MITCHELL v. ROGERS et al
Plaintiff: JORDAN NATHANIEL MITCHELL
Defendant: SHERRIF ROGERS and R. MANESS
Case Number: 1:2021cv00831
Filed: October 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Filing 5 JUDGMENT signed by CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 11/30/2021 adopting the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation #3 ; that this action is filed and dismissed sua sponte without prejudice to Plaintiff filing a new complaint, on the proper 1983 forms, which is accompanied by the applicable $402.00 filing fee. (Sheets, Jamie)
November 22, 2021 CASE REFERRED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER RE: #3 RECOMMENDED RULING by MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #2 Complaint filed by JORDAN NATHANIEL MITCHELL. (Engle, Anita)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Mailing Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 11/12/2021. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 11/15/2021. (Hicks, Samantha)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 10/29/2021; ORDERED that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. The Clerk is instructed to send Plaintiff 1983 forms, instructions, an application to proceed in forma pauperis, and a copy of pertinent parts of Fed. R. Civ. P. 8 (i.e., Sections (a) & (d)). RECOMMENDED that this action be filed and dismissed sua sponte without prejudice to Plaintiff filing a new complaint, on the proper 1983 forms, which is accompanied by the applicable $402.00 filing fee. (Hicks, Samantha)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #1 Motion for Application to Proceed IFP. Signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 10/29/2021. (Hicks, Samantha)
October 27, 2021 Motions Referred: RE: #1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Hicks, Samantha)
October 27, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Hicks, Samantha)
October 27, 2021 CASE REFERRED for Screening. (Hicks, Samantha)
October 26, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against R. MANESS, ROGERS, filed by JORDAN NATHANIEL MITCHELL. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Hicks, Samantha)
October 26, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by JORDAN NATHANIEL MITCHELL. (Hicks, Samantha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MITCHELL v. ROGERS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORDAN NATHANIEL MITCHELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERRIF ROGERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. MANESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?