster, Co-Trustee Of The Robert W. Dyer And Betty B. Dyer Irrevocable Trust, Dated, 4.90 Acres of Land Owned by Michael Stephen Madren and Patsy Madren, 6.22 Acres of Land Owned by Wayne S. Apple, 8.34 Acres of Land Owned by Esther P. Blanchard, Perry Blanchard Slade, Jack Daniel Slade, Dayle Driver Blanchard, Marsha Blanchard Hicks, Lee Hicks, Morgan Lindsey Blanchard, 9.66 Acres of Land Owned by Howard L. Dunn, Jr. And Patricia L. Dunn (WYATT, SCOTT)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 01/22/2021, that Plaintiff's motion for the appointment of guardian ad litem for A.S.C.S. (Doc. #10 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Taylor, Abby)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that Plaintiff's motion for the appointment of guardian ad litem for Vera Kernodle Bullock (Doc. #8 ) and motion for the appointment of guardian ad litem for Donald L. Brown (Doc. #9 ) are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 01/22/2021.(Taylor, Abby)
January 22, 2021 Filing 11 Supplemental NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by MOUNTAIN VALLEY PIPELINE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Condemnation for MVP Parcel No. NC-AL-089.000 F. Mares, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Condemnation for MVP Parcel Nos. NC-RO-052.000 and NC-RO-053.000 Bill Broadnax)(RAYNAL, CHARLES)
January 20, 2021 Motions Submitted to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: #10 MOTION to Appoint ad Litem for A.S.C.S., #8 MOTION to Appoint ad Litem as to Vera Kernodle Bullock, #9 MOTION to Appoint ad Litem for Donald L. Brown. (Engle, Anita)
January 19, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Sheets, Jamie)
January 15, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint ad Litem for A.S.C.S. by Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RAYNAL, CHARLES)
January 15, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint ad Litem for Donald L. Brown by Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RAYNAL, CHARLES)
January 15, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint ad Litem as to Vera Kernodle Bullock by Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RAYNAL, CHARLES)
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC Certificate for Service by Publication Under Rule 71.1(d)(3)(B)(i) (CROOK, MICHAEL)
January 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Index of Notices of Condemnation, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice to MVF-NC-AL-005.000, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice to MVF-NC-AL-007.000, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice to NC-AL-000.020, #5 Exhibit 5 - Notice to NC-AL-000.045, #6 Exhibit 6 - Notice to NC-AL-000.050, #7 Exhibit 7 - Notice to NC-GU-001.000, #8 Exhibit 8 - Notice to NC-AL-004.000, #9 Exhibit 9 - Notice to NC-AL-005.000, #10 Exhibit 10 - - Notice to NC-AL-018.000, #11 Exhibit 11 - Notice to NC-AL-019.000, #12 Exhibit 12 - Notice to NC-AL-033.000, #13 Exhibit 13 - Notice to NC-AL-036.000, #14 Exhibit 14 - Notice to NC-AL-046.000, #15 Exhibit 15 - Notice to NC-AL-050.000 and NC-AL-050.100AR, #16 Exhibit 16 - Notice to NC-AL-052.000, #17 Exhibit 17 - Notice to NC-AL-060.000, #18 Exhibit 18 - Notice to NC-AL-062.000, #19 Exhibit 19 - Notice to NC-AL-064.000, #20 Exhibit 20 - Notice to NC-AL-077.000, #21 Exhibit 21 - Notice to NC-AL-089.000, #22 Exhibit 22 - Notice to NC-AL-104.000 and NC-AL-106.000, #23 Exhibit 23 - Notice to NC-AL-119.000, #24 Exhibit 24 - Notice to NC-AL-132.100, #25 Exhibit 25 - Notice to NC-AL-134.000, #26 Exhibit 26 - Notice to NC-AL-135.000, #27 Exhibit 27 - Notice to NC-AL-144.000, #28 Exhibit 28 - Notice to NC-AL-145.000, #29 Exhibit 29 - Notice to NC-AL-162.000, #30 Exhibit 30 - Notice to NC-AL-166.000, #31 Exhibit 31 - Notice to NC-AL-186.000, #32 Exhibit 32 - Notice to NC-AL-191.000, #33 Exhibit 33 - Notice to NC-AL-194.000, #34 Exhibit 34 - Notice to NC-AL-195.000, #35 Exhibit 35 - Notice to NC-AL-196.000, #36 Exhibit 36 - Notice to NC-AL-197.000, #37 Exhibit 37 - Notice to NC-AL-198.000, #38 Exhibit 38 - Notice to NC-AL-199.000, #39 Exhibit 39 - Notice to NC-AL-200.000, #40 Exhibit 40 - Notice to NC-AL-211.000, #41 Exhibit 41 - Notice to NC-RO-001.000, #42 Exhibit 42 - Notice to NC-RO-002.000, #43 Exhibit 43 - Notice to NC-RO-004.000, #44 Exhibit 44 - Notice to NC-RO-005.000, #45 Exhibit 45 - Notice to NC-RO-006.000 and NC-RO-006.001AR, #46 Exhibit 46 - Notice to NC-RO-007.000, #47 Exhibit 47 - Notice