ASHU v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: NATHALLE ASHU
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC. doing business as TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. and COOPERSURGICAL, INC.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00174
Filed: March 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Filing 12 MDL TRANSFER LETTER to individual Courts and counsel of record re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-12) transferring this action to the Northern District of Georgia. (Daniel, J)
March 17, 2021 Filing 11 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-12) RE: MDL 2974 transferring this action to the Northern District of Georgia for the reasons stated in the order of March 16, 2021. Received and filed on March 17, 2021. (Daniel, J)
March 10, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NATHALLE ASHU as to THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. served on 3/8/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (JONES, GREGORY)
March 10, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NATHALLE ASHU as to COOPERSURGICAL, INC. served on 3/8/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (JONES, GREGORY)
March 10, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NATHALLE ASHU as to TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. served on 3/8/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (JONES, GREGORY)
March 10, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NATHALLE ASHU as to TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC. served on 3/8/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (JONES, GREGORY)
March 10, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NATHALLE ASHU as to TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC served on 3/8/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (JONES, GREGORY)
March 5, 2021 Filing 5 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
March 4, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Hicks, Samantha)
March 3, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Hicks, Samantha)
March 3, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons - TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., #2 Summons - TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, #3 Summons - THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC., #4 Summons - COOPERSURGICAL, INC.) (Hicks, Samantha)
March 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC., Teva Women's Health, Inc. d/b/a Teva Women's Health, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-2998721.), filed by Nathalle Ashu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JONES, GREGORY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ASHU v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC. doing business as TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOPERSURGICAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHALLE ASHU
Represented By: GREGORY LAWING JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?