AJNI, LLC v. TERGUS PHARMA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: AJNI, LLC
Defendant: STIRRUP CREEK, LLC and TERGUS PHARMA, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00345
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TERGUS PHARMA, LLC. (SLATER, SAMUEL)
June 22, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STIRRUP CREEK, LLC. (SLATER, SAMUEL)
June 22, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , Counterclaim against by STIRRUP CREEK, LLC, TERGUS PHARMA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 3-14-20 Commitment Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Purchase Order, #3 Exhibit C - Purchase Order, #4 Exhibit D - Quotation, #5 Exhibit E - Quotation, #6 Exhibit F - Project Timeline)(SLATER, SAMUEL)
June 17, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to TERGUS PHARMA, LLC served on 5/11/2021, answer due 6/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(DURR, WILLIAM)
June 17, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to STIRRUP CREEK, LLC served on 5/12/2021, answer due 6/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DURR, WILLIAM)
May 18, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by STIRRUP CREEK, LLC, TERGUS PHARMA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SLATER, SAMUEL)
May 18, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney SAMUEL A. SLATER on behalf of Defendants STIRRUP CREEK, LLC, TERGUS PHARMA, LLC (SLATER, SAMUEL)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for STIRRUP CREEK, LLC and TERGUS PHARMA, LLC. Answer due by 6/22/2021. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 5/18/2021. (Brubaker, John)
May 3, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie)
April 30, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
April 30, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to TERGUS PHARMA, LLC, STIRRUP CREEK, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Stirrup Creek, LLC) (Sheets, Jamie)
April 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney WILLIAM S. DURR on behalf of Plaintiff AJNI, LLC (DURR, WILLIAM)
April 30, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AJNI, LLC. (DURR, WILLIAM)
April 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-3040075.), filed by AJNI, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Panel Quote, #2 Exhibit B - Casework Quotes, #3 Exhibit C - Terms & Conditions, #4 Exhibit D - Claim of Lien)(DURR, WILLIAM)
April 30, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AJNI, LLC v. TERGUS PHARMA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STIRRUP CREEK, LLC
Represented By: SAMUEL A. SLATER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERGUS PHARMA, LLC
Represented By: SAMUEL A. SLATER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AJNI, LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM S. DURR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?