COOK v. SCHMIDT et al
Plaintiff: ALLISON COOK
Defendant: JUSTIN JUICE SCHMIDT, MISS JANICE and MR. JAMES
Case Number: 1:2022cv00116
Filed: February 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Mailing Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 3/30/2022. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 4/4/2022. (Carter, Alexus)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 3/16/2022; that Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket Entry #1 ) is GRANTED for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. IT IS RECOMMENDED that the Complaint be dismissed without prejudice. (Carter, Alexus)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 3/16/2022. (Carter, Alexus)
February 11, 2022 Motions Referred to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER RE: #1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP. (Carter, Alexus)
February 11, 2022 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Carter, Alexus)
February 10, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Carter, Alexus)
February 10, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ALLISON COOK. (Carter, Alexus)
February 10, 2022 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by ALLISON COOK. (Carter, Alexus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COOK v. SCHMIDT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLISON COOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUSTIN JUICE SCHMIDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MISS JANICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. JAMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?