CHAPMAN v. TASTY HUT, LLC et al.
Plaintiff: RACHELLE CHAPMAN
Defendant: TASTY HUT, LLC, TASTY HUT OF NC, LLC, TH PROPCO, LLC and DOES 1 TO 25
Case Number: 1:2022cv00208
Filed: March 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney BENJAMIN SWEET on behalf of Plaintiff RACHELLE CHAPMAN ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3278455.) (SWEET, BENJAMIN)
April 14, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney JORDAN PORTER on behalf of Plaintiff RACHELLE CHAPMAN ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3278442.) (PORTER, JORDAN)
April 12, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney MATTHEW R. KORN on behalf of Defendants TASTY HUT OF NC, LLC, TASTY HUT, LLC, TH PROPCO, LLC ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3276964.) (KORN, MATTHEW)
April 12, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant TH PROPCO, LLC. (WOOTEN, VIRGINIA)
April 12, 2022 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant TASTY HUT, LLC. (WOOTEN, VIRGINIA)
April 12, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant TASTY HUT OF NC, LLC. (WOOTEN, VIRGINIA)
April 12, 2022 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by TASTY HUT OF NC, LLC, TASTY HUT, LLC, TH PROPCO, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WOOTEN, VIRGINIA)
April 12, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to TH PROPCO, LLC served on 3/31/2022, answer due 4/21/2022. (LITWAK, NANCY)
April 12, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to TASTY HUT, LLC served on 3/31/2022, answer due 4/21/2022. (LITWAK, NANCY)
April 12, 2022 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to TASTY HUT OF NC, LLC served on 3/31/2022, answer due 4/21/2022. (LITWAK, NANCY)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. TASTY HUT OF NC, LLC, TASTY HUT, LLC, TH PROPCO, LLC Answer due by 5/21/2022. Signed by Keah Marsh on behalf of John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 4/12/2022. (Marsh, Keah)
March 18, 2022 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Carter, Alexus)
March 17, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Carter, Alexus)
March 17, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to TASTY HUT, LLC, TASTY HUT OF NC, LLC, TH PROPCO, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons - TASTY HUT OF NC, LLC, #2 Summons - TH PROPCO, LLC) (Carter, Alexus)
March 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3260183.), filed by Rachelle Chapman.(LITWAK, NANCY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHAPMAN v. TASTY HUT, LLC et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RACHELLE CHAPMAN
Represented By: NANCY S. LITWAK
Represented By: BENJAMIN SWEET
Represented By: JORDAN PORTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TASTY HUT, LLC
Represented By: MATTHEW R. KORN
Represented By: VIRGINIA M WOOTEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TASTY HUT OF NC, LLC
Represented By: MATTHEW R. KORN
Represented By: VIRGINIA M WOOTEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TH PROPCO, LLC
Represented By: MATTHEW R. KORN
Represented By: VIRGINIA M WOOTEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 TO 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?