ROSSABI LAW PLLC v. EVERYTHING ICE, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ROSSABI LAW PLLC
Defendant: THE 11 GROUP LLC, LEON A. LEKAI, 11G-EI, LLC, EVERYTHING ICE, INC., ROBERT P. LEKAI, ADDISON ICE LLC, JOHN SHAW BURLEY and EVERYTHING ICE PROPERTIES, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00413
Filed: May 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER issued by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 7/27/2021. The Court suggests to the parties that this case is appropriate for early mediated settlement conference. The Court directs counsel to immediately confer with their clients and then with each other about available dates and an appropriate mediator and strongly encourages the parties to agree to a mediation in the near future. (Winchester, Robin)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney KATIE R. JACOBS on behalf of Defendants JOHN SHAW BURLEY, EVERYTHING ICE PROPERTIES, LLC, EVERYTHING ICE, INC. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3098001.) (JACOBS, KATIE)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney FRIDRIKH V. SHRAYBER on behalf of Defendants JOHN SHAW BURLEY, EVERYTHING ICE PROPERTIES, LLC, EVERYTHING ICE, INC. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3097997.) (SHRAYBER, FRIDRIKH)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Strike #5 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, Attorney-Client Privileged Materials Attached to Plaintiff's Complaint and Amended Complaint by JOHN SHAW BURLEY, EVERYTHING ICE PROPERTIES, LLC, EVERYTHING ICE, INC. Response to Motion due by 8/16/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (RULEY, DANIEL)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 BRIEF re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Defendants JOHN SHAW BURLEY, EVERYTHING ICE PROPERTIES, LLC, EVERYTHING ICE, INC. filed by JOHN SHAW BURLEY, EVERYTHING ICE PROPERTIES, LLC, EVERYTHING ICE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Appendix) (RULEY, DANIEL)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by JOHN SHAW BURLEY, EVERYTHING ICE PROPERTIES, LLC, EVERYTHING ICE, INC.. Response to Motion due by 8/16/2021 (RULEY, DANIEL)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Complaint,, by 11G-EI, LLC, ADDISON ICE LLC, LEON A. LEKAI, ROBERT P. LEKAI, THE 11 GROUP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Motion for Extension of Time To Answer)(WENDLING, GREGORY)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint for 11G-EI, LLC; ADDISON ICE LLC; LEON A. LEKAI; ROBERT P. LEKAI; and THE 11 GROUP LLC. Answer due by 8/2/2021. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 7/12/2021. (Brubaker, John)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 7/7/2021; that the Consent Motion for Extension of Time [Doc. #15 ] is GRANTED, and Defendants Everything Ice, Inc., and Everything Ice Properties, LLC, shall be allowed to and including July 26, 2021, to respond to the Amended Complaint. (Sheets, Jamie)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Complaint,, by JOHN SHAW BURLEY, EVERYTHING ICE PROPERTIES, LLC, EVERYTHING ICE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RULEY, DANIEL)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Motions Referred: RE: #15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Complaint to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Sanders, Marlene)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REVISED STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES (Winchester, Robin)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE of SUMMONS by ROSSABI LAW PLLC. JOHN SHAW BURLEY waiver sent on 5/25/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (ROSSABI, AMIEL)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to EVERYTHING ICE, INC. served on 5/28/2021, answer due 6/18/2021. (ROSSABI, AMIEL)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to EVERYTHING ICE PROPERTIES, LLC served on 5/28/2021, answer due 6/18/2021. (ROSSABI, AMIEL)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE of SUMMONS by ROSSABI LAW PLLC. ROBERT P. LEKAI waiver sent on 5/25/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (ROSSABI, AMIEL)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE of SUMMONS by ROSSABI LAW PLLC. LEON A. LEKAI waiver sent on 5/25/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (ROSSABI, AMIEL)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE of SUMMONS by ROSSABI LAW PLLC. ADDISON ICE LLC waiver sent on 5/25/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (ROSSABI, AMIEL)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE of SUMMONS by ROSSABI LAW PLLC. 11G-EI, LLC waiver sent on 5/25/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (ROSSABI, AMIEL)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE of SUMMONS by ROSSABI LAW PLLC. THE 11 GROUP LLC waiver sent on 5/25/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (ROSSABI, AMIEL)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants, filed by ROSSABI LAW PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Comprehensive Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - 1.6.2021 L. Lekai email to Rossabi, Burley and R. Lekai, #3 Exhibit C - 5.14.2021 email from L. Lekai, #4 Exhibit D - Emails re Magic Ice Deal, #5 Exhibit E - 5.16.2021 email, #6 Exhibit F - 5.20.2021 email, #7 Exhibit G - 5.20.2021 Shrayber email, #8 Exhibit H - 5.21.2021 Rossabi email to Shrayber, #9 Exhibit I - 5.21.2021 email from L. Lekai to Burley, Rossabi and Reardon, #10 Exhibit J - 5.21.2021 Shrayber email to L. Lekai, #11 Exhibit K - 5.22.2021 Rossabi email to Shrayber)(ROSSABI, AMIEL)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Everything Ice Properties, LLC, #2 Summons - John Shaw Burley, #3 Summons - 11G-EI, LLC, #4 Summons - Addison Ice LLC, #5 Summons - Robert P. Lekai, #6 Summons - Leon A. Lekai, #7 Summons - The 11 Group LLC) (Sheets, Jamie)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-3054839), filed by ROSSABI LAW PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Comprehensive Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - 1.6.2021 L. Lekai email to Rossabi, Burley and R. Lekai, #3 Exhibit C - 5.14.2021 email from L. Lekai, #4 Exhibit D - Emails re Magic Ice Deal, #5 Exhibit E - 5.16.2021 email, #6 Exhibit F - 5.20.2021 email, #7 Exhibit G - 5.20.2021 Shrayber email, #8 Exhibit H - 5.21.2021 Rossabi email to Shrayber, #9 Exhibit I - 5.21.2021 email from L. Lekai to Burley, Rossabi and Reardon, #10 Exhibit J - 5.21.2021 Shrayber email to L. Lekai, #11 Exhibit K - 5.22.2021 Rossabi email to Shrayber, #12 Civil Cover Sheet) (ROSSABI, AMIEL)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Sheets, Jamie)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROSSABI LAW PLLC v. EVERYTHING ICE, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE 11 GROUP LLC
Represented By: GREGORY A. WENDLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEON A. LEKAI
Represented By: GREGORY A. WENDLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 11G-EI, LLC
Represented By: GREGORY A. WENDLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVERYTHING ICE, INC.
Represented By: DANIEL ALAN M. RULEY
Represented By: FRIDRIKH V. SHRAYBER
Represented By: KATIE R. JACOBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT P. LEKAI
Represented By: GREGORY A. WENDLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADDISON ICE LLC
Represented By: GREGORY A. WENDLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN SHAW BURLEY
Represented By: DANIEL ALAN M. RULEY
Represented By: FRIDRIKH V. SHRAYBER
Represented By: KATIE R. JACOBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVERYTHING ICE PROPERTIES, LLC
Represented By: DANIEL ALAN M. RULEY
Represented By: FRIDRIKH V. SHRAYBER
Represented By: KATIE R. JACOBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSSABI LAW PLLC
Represented By: AMIEL J. ROSSABI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?