YOUNG v. HOEKSTRA
Petitioner: DANNY WILLIAM YOUNG
Respondent: ERIC A. HOOKS and CASANDRA SKINNER HOEKSTRA
Case Number: 1:2021cv00616
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 JUDGMENT signed by JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, SR on 9/7/2021; that Petitioner's Letter, (Doc. #1 ), is construed as a Petition under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody, and that this action is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Petitioner filing a new petition, correcting the defects set out in the Order and Recommendation. The new petition must be accompanied by either the five dollar filing fee or a current application to proceed in forma pauperis. (Hicks, Samantha)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Mailing Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 8/17/2021. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 8/20/2021. (Taylor, Abby)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 08/04/2021, that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. The Clerk is instructed to send Petitioner 2254 forms, instructions, and a current application to proceed in forma pauperis. RECOMMENDED that this action be construed as a habeas petition under 28 U.S.C. 2254 and dismissed sua sponte without prejudice to Petitioner filing a new petition which corrects the defects of the current Petition. The new petition must be accompanied by either the five dollar filing fee or a current application to proceed in forma pauperis.(Taylor, Abby)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 08/04/2021, that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation re #2 RECOMMENDED RULING - MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Taylor, Abby)
August 3, 2021 CASE REFERRED for Screening (Taylor, Abby)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by DANNY WILLIAM YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back)(Taylor, Abby)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YOUNG v. HOEKSTRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DANNY WILLIAM YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ERIC A. HOOKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CASANDRA SKINNER HOEKSTRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?