LUNDINTREE, LLC v. AGRISTRUCTURAL SOLUTIONS, LLC
Plaintiff: LundinTree, LLC
Defendant: Agristructural Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00411
Filed: May 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Referring Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 8/26/2021 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #3 before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Garrett, Kim)
July 23, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by AGRISTRUCTURAL SOLUTIONS, LLC. (ANDIA, GILBERT)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by AGRISTRUCTURAL SOLUTIONS, LLC. Answer due 7/24/2021. Signed by Gloria L. Powell on 6/24/2021 on behalf of John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Powell, Gloria)
June 23, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by AGRISTRUCTURAL SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ANDIA, GILBERT)
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to AGRISTRUCTURAL SOLUTIONS, LLC served on 6/2/2021, answer due 6/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(NELSON, ISSAC)
May 25, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
May 25, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to AGRISTRUCTURAL SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Sheets, Jamie)
May 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AGRISTRUCTURAL SOLUTIONS, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-3054701), filed by LUNDINTREE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (NELSON, ISSAC)
May 25, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Sheets, Jamie)
May 25, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LUNDINTREE, LLC v. AGRISTRUCTURAL SOLUTIONS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LundinTree, LLC
Represented By: ISSAC R. NELSON, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agristructural Solutions, LLC
Represented By: GILBERT J. ANDIA, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?