to NC-RO-011.000, #48 Exhibit 48 - Notice to NC-RO-013.000, #49 Exhibit 49 - Notice to NC-RO-014.000, #50 Exhibit 50 - Notice to NC-RO-015.000, #51 Exhibit 51 - Notice to NC-RO-016.000, #52 Exhibit 52 - Notice to NC-RO-019.000, #53 Exhibit 53 - Notice to NC-RO-021.000, #54 Exhibit 54 - Notice to NC-RO-033.000, #55 Exhibit 55 - Notice to NC-RO-034.000, #56 Exhibit 56 - Notice to NC-RO-035.000, #57 Exhibit 57 - Notice to NC-RO-036.000, #58 Exhibit 58 - Notice to NC-RO-037.000, #59 Exhibit 59 - Notice to NC-RO-038.000, #60 Exhibit 60 - Notice to NC-RO-039.000, #61 Exhibit 61 - Notice to NC-RO-051.000, #62 Exhibit 62 - Notice to NC-RO-052.000 and NC-RO-053.000, #63 Exhibit 63 - Notice to NC-RO-057.000, #64 Exhibit 64 - Notice to NC-RO-066.000, #65 Exhibit 65 - Notice to NC-RO-074.000, #66 Exhibit 66 - Notice to NC-RO-076.000, #67 Exhibit 67 - Notice to NC-RO-079.000, #68 Exhibit 68 - Notice to NC-RO-080.000, #69 Exhibit 69 - Notice to NC-RO-105.000, #70 Exhibit 70 - Notice to NC-RO-106.000, #71 Exhibit 71 - Notice to NC-RO-122.000, #72 Exhibit 72 - Notice to NC-RO-148.505AR, #73 Exhibit 73 - Notice to NC-RO-149.000, #74 Exhibit 74 - Notice to NC-RO-149.100, #75 Exhibit 75 - Notice to NC-RO-149.200AR, #76 Exhibit 76 - Notice to NC-RO-153.000, #77 Exhibit 77 - Notice to NC-RO-154.000, #78 Exhibit 78 - Notice to NC-RO-157.000, #79 Exhibit 79 - Notice to NC-RO-169.000, #80 Exhibit 80 - Notice to NC-RO-174.200, #81 Exhibit 81 - Notice to NC-RO-180.000, #82 Exhibit 82 - Notice to NC-RO-181.000, #83 Exhibit 83 - Notice to NC-RO-185,000)(RAYNAL, CHARLES)
January 15, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC. (RAYNAL, CHARLES)
January 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney KATIE MILLER IAMS on behalf of Plaintiff Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC (IAMS, KATIE)
January 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney MICHAEL J. CROOK on behalf of Plaintiff Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC (CROOK, MICHAEL)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney CHARLES E. RAYNAL, IV on behalf of Plaintiff Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC (RAYNAL, CHARLES)
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-2967458.), filed by Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate Order from FERC, #2 Exhibit 2 - Map for MVF-NC-AL-005.000, #3 Exhibit 3 - Map for MVF-NC-AL-007.000, #4 Exhibit 4 - Map for NC-AL000.020, #5 Exhibit 5 - Map for NC-AL-000.045, #6 Exhibit 6 - Map for NC-AL-00.050, #7 Exhibit 7 - Map for NC-GU-001.000, #8 Exhibit 8 - Map for NC-AL-004.000, #9 Exhibit 9 - Map for NC-AL-005.000, #10 Exhibit 10 - Map for NC-AL-018.000, #11 Exhibit 11 - Map for NC-AL-019.000, #12 Exhibit 12 - Map for NC-AL-033.000, #13 Exhibit 13 - Map for NC-AL-036.000, #14 Exhibit 14 - Map for NC-AL-046.000, #15 Exhibit 15 - Map for NC-AL-050.000 and NC-AL-050.100AR, #16 Exhibit 16 - Map for NC-AL-052.000, #17 Exhibit 17 - Map for NC-AL-060.000, #18 Exhibit 18 - Map for NC-AL-062.000, #19 Exhibit 19 - Map for NC-AL-064.000, #20 Exhibit 20 - Map for NC-AL-077.00, #21 Exhibit 21 - Map for NC-AL-089.000, #22 Exhibit 22 - Map for NC-AL-104.000 and NC-AL-106.000, #23 Exhibit 23 - Map for NC-AL-119.000, #24 Exhibit 24 - Map for NC-AL-132.100, #25 Exhibit 25 - Map for NC-AL-134.000, #26 Exhibit 26 - Map for NC-AL-135.000, #27 Exhibit 27 - Map for NC-AL-144.000, #28 Exhibit 28 - Map for NC-AL-145.000, #29 Exhibit 29 - Map for NC-AL-162.000, #30 Exhibit 30 - Map for NC-AL-166.000, #31 Exhibit 31 - Map for NC-AL-186.000, #32 Exhibit 32 - Map for NC-AL-191.000, #33 Exhibit 33 - Map for NC-AL-194.000, #34 Exhibit 34 - Map for NC-AL-195.000, #35 Exhibit 35 - Map for NC-AL-196.000, #36 Exhibit 36 - Map for NC-AL-197.000, #37 Exhibit 37 - Map for NC-AL-198.000, #38 Exhibit 38 Map for NC-AL-199.000, #39 Exhibit 39 - Map for NC-AL-200.000, #40 Exhibit 40 - Map for NC-AL-211.000, #41 Exhibit 41 - Map for NC-RO-001.000, #42 Exhibit 42 - Map for NC-RO-002.000, #43 Exhibit 43 - Map for NC-RO-004.000, #44 Exhibit 44 - Map for NC-RO-005.000, #45 Exhibit 45 - Map for NC-RO-006.000 and NC-RO-006.001AR, #46 Exhibit 46 - Map for NC-RO-007.000, #47 Exhibit 47 - Map for NC-RO-011.000, #48 Exhibit 48 - Map for NC-RO-013.000, #49 Exhibit 49 - Map for NC-RO-014.000, #50 Exhibit 50 - Map for NC-RO-015.000, #51 Exhibit 51 - Map for NC-RO-016.000, #52 Exhibit 52 - Map for NC-RO-019.000, #53 Exhibit 53 - Map for NC-RO-021.000, #54 Exhibit 54 - Map for NC-RO-033.000, #55 Exhibit 55 - Map for NC-RO-034.000, #56 