HART v. RICCI et al
Plaintiff: RACHEL Y. HART
Defendant: JOHN P. RICCI, SCP DISTRIBUTORS LLC and POOL CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2021cv00343
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Appointing THOMAS C. DUNCAN, as the Mediator pursuant to LR 83.9d(a). Signed by John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Bond, Melisa)
June 15, 2021 TEXT ORDER adopting #15 Joint Rule 26(f) Report. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 06/15/2021. (AULD, L.)
June 15, 2021 MEDIATION SCHEDULING ORDER; Mediation due by 4/1/2022. (Bond, Melisa)
June 15, 2021 Motions Referred: RE: #15 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Garrett, Kim)
June 15, 2021 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines. The parties agree the appropriate case management track for this case designated in LR 26.1(a) is Complex. All discovery due by 4/1/2022. Mediation shall be conducted late in the discovery period. The parties agree that Tom Duncan serve as mediator. Plaintiffs request leave to join additional parties or amend pleadings due by 7/2/2021. Defendants request leave to join additional parties or amend pleadings due by 7/30/2021. The parties do not consent to trial by a Magistrate Judge. ETT: 4-5 days. A jury trial has been demanded. (Daniel, J)
June 14, 2021 Filing 15 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by RACHEL Y. HART.(SCHAEFER, ERIC)
June 10, 2021 Filing 14 REVISED STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES (Winchester, Robin)
May 14, 2021 Filing 13 Defendants' BRIEF re #12 Amended Petition, for Removal. (POOLE, SAMUEL)
May 14, 2021 Filing 12 First AMENDED PETITION for Removal, filed by JOHN P. RICCI, POOL CORPORATION, SCP DISTRIBUTORS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Bossier, #3 Exhibit FS Removal - State)(POOLE, SAMUEL)
May 10, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 6/28/2021 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim)
May 7, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by POOL CORPORATION, JOHN P. RICCI, SCP DISTRIBUTORS LLC. (POOLE, SAMUEL)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 5/6/2021; The defendants have fourteen business days to file either an amended notice of removal which establishes jurisdiction on its face or a brief demonstrating why the original notice of removal or other information of record establishes diversity jurisdiction. If the defendants file a brief, the plaintiff may file a responsive brief within five business days. Briefs shall be no longer than 800 words. In the alternative, the parties may file a stipulation with details of the citizenship of all members of SCP Distributors LLC and Pool Corporation which establishes jurisdiction. Failure to file a stipulation, an amended notice, or a brief will result in remand of the case to the state court or other appropriate action. See 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) (Sheets, Jamie)
May 3, 2021 Filing 8 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
April 30, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
April 30, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to POOL CORPORATION. (Original filed in Rowan County Superior Court, file number 21-CVS-450, issued 3/25/2021 and listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie)
April 30, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to JOHN P. RICCI, SCP DISTRIBUTORS LLC. (Original filed in Rowan County Superior Court, file number 21-CVS-450, issued 3/4/2021 and listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie)
April 30, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by RACHEL Y. HART. (Original filed in Rowan County Superior Court, file number 21-CVS-450, and listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie)
April 30, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by POOL CORPORATION. (POOLE, SAMUEL)
April 30, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SCP DISTRIBUTORS LLC. (POOLE, SAMUEL)
April 30, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-3039837), filed by JOHN P. RICCI, SCP DISTRIBUTORS LLC, POOL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Removal Doc to State Court)(POOLE, SAMUEL)
April 30, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)
April 30, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HART v. RICCI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN P. RICCI
Represented By: SAMUEL H. POOLE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCP DISTRIBUTORS LLC
Represented By: SAMUEL H. POOLE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POOL CORPORATION
Represented By: SAMUEL H. POOLE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RACHEL Y. HART
Represented By: ERIC R. SCHAEFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?