TURNER v. HIGH POINT POLICE DEPT.
Plaintiff: ROBERT TURNER
Defendant: HIGH POINT POLICE DEPT.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00591
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND JUDGMENT signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 9/7/2021 adopting the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation #2 ; that this action is filed and dismissed sua sponte without prejudice to plaintiff filing a new complaint, on the proper 1983 forms, which corrects the defects cited in the Magistrate Judges Recommendation. The plaintiff is reminded that it is his responsibility to keep the Clerk apprised of his current address and to provide a valid mailing address. (Sheets, Jamie)
August 31, 2021 CASE REFERRED RE: #2 RECOMMENDED RULING - MAGISTRATE JUDGE to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES (Winchester, Robin)
August 27, 2021 Filing 5 Envelope Containing #4 Standard Order, addressed to ROBERT TURNER, 1127736 P.O. BOX 2925, PMB 79078, SAN ANTONIO, TX 78299-2925 returned to court by postal service, marked undeliverable because Not Deliverable as Addressed - No Facility Listed. (Sheets, Jamie) (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/27/2021 to show both mailings returned) (Sheets, Jamie)
August 10, 2021 Filing 4 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Winchester, Robin)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Mailing Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 8/23/2021. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 8/26/2021. (Hicks, Samantha)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 8/9/2021; ORDERED that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. The Clerk is instructed to send Plaintiff 1983 forms, instructions, an application to proceed in forma pauperis, and a copy of pertinent parts of Fed. R. Civ. P. 8 (i.e., Sections (a) & (d)). RECOMMENDED that this action be filed and dismissed sua sponte without prejudice to Plaintiff filing a new complaint, on the proper 1983 forms, which corrects the defects cited above if he seeks to file under 1983. (Hicks, Samantha)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 8/9/2021; that in forma pauperis status is granted for the solepurpose of entering #2 Order and Recommendation. (Hicks, Samantha)
August 3, 2021 CASE REFERRED for Screening. (Hicks, Samantha)
July 20, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Hicks, Samantha)
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HIGH POINT POLICE DEPT., filed by ROBERT TURNER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Hicks, Samantha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TURNER v. HIGH POINT POLICE DEPT.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIGH POINT POLICE DEPT.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?