COLLINS v. STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Petitioner: TODD E. COLLINS
Respondent: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Case Number: 1:2021cv00210
Filed: March 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND JUDGMENT as to TODD E. COLLINS, signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 5/11/21, adopting the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation, that the petitioner's petition for a writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241 is DENIED and this action is DISMISSED. (Butler, Carol)
May 10, 2021 CASE REFERRED RE: #3 RECOMMENDED RULING - MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by TODD E. COLLINS to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES (Sanders, Marlene)
April 5, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Mailing Recommendation: Objections to R&R due by 4/19/2021. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 4/22/2021. (Garland, Leah)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 04/05/2021, that the Clerk, at the point a judgment is entered, notify Petitioner of the filing, dismissal, and entry of judgment. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Petitioner's petition for a writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241 be denied and that judgment be entered dismissing the action. (Garland, Leah)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 04/05/2021, that the Clerk, at the point a judgment is entered, notify Petitioner of the filing, dismissal, and entry of judgment. (Garland, Leah)
March 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Change of Address by TODD E. COLLINS (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back)(Taylor, Abby)
March 15, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by TODD E. COLLINS. (Attachments: #1 Wilkes 1-27, #2 Watauga Search 1-10, #3 My Notes 1-7, #4 Additional Notes 1-6, #5 Bond Increase 1-2, #6 Attorney Garland Baker 1-4, #7 Clerk's Email 1-12) (Garland, Leah)
March 15, 2021 Receipt of Funds in the amount of $ 5.00. Receipt number: NCM053650. (Garland, Leah)
March 15, 2021 CASE REFERRED for Screening. (Garland, Leah)
March 15, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garland, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COLLINS v. STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TODD E. COLLINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?