TFORCE WORLDWIDE, INC. v. ESC BRANDS, LLC
Plaintiff: TFORCE WORLDWIDE, INC.
Defendant: ESC BRANDS, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00722
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Filing 10 Notice to Parties RE: SO30. Responses due by 12/13/2021 (Winchester, Robin)
November 1, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 12/13/2021 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim)
October 29, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by ESC BRANDS, LLC. (CUNNINGHAM, JAMES)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for ESC BRANDS, LLC. Answer due by 10/29/2021. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 10/18/2021. (Brubaker, John)
October 15, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ESC BRANDS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Extend Time)(CUNNINGHAM, JAMES)
September 24, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney JEFFREY L. WIDMAN on behalf of Plaintiff TFORCE WORLDWIDE, INC. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3140136.) (WIDMAN, JEFFREY)
September 17, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TFORCE WORLDWIDE, INC.. (TURNER, WILLIAM) (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/17/2021 with flattened document.) (Hicks, Samantha)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney RICHARD A. COUGHLIN on behalf of Plaintiff TFORCE WORLDWIDE, INC. (COUGHLIN, RICHARD)
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ESC BRANDS, LLC. (Sheets, Jamie)
September 17, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Sheets, Jamie)
September 17, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)
September 17, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TFORCE WORLDWIDE, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-3134910.), filed by TFORCE WORLDWIDE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(TURNER, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TFORCE WORLDWIDE, INC. v. ESC BRANDS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TFORCE WORLDWIDE, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM CRAIG TURNER, JR.
Represented By: JEFFREY L. WIDMAN
Represented By: RICHARD A. COUGHLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESC BRANDS, LLC
Represented By: JAMES CALVIN CUNNINGHAM, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?