AYERS v. MONARCH RECOVERY MANAGEMENT, INC.
Plaintiff: SHARON AYERS
Defendant: MONARCH RECOVERY MANAGEMENT, INC.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00127
Filed: February 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 CASE REPORTED SETTLED: Stipulation of Dismissal due by 5/10/2021. (See #13 Notice of Settlement.) (Welch, Kelly)
April 9, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement by SHARON AYERS (SHAPIRO, CRAIG)
April 8, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL on behalf of Defendant MONARCH RECOVERY MANAGEMENT, INC.. STEVEN A. BADER is substituted as counsel for Defendant. Attorney LAURA E. DEAN terminated. (BADER, STEVEN)
March 17, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 4/21/2021 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim)
March 16, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by MONARCH RECOVERY MANAGEMENT, INC.. (METCHO, RONALD)
March 8, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MONARCH RECOVERY MANAGEMENT, INC.. (METCHO, RONALD)
March 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney RONALD M. METCHO, II on behalf of Defendant MONARCH RECOVERY MANAGEMENT, INC. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3002638.) (METCHO, RONALD)
March 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney LAURA E. DEAN on behalf of Defendant MONARCH RECOVERY MANAGEMENT, INC. (DEAN, LAURA)
February 25, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHARON AYERS as to MONARCH RECOVERY MANAGEMENT, INC. served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (SHAPIRO, CRAIG)
February 17, 2021 ***FILED IN ERROR***Receipt of Funds in the amount of $ 5.00., Receipt#NCM053387. (Taylor, Abby) Modified on 2/17/2021, incorrect case. (Taylor, Abby).
February 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney KOURY L. HICKS on behalf of Plaintiff SHARON AYERS (HICKS, KOURY)
February 16, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Sheets, Jamie)
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MONARCH RECOVERY MANAGEMENT, INC. (Sheets, Jamie)
February 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney CRAIG M. SHAPIRO on behalf of Plaintiff SHARON AYERS (SHAPIRO, CRAIG)
February 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MONARCH RECOVERY MANAGEMENT, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-2987718.), filed by SHARON AYERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Collection Letter)(SHAPIRO, CRAIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AYERS v. MONARCH RECOVERY MANAGEMENT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONARCH RECOVERY MANAGEMENT, INC.
Represented By: LAURA E. DEAN
Represented By: STEVEN A. BADER
Represented By: RONALD M. METCHO, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON AYERS
Represented By: CRAIG M. SHAPIRO
Represented By: KOURY L. HICKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?