BARTELL v. GRIFOLS SHARED SERVICES NA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: EMILY BARTELL
Defendant: GRIFOLS SHARED SERVICES NA, INC., INTERSTATE BLOOD BANK INC., BIOMAT, USA, INC. and INTERSTATE BLOOD BANK, INC.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00953
Filed: December 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2022 Reset Deadline: BIOMAT, USA, INC. answer due 2/18/2022; GRIFOLS SHARED SERVICES NA, INC. answer due 2/18/2022; INTERSTATE BLOOD BANK INC. answer due 2/18/2022. (Sheets, Jamie)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR on 2/7/2022; that Defendants' motion for extension, (Doc. #20 ), is GRANTED and that Defendants have until February 18, 2022 within which to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint and for filing their response to Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction. (Sheets, Jamie)
February 4, 2022 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, by BIOMAT, USA, INC., GRIFOLS SHARED SERVICES NA, INC., INTERSTATE BLOOD BANK INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (WHISENANT, JEFFERSON) Modified on 2/4/2022 to remove incorrectly linked documents and duplicate text. (Sheets, Jamie)
February 4, 2022 Motions Submitted to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR., re: #20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #2 Complaint and #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Daniel, J)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR on 2/2/2022; that Defendants' motion for extension, (Doc. #18 ), is GRANTED and that Defendants have until February 9, 2022 within which to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint and for filing their response to Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction. (Sheets, Jamie)
January 11, 2022 Motions Submitted to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR., re: #18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, #2 Corrected Document, and #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Daniel, J)
January 6, 2022 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, #2 Corrected Document, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by BIOMAT, USA, INC., GRIFOLS SHARED SERVICES NA, INC., INTERSTATE BLOOD BANK INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WHISENANT, JEFFERSON)
January 6, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney JEFFERSON P. WHISENANT on behalf of Defendants BIOMAT, USA, INC., GRIFOLS SHARED SERVICES NA, INC., INTERSTATE BLOOD BANK INC. (WHISENANT, JEFFERSON)
January 6, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney KEVIN SCOTT JOYNER on behalf of Defendants BIOMAT, USA, INC., GRIFOLS SHARED SERVICES NA, INC., INTERSTATE BLOOD BANK INC. (JOYNER, KEVIN)
December 21, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to BIOMAT, USA, INC. (MYERHOLTZ, ELIZABETH) Modified on 12/21/2021 to add party name. (Sheets, Jamie)
December 21, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to INTERSTATE BLOOD BANK INC. (MYERHOLTZ, ELIZABETH) Modified on 12/21/2021 to add party name. (Sheets, Jamie)
December 21, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to GRIFOLS SHARED SERVICES NA, INC. (MYERHOLTZ, ELIZABETH) Modified on 12/21/2021 to add party name.(Sheets, Jamie)
December 21, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMILY BARTELL as to BIOMAT, USA, INC. served on 12/20/2021, answer due 1/10/2022. (MYERHOLTZ, ELIZABETH)
December 21, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMILY BARTELL as to INTERSTATE BLOOD BANK INC. served on 12/20/2021, answer due 1/10/2022. (MYERHOLTZ, ELIZABETH)
December 21, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMILY BARTELL as to GRIFOLS SHARED SERVICES NA, INC. served on 12/20/2021, answer due 1/10/2022. (MYERHOLTZ, ELIZABETH)
December 17, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney HOLLY A. STILES on behalf of Plaintiff EMILY BARTELL (STILES, HOLLY)
December 17, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Carter, Alexus)
December 17, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons - INTERSTATE BLOOD BANK INC., #2 Summons - BIOMAT, USA, INC.) (Carter, Alexus)
December 17, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Carter, Alexus)
December 16, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff EMILY BARTELL re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by EMILY BARTELL. (MYERHOLTZ, ELIZABETH)
December 16, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by EMILY BARTELL. Response to Motion due by 1/6/2022 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of E. Bartell, #2 Affidavit Declaration of D.B. Holloway, #3 Affidavit Declaration of D. Johnson)(MYERHOLTZ, ELIZABETH)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ELIZABETH L. MYERHOLTZ on behalf of Plaintiff EMILY BARTELL (MYERHOLTZ, ELIZABETH)
December 16, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff EMILY BARTELL (MYERHOLTZ, ELIZABETH)
December 16, 2021 Filing 2 Corrected document re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (MYERHOLTZ, ELIZABETH)
December 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-3195000.), filed by EMILY BARTELL.(MYERHOLTZ, ELIZABETH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BARTELL v. GRIFOLS SHARED SERVICES NA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMILY BARTELL
Represented By: ELIZABETH L. MYERHOLTZ
Represented By: HOLLY A. STILES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRIFOLS SHARED SERVICES NA, INC.
Represented By: KEVIN SCOTT JOYNER
Represented By: JEFFERSON P. WHISENANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERSTATE BLOOD BANK INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIOMAT, USA, INC.
Represented By: KEVIN SCOTT JOYNER
Represented By: JEFFERSON P. WHISENANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERSTATE BLOOD BANK, INC.
Represented By: KEVIN SCOTT JOYNER
Represented By: JEFFERSON P. WHISENANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?