TURNER v. AYISI et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT TURNER
Defendant: M. AYISI and CAPTAIN JOHNSON
Case Number: 1:2022cv00092
Filed: January 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED regarding #3 RECOMMENDED RULING - MAGISTRATE JUDGE to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES (Winchester, Robin)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OBJECTION TO RECOMMENDED RULING - MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #3 Recommended Ruling - Magistrate Judge. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Sheets, Jamie)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Right to Consent. U.S. Marshal shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent form)(Taylor, Abby)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to M. AYISI. (Copy of Complaint, Order, Summons delivered to U.S. Marshal for service) (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back)(Taylor, Abby)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Mailing Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 3/31/2022. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 4/4/2022. (Taylor, Abby)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 03/17/2022, that in forma pauperis status be granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. FURTHER that Plaintiff's trust officer shall be directed to pay to the Clerk of this Court 20% of all deposits to his account starting with the month of April of 2022, and thereafter each time that the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the $350.00 filing fee has been paid. FURTHER that the Clerk shall send Plaintiff a summons for Defendant Ayisi. FURTHER that the United States Marshal, upon return of the properly completed summons shall serve the Complaint on Defendant Ayisi. RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's individual capacity claim against Defendant Ayisi be allowed to proceed but that his official capacity claim against Defendant Ayisi and his claims against Defendant Johnson be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. (Taylor, Abby)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #1 Motion for Application to Proceed IFP. Signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 03/17/2022. See #3 ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Taylor, Abby)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Butler, Carol)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED for Screening (Butler, Carol)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ROBERT TURNER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back)(Butler, Carol)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by ROBERT TURNER. (Butler, Carol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TURNER v. AYISI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. AYISI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPTAIN JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?