NEAL v. THE STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Petitioner: TORI NEAL
Respondent: THE STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Case Number: 1:2021cv00247
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Filing 5 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by TORI NEAL. (Taylor, Abby)
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by TORI NEAL. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back)(Taylor, Abby)
May 17, 2021 CASE REFERRED for Screening #4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #5 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP (Taylor, Abby)
May 13, 2021 CASE REFERRED RE: #3 Order to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Taylor, Abby)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 04/05/2021, that in forma pauperis status is granted for the solepurpose of entering this Order. The Clerk is instructed to send Petitioner 2254 forms,instructions, and a current application to proceed in forma pauperis. FURTHER that this action be filed, that the current 2254 Petition be stricken, and that this action is stayed for thirty (30) days to allow Petitioner to file a new petition which corrects the defects of the current Petition. FURTHER that Petitioner's Motion (Docket Entry #2 ) to have his Petition be deemed timely is denied without prejudice to the parties litigating the issue of timeliness if Petitioner submits a proper Petition.(Taylor, Abby)
March 26, 2021 CASE REFERRED for Screening (Butler, Carol)
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION entitled "Movant's Verified Notice & Motion for Remedy of Denying & Delaying the Filing of His Habeas Corpus" by TORI NEAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Butler, Carol)
March 25, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by TORI NEAL. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope - Front and Back)(Butler, Carol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEAL v. THE STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TORI NEAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?