UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ASSORTED JEWELRY WITH A TOTAL ESTIMATED VALUE OF $1,258,850.00
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: ASSORTED JEWELRY WITH A TOTAL ESTIMATED VALUE OF $1,258,850.00
Case Number: 1:2021cv00761
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 USMS Return Executed for Verified Complaint of Forfeiture, Warrant for Arrest, and Legal Notice served on defendant property Assorted Jewelry with a total estimated value of $1,258,850.00 on October 18, 2021, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (STRUP, NATHAN)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 WARRANT FOR ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 10/5/2021. Certified copy forwarded to USAO. (Sheets, Jamie)
October 4, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Sheets, Jamie)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 Application for Warrant for Arrest (), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(STRUP, NATHAN)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture against ASSORTED JEWELRY WITH A TOTAL ESTIMATED VALUE OF $1,258,850.00 (Filing fee.), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration)(STRUP, NATHAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ASSORTED JEWELRY WITH A TOTAL ESTIMATED VALUE OF $1,258,850.00
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: NATHAN L. STRUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASSORTED JEWELRY WITH A TOTAL ESTIMATED VALUE OF $1,258,850.00
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?