Exhibit 56 - Map for NC-RO-035.000, #57 Exhibit 57 - Map for NC-RO-036.000, #58 Exhibit 58 - Map for NC-RO-037.000, #59 Exhibit 59 - Map for NC-RO-038.000, #60 Exhibit 60 - Map for NC-RO-039.00, #61 Exhibit 61 - Map for NC-RO-051.000, #62 Exhibit 62 - Map for NC-RO-052.000 and NC-RO-053.000, #63 Exhibit 63 - Map for NC-RO-057.000, #64 Exhibit 64 - Map for NC-RO-066.000, #65 Exhibit 65 - Map for NC-RO-074.000, #66 Exhibit 66 - Map for NC-RO-076.000, #67 Exhibit 67 - Map for NC-RO-079.000, #68 Exhibit 68 - Map for NC-RO-080.000, #69 Exhibit 69 - Map for NC-RO-105.000, #70 Exhibit 70 - Map for NC-RO-106.000, #71 Exhibit 71 - Map for NC-RO-122.000, #72 Exhibit 72 - Map for NC-RO-148.505.AR, #73 Exhibit 73 - Map for NC-RO-149.000, #74 Exhibit 74 - Map for NC-RO-149.100, #75 Exhibit 75 - Map for NC-RO-149.200AR, #76 Exhibit 76 - Map for NC-RO-153.000, #77 Exhibit 77 - Map for NC-RO-154.000, #78 Exhibit 78 - Map for NC-RO-157.000, #79 Exhibit 79 - Map for NC-RO-169.00, #80 Exhibit 80 - Map for NC-RO-174.200, #81 Exhibit 81 - Map for NC-RO-180.000, #82 Exhibit 82 - Map for NC-RO-181.000, #83 Exhibit 83 - Map for NC-RO-185.000)(RAYNAL, CHARLES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOUNTAIN VALLEY PIPELINE, LLC v. EASEMENTS TO CONSTRUCT, OPERATE, AND MAINTAIN A NATURAL GAS PIPELINE OVER TRACTS OF LAND IN ROCKINGHAM COUNTY, GUILFORD AND ALAMANCE COUNTY NORTH CAROLINA INCLUDING:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.93 Acres of Land Owned by John Ray Cole and Ravonda Lynn Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9.74 Acres of Land Owned by Jackie Burris Johnson And Ted Mack Johnson And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC
Represented By: KEVIN GUY WILLIAMS
Represented By: JOHN D. DALE
Represented By: JOHN D. RUSSELL
Represented By: KYLE F. HEUSER
Represented By: RYAN A. PITTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.06 Acres of Land Owned by Susano B. Jaimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.80 Acres of Land Owned by Elizabeth Ann McKinney Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.33 Acres of Land Owned by Ranch Properties, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC
Represented By: KEVIN GUY WILLIAMS
Represented By: JOHN D. DALE
Represented By: JOHN D. RUSSELL
Represented By: KYLE F. HEUSER
Represented By: RYAN A. PITTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.504 Acres of Land Owned by Greenwood Presbyterian Church, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 31.37 Acres of Land Owned by Willow Oaks Plantation, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC
Represented By: KEVIN GUY WILLIAMS
Represented By: JOHN D. DALE
Represented By: JOHN D. RUSSELL
Represented By: KYLE F. HEUSER
Represented By: RYAN A. PITTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.03 Acres of Land Owned by Wade L. Ray and Amber L. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.37 Acres of Land Owned by Robert J. Mullis and Connie R. Mullis
Represented By: SCOTT F. WYATT
Represented By: DONAVAN J. HYLARIDES
Represented By: CHRISTEN M. HEBERT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. JOHNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.68 Acres of Land Owned by James Arthur Quesinberry And Donald Wayne Quiesinberry And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC
Represented By: KEVIN GUY WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.18 Acres of Land Owned by Frances Gwendolyn Underwood Pruitt And Thomas Michael Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4.32 Acres of Land Owned by Lloyd G. Tucker Sr. And Faye Isley Tucker, And Lloyd G. Tucker Jr.;
Represented By: SCOTT F. WYATT
Represented By: DONAVAN J. HYLARIDES
Represented By: CHRISTEN M. HEBERT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. JOHNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5.06 Acres of Land Owned by Dale Frank Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.20 Acres of Land Owned by Torrey L. Roach and Amanda R. Roach
Represented By: SCOTT F. WYATT
Represented By: DONAVAN J. HYLARIDES
Represented By: CHRISTEN M. HEBERT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. JOHNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.13 Acres of Land Owned by Daniel A. Hughes and Margaret M. Hughes
Represented By: SCOTT F. WYATT
Represented By: DONAVAN J. HYLARIDES
