UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. 2021 JEEP GRAND CHEROKEE, VIN 1C4RJFAG6MC839058
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: 2021 JEEP GRAND CHEROKEE, VIN 1C4RJFAG6MC839058
Case Number: 1:2022cv00083
Filed: January 31, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 0981 Civil Forfeiture - Gambling, etc.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2022 Filing 9 SERVICE by Publication filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Served by publication in an official government internet site (www.forfeiture.gov) as to Legal Notice on date(s) February 10, 2022 through March 11, 2022. (KLAUER, LYNNE)
March 9, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Expedited Settlement Agreement - Chrysler Capital)(KLAUER, LYNNE)
March 9, 2022 Filing 7 Treasury Return of Service for Verified Complaint of Forfeiture, Warrant for Arrest, and Legal Notice served on defendant property 2021 Jeep Grand Cherokee, VIN 1C4RJFAG6MC839058 on February 17, 2022, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (KLAUER, LYNNE)
February 23, 2022 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE NON-PARTY on February 18, 2022 via certified mail with Verified Complaint of Forfeiture, Warrant for Arrest, and Legal Notice as to Chrysler Capital (KLAUER, LYNNE)
February 23, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Settlement Agreement - Katelyn Mouzon and Jacob Younts)(KLAUER, LYNNE)
February 23, 2022 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE NON-PARTY on February 14, 2022 via certified mail with Verified Complaint of Forfeiture, Warrant for Arrest, and Legal Notice as to Katelyn Mouzon and Jacob Younts (KLAUER, LYNNE)
February 4, 2022 Filing 3 WARRANT FOR ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM Signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 2/4/2022 to arrest/release property (2 certified copies to U.S. Attorney). (Carter, Alexus)
February 2, 2022 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Carter, Alexus)
January 31, 2022 Filing 2 Application for Warrant for Arrest (), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(KLAUER, LYNNE)
January 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture against 2021 JEEP GRAND CHEROKEE, VIN 1C4RJFAG6MC839058 (Filing fee.), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration)(KLAUER, LYNNE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. 2021 JEEP GRAND CHEROKEE, VIN 1C4RJFAG6MC839058
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: LYNNE P. KLAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2021 JEEP GRAND CHEROKEE, VIN 1C4RJFAG6MC839058
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?