THE STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA v. ARTICUL8, LLC et al
Plaintiff: THE STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Defendant: ARTICUL8, LLC and PAUL K TALBOT
Case Number: 1:2022cv00058
Filed: January 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2022 Filing 10 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against Defendants Paul K. Talbot and Articul8, LLC signed by Gloria L. Powell on 2/25/2022. (Carter, Alexus)
February 24, 2022 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff THE STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(RABINOVITZ, BRIAN)
February 22, 2022 Filing 8 RESPONSE by Plaintiff THE STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA re #7 Letter from Clerk of Court. (RABINOVITZ, BRIAN)
February 22, 2022 Filing 7 Letter to counsel for Plaintiff as to Defendants Articul8, LLC and Paul K. Talbot, re Answer due 2/17/2022. (Blay, Debbie)
February 1, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to ARTICUL8, LLC served on 1/27/2022, answer due 2/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit Exhibit B)(RABINOVITZ, BRIAN)
February 1, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to PAUL K TALBOT served on 1/27/2022, answer due 2/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A)(RABINOVITZ, BRIAN)
January 26, 2022 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Carter, Alexus)
January 25, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Carter, Alexus)
January 25, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons - ARTICUL8, LLC, #2 Summons - ARTICUL8, LLC, #3 Summons - ARTICUL8, LLC, #4 Summons - PAUL K TALBOT)(Carter, Alexus)
January 25, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney BRIAN D. RABINOVITZ on behalf of Plaintiff STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA ex rel. JOSHUA H. STEIN, Attorney General (RABINOVITZ, BRIAN)
January 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3220401.), filed by STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA ex rel. JOSHUA H. STEIN, Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment)(NAYER, TRACY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA v. ARTICUL8, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: BRIAN D. RABINOVITZ
Represented By: TRACY NAYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARTICUL8, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL K TALBOT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?