ANTLE v. KIJAKAZI
Plaintiff: KAREN ANTLE
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL and KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2021cv00561
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Reissued as to KILOLO KIJAKAZI, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons - U.S. Attorney, #2 Summons - U.S. Attorney General) (Sheets, Jamie)
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Right to Consent - SSA. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to KILOLO KIJAKAZI, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Sheets, Jamie)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 8/9/2021; that Plaintiff in the above-entitled proceeding be, and is hereby, permitted to commence said proceeding in this Court without prepayment of fees or costs, or giving security therefor. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). Plaintiff is responsible for preparing and delivering to the Clerk, the correct summons for service upon each defendant, including the correct address and the name and title of the individual to be served on behalf of a corporation, association, infant, incompetent, or government agency. Failure to prepare and deliver said summons within 15 days from the filing of this order shall result in this case being dismissed without further notice. Plaintiff is responsible for service of the complaint and summons upon each defendant. (Sheets, Jamie)
August 3, 2021 Motions Referred: RE: #4 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP (long form) (), to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Williamson, Wanda)
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP (long form) () by KAREN ANTLE. (MCGILL, CHRISTA)
July 30, 2021 Motions Referred to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD RE: #3 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 29, 2021 Filing 3 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP () by KAREN ANTLE. (MCGILL, CHRISTA)
July 11, 2021 TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Application and Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal and setting a deadline for the filing of a properly completed pauper application (or payment of the filing fee). Plaintiff did not file a properly completed AO Form 239 or AO Form 240 or otherwise include in #2 Application the information necessary for proper evaluation of her request to proceed as a pauper. Most notably, #2 Application does not provide any information about Plaintiff's regular monthly expenses and Plaintiff left blank the "Yes" or "No" lines in Paragraph 3 of #2 Application that address four of five sources of funds. Plaintiff EITHER shall pay the filing fee OR shall file a properly completed application to proceed as a pauper by 08/02/2021. Failure by Plaintiff to comply with this Text Order will result in the dismissal without prejudice of this action. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 07/11/2021. (AULD, L.)
July 9, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 9, 2021 Motions Referred to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD RE: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by KAREN ANTLE. (MCGILL, CHRISTA)
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL, filed by KAREN ANTLE.(MCGILL, CHRISTA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANTLE v. KIJAKAZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN ANTLE
Represented By: CHRISTA A. MCGILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?