NEWMAN v. DURHAM HOUSING AUTHORITY
Plaintiff: barbara newman
Defendant: DURHAM HOUSING AUTHORITY
Case Number: 1:2022cv00242
Filed: March 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BARBARA NEWMAN. DURHAM HOUSING AUTHORITY waiver sent on 3/25/2022, answer due 5/24/2022. (ANGEL, KIRK)
March 29, 2022 Filing 3 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES.(Winchester, Robin)
March 28, 2022 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Carter, Alexus)
March 28, 2022 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Carter, Alexus)
March 25, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Durham Housing Authority on 3/25/2022 by barbara newman. Waiver of Service due by 4/25/2022. (ANGEL, KIRK)
March 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DURHAM HOUSING AUTHORITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3266399.), filed by barbara newman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit EEOC CHARGE, #3 Exhibit NRTS)(ANGEL, KIRK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEWMAN v. DURHAM HOUSING AUTHORITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: barbara newman
Represented By: KIRK J. ANGEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DURHAM HOUSING AUTHORITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?