Represented By: CHRISTEN M. HEBERT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. JOHNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.51 Acres of Land Owned by Donald L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.33 Acres of Land Owned by South Rock Farm LLC
Represented By: BRADLEY CRAIG FRIESEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.15 Acres of Land Owned by John Andrew Kallam And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC
Represented By: KEVIN GUY WILLIAMS
Represented By: JOHN D. DALE
Represented By: JOHN D. RUSSELL
Represented By: KYLE F. HEUSER
Represented By: RYAN A. PITTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.70 Acres of Land Owned by Feliciano Mares, Anna Burnett McCauley, Jacquelyn McCauley, And Samuel Owen McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.74 Acres of Land Owned by Robert C. Warren, Jr. and Lena Kay Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.06 Acres of Land Owned by April Marie Stanfield and Ronald Stanfield
Represented By: CHRISTINA E. LOLLAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.07 Acres of Land Owned by Cardinal Pipeline Company, LLC
Represented By: KEVIN GUY WILLIAMS
Represented By: JOHN D. DALE
Represented By: JOHN D. RUSSELL
Represented By: KYLE F. HEUSER
Represented By: RYAN A. PITTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.53 Acres of Land Owned by Delmus Sylvester Broadnax; Bill R. Broadnax; Heirs Of Buddy Nathaniel Broadnax; Linda D. Broadnax; Jermaine Broadnax; Donnett Broadnax; Nicole Broadnax; Kimberly Broadnax;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6.22 Acres of Land Owned by Wayne S. Apple
Represented By: SCOTT F. WYATT
Represented By: DONAVAN J. HYLARIDES
Represented By: CHRISTEN M. HEBERT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. JOHNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.13 Acres of Land Owned by 1804-1814 Greenstreet Associates, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.00 Acres of Land Owned by 329 Partners, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC
Represented By: KEVIN GUY WILLIAMS
Represented By: JOHN D. DALE
Represented By: JOHN D. RUSSELL
Represented By: KYLE F. HEUSER
Represented By: RYAN A. PITTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5.71 Acres of Land Owned by South Rock Farm, LLC and Tina L. Pinnix-Broome
Represented By: BRADLEY CRAIG FRIESEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.19 Acres of Land Owned by Jerry Richmond and Penny Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 23.17 Acres of Land Owned by Barry S. Frank And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC
Represented By: KEVIN GUY WILLIAMS
Represented By: JOHN D. DALE
Represented By: JOHN D. RUSSELL
Represented By: KYLE F. HEUSER
Represented By: RYAN A. PITTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.99 Acres of Land Owned by Melvin Eugene Sheckells And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC
Represented By: KEVIN GUY WILLIAMS
Represented By: JOHN D. DALE
Represented By: JOHN D. RUSSELL
Represented By: KYLE F. HEUSER
Represented By: RYAN A. PITTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.68 Acres of Land Owned by Kathryn Knapp Collins And James Knapp And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC
Represented By: KEVIN GUY WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.64 Acres of Land Owned by Michael Glenn Wallace and Paula Rochelle Wallace
Represented By: SCOTT F. WYATT
Represented By: DONAVAN J. HYLARIDES
Represented By: CHRISTEN M. HEBERT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. JOHNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.33 Acres of Land Owned by Daniel Lee Bates and Emily Talbott Bates
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER CHARLES FINAN
Represented By: ROBERT AKIN BRINSON
Represented By: ZACHARY WAYNE GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6.18 Acres of Land Owned by John P. McMichael and Susan L. McMichael
Represented By: RICHARD J. KESHIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.96 Acres of Land Owned by Bret L. Stevens, Jennifer M. Stevens, Timothy G. Stevens, And Teresa S. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.74 Acres of Land Owned by Dora Ann Atha, Eric Dehart, Joseph Dehart, And Lisa A. Brammer And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC
Represented By: KEVIN GUY WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.30 Acres of Land Owned by Charles A. Jones and Deborah A. Jones
Represented By: CHRISTINA E. LOLLAR
