FARRIS v. KIJAKAZI
Plaintiff: JOHN FARRIS
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2022cv00001
Filed: January 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 206 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON GOVERNMENT as to KILOLO KIJAKAZI served on 1/13/2022, answer due 3/14/2022. as to (HALL, CHARLOTTE)
January 10, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent - SSA. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Carter, Alexus)
January 10, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to KILOLO KIJAKAZI, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Carter, Alexus)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 1/10/2022; that the plaintiff in the above-entitled proceeding be, and is hereby, permitted to commence said proceeding in this Court without prepayment of fees or costs, or giving security therefor. [28 U.S.C. 1915(a)] Plaintiff is responsible for preparing and delivering to the Clerk, the correct summons for service on each defendant, including the correct address and the name and title of the individual to be served on behalf of a corporation, association, infant, incompetent or government agency. Failure to prepare and deliver said summons within 15 days from the filing of this order shall result in this case being dismissed without further notice. Plaintiff is responsible for service of the complaint and summons upon the defendant. (Carter, Alexus)
January 10, 2022 Motions Referred to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER RE: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Carter, Alexus)
January 10, 2022 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Carter, Alexus)
January 4, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by JOHN FARRIS. (HALL, CHARLOTTE)
January 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KILOLO KIJAKAZI, filed by JOHN FARRIS.(HALL, CHARLOTTE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FARRIS v. KIJAKAZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN FARRIS
Represented By: CHARLOTTE W. HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?