UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CURRENCY $16,000.00 IN U.S.
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: CURRENCY $16,000.00 IN U.S.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00446
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE NON-PARTY on on July 21, 2021 via certified mail with Verified Complaint of Forfeiture, Warrant for Arrest, and Legal Notice as to Leslie Mendoza (ZELLER, BRANDON)
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 WARRANT FOR ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM issued by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 7/7/2021. Certified copy to USAO. (Hicks, Samantha)
June 3, 2021 Filing 2 Application for Warrant for Arrest (), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ZELLER, BRANDON)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture against CURRENCY $16,000.00 IN U.S. (Filing fee), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration) (ZELLER, BRANDON)
June 3, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Sheets, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CURRENCY $16,000.00 IN U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CURRENCY $16,000.00 IN U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: BRANDON D. ZELLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?