UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CURRENCY $65,170.00 IN U.S.
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: CURRENCY $65,170.00 IN U.S.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00706
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE NON-PARTY on October 1, 2021 via certified mail with the Verified Complaint of Forfeiture, Warrant for Arrest, and Legal Notice as to Tyjai Rashann Young (ZELLER, BRANDON)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 SERVICE by Publication filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Served by publication in an official government internet site (www.forfeiture.gov) as to Legal Notice on date(s) September 28, 2021 through October 27, 2021. (ZELLER, BRANDON)
October 5, 2021 Filing 4 USMS Return Executed for Verified Complaint of Forfeiture, Warrant for Arrest, and Legal Notice served on defendant property $65,170.00 in U.S. Currency on September 28, 2021, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (ZELLER, BRANDON)
September 14, 2021 Filing 3 WARRANT FOR ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 9/14/2021. Certified copy forwarded to USAO. (Sheets, Jamie)
September 13, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie)
September 10, 2021 Filing 2 Application for Warrant for Arrest (), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ZELLER, BRANDON)
September 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture against CURRENCY $65,170.00 IN U.S. (Filing fee.), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration)(ZELLER, BRANDON)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CURRENCY $65,170.00 IN U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: BRANDON D. ZELLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CURRENCY $65,170.00 IN U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?