LEMONS v. SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST et al
Plaintiff: GARY LEMONS
Defendant: SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST and SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2021cv00452
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 06/30/2021, that this matter is REMANDED to the General Court of Justice, Superior Court Division, for Guilford County, North Carolina. (Garland, Leah)
June 29, 2021 Filing 11 Consent MOTION to Remand to State Court by GARY LEMONS. Response to Motion due by 7/20/2021 (WHITE, ADAM)
June 29, 2021 Motion Submitted to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: #11 Consent MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Engle, Anita)
June 24, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Complaint, (Second Motion) by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Second Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint)(OVERCASH, BRADLEY)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by All Defendants. Answer due 7/2/2021. Signed by Gloria L. Powell on 6/24/2021 on behalf of John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Powell, Gloria)
June 10, 2021 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Complaint, by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint)(OVERCASH, BRADLEY)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA and SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST. Answer due by 6/25/2021. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 6/10/2021. (Brubaker, John)
June 8, 2021 Filing 8 ECF 30 Day Notice as to Attorney DONALD R. VAUGHAN. ECF 30 Day Notice due by 7/8/2021. (Sheets, Jamie)
June 4, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
June 4, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST, SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. Originally filed in Guilford County Superior Court, file number 21-CVS-4742, ISSUED 4/21/2021 and listed as Exhibit 2 to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie)
June 4, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST, SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, filed by GARY LEMONS. (Originally filed in Guilford County Superior Court, file number 21-CVS-4742, and listed as Exhibit 2 to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie)
June 4, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (OVERCASH, BRADLEY)
June 4, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST. (OVERCASH, BRADLEY)
June 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney BRADLEY K. OVERCASH on behalf of Defendants SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST (OVERCASH, BRADLEY)
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against GARY LEMONS ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-3061501.), filed by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Service Letters from NC Insurance Commissioner, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Summonses and Complaint)(OVERCASH, BRADLEY)
June 4, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Sheets, Jamie)
June 4, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEMONS v. SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY LEMONS
Represented By: DONALD R. VAUGHAN
Represented By: PAUL D. COATES
Represented By: ADAM L. WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST
Represented By: BRADLEY K. OVERCASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: BRADLEY K. OVERCASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?