FAIRWAY OUTDOOR ADVERTISING, LLC v. CITY OF HIGH POINT
Plaintiff: FAIRWAY OUTDOOR ADVERTISING, LLC
Defendant: CITY OF HIGH POINT
Case Number: 1:2021cv00867
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ANDREW H. ERTESCHIK on behalf of Defendant CITY OF HIGH POINT (ERTESCHIK, ANDREW)
December 16, 2021 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by CITY OF HIGH POINT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DURNOVICH, JOHN)
December 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney JOHN M. DURNOVICH on behalf of Defendant CITY OF HIGH POINT (DURNOVICH, JOHN)
December 16, 2021 Motions Referred: RE: #8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (Winchester, Robin)
December 16, 2021 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by CITY OF HIGH POINT. For good cause shown, Defendant shall have up to and including February 11, 2022 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 12/16/2021.(Lee, Pedra)
December 2, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Certfied Mail as to CITY OF HIGH POINT served on 11/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (WILKERSON, DAVID)
November 11, 2021 Filing 5 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES (Winchester, Robin)
November 10, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Carter, Alexus)
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CITY OF HIGH POINT. (Carter, Alexus)
November 10, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Carter, Alexus)
November 10, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Carter, Alexus)
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FAIRWAY OUTDOOR ADVERTISING, LLC. (WILKERSON, DAVID)
November 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF HIGH POINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-3169696.)(Related Case # 1:18-cv-711), filed by FAIRWAY OUTDOOR ADVERTISING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Signed Tolling Agreement, #2 Exhibit B, Tolling Extension, #3 Exhibit C, Ordinance, #4 Exhibit D, Internal Memoranda, #5 Exhibit E, High Point Denial, #6 Exhibit F, Fairway Objections)(WILKERSON, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FAIRWAY OUTDOOR ADVERTISING, LLC v. CITY OF HIGH POINT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FAIRWAY OUTDOOR ADVERTISING, LLC
Represented By: DAVID MATTHEW WILKERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF HIGH POINT
Represented By: ANDREW H. ERTESCHIK
Represented By: JOHN M. DURNOVICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?