Represented By: CHARLES M. LOLLAR, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 8.96 Acres of Land Owned by Joyce C. Vaughn Revocable Trust Of 1998, Kenneth Matthew Vaughn, And Debra Riffle Vaughn And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC
Represented By: KEVIN GUY WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.93 Acres of Land Owned by Lori Dyer Webster Or Lori D. Webster And R. Alan Dyer, Co-Trustees Of The Robert W. Dyer And Betty B. Dyer Irrevocable Trust, Dated November 4, 2014, And The Robert W. Dyer
Represented By: SCOTT F. WYATT
Represented By: DONAVAN J. HYLARIDES
Represented By: CHRISTEN M. HEBERT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. JOHNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.94 Acres of Land Owned by The Verlie J. Hall Revocable Trust Dated 21st Day Of January, 2002 And Frank C. Hall, Trustee Of The Verlie J. Hall Revocable Trust Dated 21st Day Of January, 2002
Represented By: SCOTT F. WYATT
Represented By: DONAVAN J. HYLARIDES
Represented By: CHRISTEN M. HEBERT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. JOHNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4.37 Acres Owned by Kenneth R. Hayes And Teresa G. Hayes
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER CHARLES FINAN
Represented By: ROBERT AKIN BRINSON
Represented By: ZACHARY WAYNE GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.37 Acres of Land Owned by George Walter Johnson, III And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC
Represented By: KEVIN GUY WILLIAMS
Represented By: JOHN D. DALE
Represented By: JOHN D. RUSSELL
Represented By: KYLE F. HEUSER
Represented By: RYAN A. PITTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 8.92 Acres of Land Owned by Second Partners. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.31 Acres of Land Owned by Eric Kass and Brittney Kass
Represented By: SCOTT F. WYATT
Represented By: DONAVAN J. HYLARIDES
Represented By: CHRISTEN M. HEBERT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. JOHNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.43 Acres of Land Owned by Ramona Faye Millner Bankston And Robert Bankston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.12 Acres of Land Owned By Larry Wayne Pinnix And Linda Thompson Pinnix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4.98 Acres of Land Owned by Kenneth R. Hayes And Teresa G. Hayes
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER CHARLES FINAN
Represented By: ROBERT AKIN BRINSON
Represented By: ZACHARY WAYNE GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.16 Acres of Land Owned by Sandra K. Strader, And Garry D. Strader
Represented By: DURWOOD KEVIN ALTMAN
Represented By: SHILOH A. DAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.14 Acres of Land Owned by Kenneth Wayne Bates, Georg Ann Bates, Kenneth W Bates Ii, Tracy Bates, Daniel Lee Bates, And Emily Talbott Bates
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER CHARLES FINAN
Represented By: ROBERT AKIN BRINSON
Represented By: ZACHARY WAYNE GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.11 Acres of Land Owned by Vera Kernodle Bullock
Represented By: DURWOOD KEVIN ALTMAN
Represented By: SHILOH A. DAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.32 Acres of Land Owned by Circle Bar D Ranch, LLC And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC
Represented By: KEVIN GUY WILLIAMS
Represented By: JOHN D. DALE
Represented By: JOHN D. RUSSELL
Represented By: KYLE F. HEUSER
Represented By: RYAN A. PITTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.01 Acres of Land Owned By Fred L. Lehman And Carol S. Lehman
Represented By: SCOTT F. WYATT
Represented By: DONAVAN J. HYLARIDES
Represented By: CHRISTEN M. HEBERT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. JOHNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 16.41 Acres of Land Owned by Alvin Herbin And Virginia B. Herbin
Represented By: SCOTT F. WYATT
Represented By: DONAVAN J. HYLARIDES
Represented By: CHRISTEN M. HEBERT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. JOHNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5.01 Acres of Land Owned by Raven Lee Broeker And Cathi Jo Broeker
Represented By: DURWOOD KEVIN ALTMAN
Represented By: SHILOH A. DAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.04 Acres of Land Owned by The David K. Naylor 2014 Trust, U/T/A Dated August 27, 2014; David K. Naylor As Trustee Of The David K. Naylor 2014 Trust U/T/A Dated August 27, 2014; The David K. And Pame
Represented By: CHRISTINA E. LOLLAR
