PEREGRINE et al v. MID ATLANTIC ROOFING SYSTEMS, INC.
Plaintiff: LEAH PEREGRINE and KELLY LAMBERTY
Defendant: MID ATLANTIC ROOFING SYSTEMS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00088
Filed: February 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2022 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MID ATLANTIC ROOFING SYSTEMS, INC., #12 Brief filed by KELLY LAMBERTY. Replies due by 4/8/2022 (HARLOW, NOEL)
March 17, 2022 Filing 12 BRIEF re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (BLANKENSHIP, MITCHELL)
March 17, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by MID ATLANTIC ROOFING SYSTEMS, INC.. Response to Motion due by 4/7/2022 (BLANKENSHIP, MITCHELL)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR on 3/10/2022; that Defendant's partial motion to dismiss, (Doc. #7 ), is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Carter, Alexus)
March 8, 2022 Filing 9 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant MID ATLANTIC ROOFING SYSTEMS, INC., filed by LEAH PEREGRINE, KELLY LAMBERTY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Peregrine Job Offer from Mid Atlantic)(HARLOW, NOEL)
February 23, 2022 Filing 8 BRIEF re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (BLANKENSHIP, MITCHELL)
February 23, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by MID ATLANTIC ROOFING SYSTEMS, INC.. Response to Motion due by 3/16/2022 (BLANKENSHIP, MITCHELL)
February 3, 2022 Filing 6 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of summons and complaint by counsel on behalf of Mid Atlantic Roofing Systems, Inc. on 2/3/2022. (BLANKENSHIP, MITCHELL)
February 2, 2022 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Carter, Alexus)
February 1, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney NOEL HARLOW on behalf of Plaintiffs KELLY LAMBERTY, LEAH PEREGRINE (HARLOW, NOEL)
February 1, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney CHRISTOPHER R. BAGLEY on behalf of Plaintiffs KELLY LAMBERTY, LEAH PEREGRINE (BAGLEY, CHRISTOPHER)
February 1, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Carter, Alexus)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to MID ATLANTIC ROOFING SYSTEMS, INC. (Carter, Alexus)
February 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MID ATLANTIC ROOFING SYSTEMS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3226335.), filed by LEAH PEREGRINE, KELLY LAMBERTY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Peregrine Offer Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(HARLOW, NOEL) (Attachment 2 replaced on 2/1/2022) (Carter, Alexus).
February 1, 2022 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Carter, Alexus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PEREGRINE et al v. MID ATLANTIC ROOFING SYSTEMS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEAH PEREGRINE
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER R. BAGLEY
Represented By: NOEL HARLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELLY LAMBERTY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER R. BAGLEY
Represented By: NOEL HARLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MID ATLANTIC ROOFING SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: MITCHELL H. BLANKENSHIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?