JONES v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner: TRAVON E. JONES
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2021cv00209
Filed: March 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 Filing 4 JUDGMENT signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 4/9/2021 adopting the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation; that this action is DISMISSED sua sponte without prejudice to the Petitioner filing in the proper district after exhausting any available administrative remedies. (Hicks, Samantha)
April 8, 2021 CASE REFERRED RE: #2 RECOMMENDED RULING - MAGISTRATE JUDGE, to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Blay, Debbie)
March 16, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Mailing Recommendation: Objections to R&R due by 3/30/2021. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 4/2/2021. (Garland, Leah)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 03/15/2021, that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. IT IS THEREFORE RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed sua sponte without prejudice to Petitioner filing in the proper district after exhausting any available administrative remedies. (Garland, Leah)
March 15, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by TRAVON E. JONES. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Garland, Leah)
March 15, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garland, Leah)
March 15, 2021 CASE REFERRED for Screening. (Garland, Leah)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 03/15/2021, that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. (Garland, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JONES v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TRAVON E. JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?