Represented By: CHARLES M. LOLLAR, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.96 Acres of Land Owned by Heirs Of General O. Totten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.36 Acres of Land Owned by Samantha Hatt
Represented By: CHRISTINA E. LOLLAR
Represented By: CHARLES M. LOLLAR, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9.66 Acres of Land Owned by Howard L. Dunn, Jr. And Patricia L. Dunn
Represented By: SCOTT F. WYATT
Represented By: DONAVAN J. HYLARIDES
Represented By: CHRISTEN M. HEBERT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. JOHNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.04 Acres of Land Owned by Public Service Company Of North Carolina And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC
Represented By: KEVIN GUY WILLIAMS
Represented By: JOHN D. DALE
Represented By: JOHN D. RUSSELL
Represented By: KYLE F. HEUSER
Represented By: RYAN A. PITTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.45 Acres of Land Owned by Aimee Smith Tilley And Stephen Edward Smith Ii, Anne Fairchild Cannon, Susie Fairchild Cole, Lucile Fairchild Thienemann, Martha Anne Fairchild, Rose Tiller Mcmichael, And
Represented By: CHRISTINA E. LOLLAR
Represented By: CHARLES M. LOLLAR, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.50 Acres of Land Owned by Larry D. Shambley and Donna S. Shambley
Represented By: SCOTT F. WYATT
Represented By: DONAVAN J. HYLARIDES
Represented By: CHRISTEN M. HEBERT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. JOHNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.23 Acres of Land Owned by Edith Kernodle Khateeb and Hashim A. Khateeb
Represented By: CHRISTINA E. LOLLAR
Represented By: CHARLES M. LOLLAR, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.31 Acres of Land Owned by Renee Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4.90 Acres of Land Owned by Michael Stephen Madren and Patsy Madren
Represented By: SCOTT F. WYATT
Represented By: DONAVAN J. HYLARIDES
Represented By: CHRISTEN M. HEBERT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. JOHNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.02 Acres of Land Owned by Mark R. Hall and Lisa H. Hall
Represented By: CHRISTINA E. LOLLAR
Represented By: CHARLES M. LOLLAR, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5.97 Acres of Land Owned by Mary Nelson Underwood And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC
Represented By: KEVIN GUY WILLIAMS
Represented By: JOHN D. DALE
Represented By: JOHN D. RUSSELL
Represented By: KYLE F. HEUSER
Represented By: RYAN A. PITTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 8.34 Acres of Land Owned by Esther P. Blanchard, Perry Blanchard Slade, Jack Daniel Slade, Dayle Driver Blanchard, Marsha Blanchard Hicks, Lee Hicks, Morgan Lindsey Blanchard
Represented By: SCOTT F. WYATT
Represented By: DONAVAN J. HYLARIDES
Represented By: CHRISTEN M. HEBERT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. JOHNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.34 Acres of Land Owned by Kenneth Wayne Bates And Georg Ann Bates
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER CHARLES FINAN
Represented By: ROBERT AKIN BRINSON
Represented By: ZACHARY WAYNE GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.96 Acres of Land Owned by Carol Christopher Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4.29 Acres Owned by Caroline Franklin Holliday And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC
Represented By: KEVIN GUY WILLIAMS
Represented By: JOHN D. DALE
Represented By: JOHN D. RUSSELL
Represented By: KYLE F. HEUSER
Represented By: RYAN A. PITTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.08 Acres of Land Owned by Robert F. Rhodes
Represented By: CHRISTINA E. LOLLAR
Represented By: CHARLES M. LOLLAR, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Easements to Construct, Operate, and Maintain a Natural Gas Pipeline Over Tracts of Land in Rockingham County, Guilford County and Alamance County North Carolina Including:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4.79 Acres of Land Owned by The Robert W. Dyer And Betty B. Dyer Irrevocable Trust, Dated November 4, 2014; Lori D. Webster, Co-Trustee Of The Robert W. Dyer And Betty B. Dyer Irrevocable Trust, Dated
Represented By: SCOTT F. WYATT
Represented By: DONAVAN J. HYLARIDES
Represented By: CHRISTEN M. HEBERT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. JOHNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.19 Acres of Land Owned by Daniel L. Motley, Jr.
