LINDSEY v. CURRY
Plaintiff: WILLIAM LINDSEY
Defendant: C. CURRY
Case Number: 1:2021cv00833
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Western; Case Number 3:21-cv-00564. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on initial review of Pltf's #1 Complaint: Pltf's action is transferred to the Middle District of North Carolina; and the Clerk is instructed to terminate this action. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/26/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/27/2021.]
October 27, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Hicks, Samantha)
October 27, 2021 Motions Referred: RE: #2 , to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Hicks, Samantha)
October 27, 2021 CASE REFERRED for Screening. (Hicks, Samantha)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/27/2021.]
October 21, 2021 Filing 2 Pro Se AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) re #1 Complaint by William Lindsey (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ef) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/27/2021.]
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against C. Curry, filed by William Lindsey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ef) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/27/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LINDSEY v. CURRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM LINDSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. CURRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?