CAROLINA FINANCIAL SECURITIES, LLC v. T3 COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Plaintiff: CAROLINA FINANCIAL SECURITIES, LLC
Defendant: T3 COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00408
Filed: May 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Appointing WILLIAM A. BLANCATO, as the Mediator pursuant to LR 83.9d(a). Signed by John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Bond, Melisa)
July 12, 2021 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery shall be placed on the COMPLEX case-management track established in L.R. 26.1. Plaintiff's Amended Pleadings due by 10/15/2021. Defendant's Amended Pleadings due by 11/15/2021. Discovery due by 1/17/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 3/17/2022. Joinder of Parties for Plaintiff due by 10/15/2021. Joinder of Parties for Defendant due by 11/15/2021. The Parties agree that the mediator shall be Bill Blancato. The Parties do not consent to the appointment of a magistrate judge or master to this case. Trial of this action is expected to take approximately three (3) days. A jury trial has been demanded. (Taylor, Abby)
July 12, 2021 MEDIATION SCHEDULING ORDER; Mediation due by 9/15/2021. (Bond, Melisa)
July 11, 2021 TEXT ORDER adopting #10 Amended Consent Rule 26(f) Report with the following modification: the deadlines in Paragraph 2.h. for service of reports from retained experts also apply to any expert disclosures under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2)(C). Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 07/11/2021. (AULD, L.)
July 11, 2021 TEXT ORDER adopting #9 Report for the Filing of Sealed Documents pursuant to Local Rule 5.5. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 07/11/2021. (AULD, L.)
July 9, 2021 Motions Referred: RE: #9 L.R. 5.5 Report-Joint filed by all parties, #10 Amended Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Garrett, Kim)
July 8, 2021 Filing 10 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by CAROLINA FINANCIAL SECURITIES, LLC.(DEARMAN, JOSHUA)
July 2, 2021 Filing 9 L.R. 5.5 Report-Joint filed by all parties by CAROLINA FINANCIAL SECURITIES, LLC.(NERHOOD, TIMOTHY)
July 2, 2021 Filing 8 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by CAROLINA FINANCIAL SECURITIES, LLC.(NERHOOD, TIMOTHY) Modified on 7/6/2021 requested amended report with dates certain (Garrett, Kim).
June 2, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 7/26/2021 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim)
June 1, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by T3 COMMUNICATIONS, INC.. (DAVIS, CARY)
May 25, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie)
May 24, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
May 24, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to T3 COMMUNICATIONS, INC. (Original filed in Forsyth County Superior Court, file number 21-CVS-2005, issued 4/16/2021 and listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal) Sheets, Jamie)
May 24, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against T3 COMMUNICATIONS, INC., filed by CAROLINA FINANCIAL SECURITIES, LLC. (Original filed in Forsyth County Superior Court, file number 21-CVS-2005, and listed as Exhibit B to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie)
May 24, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by T3 COMMUNICATIONS, INC.. (DAVIS, CARY)
May 24, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against CAROLINA FINANCIAL SECURITIES, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-3054014.), filed by T3 COMMUNICATIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Complaint)(DAVIS, CARY)
May 24, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAROLINA FINANCIAL SECURITIES, LLC v. T3 COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROLINA FINANCIAL SECURITIES, LLC
Represented By: TIMOTHY NERHOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T3 COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Represented By: CARY B. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?