Represented By: DURWOOD KEVIN ALTMAN
Represented By: SHILOH A. DAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5.76 Acres of Land Owned by Beatrice E. Cochran; And Barry Cochran And Wife, Deborah V. Cochran And Easement Claimed By Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC
Represented By: KEVIN GUY WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.16 Acres of Land Owned by Carolina Franklin Holliday and Easement Claimed by Transcontinental Gas Pipeline Company, LLC
Represented By: KEVIN GUY WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.44 Acres of Land Owned by Janie H. Tew, Jerry Hicks, Toni Hicks, And Tricia Cronk
Represented By: CHRISTINA E. LOLLAR
Represented By: CHARLES M. LOLLAR, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.37 Acres of Land Owned by Marie Olivia Bass Revocable Trust U/A Dated April 9, 2015 And Marie Olivia Bass, Trustee For The Marie Olivia Bass Revocable Trust U/A Dated April 9, 2015
Represented By: BRADLEY CRAIG FRIESEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.36 Acres of Land Owned by A.S.C.S., a minor child
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.32 Acres of Land Owned by Thomas Weaver Construction Company, Inc.
Represented By: CHRISTINA E. LOLLAR
Represented By: CHARLES M. LOLLAR, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.34 Acres of Land Owned by Pamela J. Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.22 Acres of Land Owned by Mountain Valley Pipeline LLC and Easement Claimed by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC
Represented By: KEVIN GUY WILLIAMS
Represented By: JOHN D. DALE
Represented By: JOHN D. RUSSELL
Represented By: KYLE F. HEUSER
Represented By: RYAN A. PITTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.14 Acres of Land Owned by Teresa Ann Clayton Freeman, Hugh W. Freeman, And Coggins Stone Street, LLC
Represented By: STEVEN C. NEWTON, II
Represented By: JOHN B. WARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EASEMENTS TO CONSTRUCT, OPERATE, AND MAINTAIN A NATURAL GAS PIPELINE OVER TRACTS OF LAND IN ROCKINGHAM COUNTY, GUILFORD AND ALAMANCE COUNTY NORTH CAROLINA INCLUDING:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.94 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY THE VERLIE J. HALL REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 21ST DAY OF JANUARY, 2002 AND FRANK C. HALL, TRUSTEE OF THE VERLIE J. HALL REVOCABLE TRUST
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. JOHNS
Represented By: CHRISTEN M. HEBERT
Represented By: DONAVAN J. HYLARIDES
Represented By: SCOTT F. WYATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4.32 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY LLOYD G. TUCKER SE. AND FAYE ISLEY TUCKER AND LLOYD G. TUCKER, JR.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. JOHNS
Represented By: CHRISTEN M. HEBERT
Represented By: DONAVAN J. HYLARIDES
Represented By: SCOTT F. WYATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.70 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY FELICIANO MARES, ANNA BURNETT MCCAULEY, JACQUELYN MCCAULEY AND SAMUEL OWEN MCCAULEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.44 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY JANIE H. TEW, JERRY HICKS, TONI HICKS AND TRICIA CRONK
Represented By: CHARLES M. LOLLAR, SR.
Represented By: CHRISTINA E. LOLLAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 8.92 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY SECOND PARTNERS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.04 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY THE DAVID K. NAYLOR 2014 TRUST, U/T/A DATED AUGUST 27, 2014, DAVID K. NAYLOR AS TRUSTEE
Represented By: CHARLES M. LOLLAR, SR.
Represented By: CHRISTINA E. LOLLAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.93 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY LORI DYER WEBSTER OR LORI D. WEBSTER AND R. ALAN DYER, CO-TRUSTEES OF THE ROBERT W. DYER AND BETTY B. DYER IRREVOCABLE TRUST, DATED NOVEMBER 4, 2014
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. JOHNS
Represented By: CHRISTEN M. HEBERT
Represented By: DONAVAN J. HYLARIDES
Represented By: SCOTT F. WYATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4.79 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY THE ROBERT W. DYER AND BETTY B. DYER IRREVOCABLE TRUST, DATE NOVEMBER 4, 2014; LORI D. WEBSTER, CO-TRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT W. DYER AND BETTY B. DYER IRREVOCABLE TRUST
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. JOHNS
Represented By: CHRISTEN M. HEBERT
Represented By: DONAVAN J. HYLARIDES
Represented By: SCOTT F. WYATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.16 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY JOHN ANDREW KALLAM AND EASTMENT CLAIMED BY TRANSCONTINENTAL GAS PIPELINE COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: JOHN D. DALE
Represented By: JOHN D. RUSSELL
Represented By: KEVIN GUY WILLIAMS
Represented By: KYLE F. HEUSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5.76 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY BEATRICE E. COCKRAN AND BARRY COCHRAN AND WIFE, DEBORAH V. COCKRAN AND EASEMENT CLAIMED BY TRANSCONTINENTAL GAS PIPE LINE COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: JOHN D. DALE
Represented By: JOHN D. RUSSELL
Represented By: KEVIN GUY WILLIAMS
Represented By: KYLE F. HEUSER
Represented By: RYAN A. PITTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.68 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY JAMES ARTHUR QUESINBERRY AND DONALD WAYNE QUESINBERRY AND EASEMENT CLAIMED BY TRANSCONTINENTAL GAS PIPE LINE COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: JOHN D. DALE
Represented By: JOHN D. RUSSELL
Represented By: KEVIN GUY WILLIAMS
Represented By: KYLE F. HEUSER
Represented By: RYAN A. PITTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.68 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY KATHRYN KNAPP COLLINSAND JAMES KNAPP AND EASEMENT CLAIMED BY TRANSCONTINENTAL GAS PIPE LINE COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: JOHN D. DALE
Represented By: JOHN D. RUSSELL
Represented By: KEVIN GUY WILLIAMS
Represented By: KYLE F. HEUSER
Represented By: RYAN A. PITTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.74 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY DORA ANN ATHA, ERIC DEHART, JOSEPH DEHART AND LISA A. BRAMMER AND EASEMENT CLAIMED BY TRANSCONTINENTAL GAS PIPE LINE COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: JOHN D. DALE
Represented By: JOHN D. RUSSELL
Represented By: KEVIN GUY WILLIAMS
Represented By: KYLE F. HEUSER
Represented By: RYAN A. PITTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 8.96 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY JOYCE C. VAUGHN REVOCABLE TRUST OF 1998, KENNETH MATTHEW VAUGHN AND DEBRA RIFFLE VAUGHN AND EASEMENT CLAIMED BY TRANSCONTINENTAL GAS PIPE LINE COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: JOHN D. DALE
Represented By: JOHN D. RUSSELL
Represented By: KEVIN GUY WILLIAMS
Represented By: KYLE F. HEUSER
Represented By: RYAN A. PITTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.53 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY DELMUS SYLVESTER BROADNAX, BILL R. BROADNAX, HEIRS OF BUDDY NATHANIEL BROADNAX, LINDA D. BROADNAX, JERMAINE BROADNAX, DONNETT BROADNAX, NICOLE BROADNAX, KIMBERLY BROADNAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.16 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY SANDRA K. STRADER AND GARRY D. STRADER
Represented By: SHILOH A. DAUM
Represented By: DURWOOD KEVIN ALTMAN
Represented By: RYAN A. PITTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.96 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY BRET L. STEVENS, JENNIFER M. STEVENS, TIMOTHY G. STEVENS AND TERESA S. STEVENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.14 ACRES OF LANCE OWNED BY KENNETH WAYNE BATES, GEORG ANN BATES, KENNETH W. BATES LI, TRACY BATES, DANIEL LEE BATES, AND EMILY TALBOTT BATES
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER CHARLES FINAN
Represented By: ROBERT AKIN BRINSON
Represented By: ZACHARY WAYNE GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.45 ACRES OF LAND OWNED BY AIMEE SMITH TILLEY AND STEPHEN EDWARD SMITH II, ANNE FAIRCHILD CANNON, SUSIE FAIRCHILD COLE, LUCILE FAIRCHILD THIENEMANN, MARTHA ANNE FAIRCHILD, ROSE TILLEY MCMICHAEL
Represented By: CHARLES M. LOLLAR, SR.
Represented By: CHRISTINA E. LOLLAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC
Represented By: KATIE MILLER IAMS
Represented By: MICHAEL J. CROOK
Represented By: CHARLES E. RAYNAL, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?