WISEMAN v. BOB EVANS RESTAURANTS, LLC
Plaintiff: LESLIE WISEMAN
Defendant: BOB EVANS RESTAURANTS, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00337
Filed: May 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2022 MEDIATION SCHEDULING ORDER; Selection of Mediator due by 7/19/2022. Mediation due by 2/17/2023. (Bond, Melisa)
June 23, 2022 Filing 9 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by BOB EVANS RESTAURANTS, LLC.(PASLEY, DAVID)
June 23, 2022 Motions Referred: RE: #9 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Garrett, Kim)
June 23, 2022 TEXT ORDER adopting #9 Joint Rule 26(f) Report. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 06/23/2022. (AULD, L.)
June 23, 2022 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery shall be placed on a case management track designated in LR 26.1(a) as: Complex. The parties ask that any required mediation occur between the close of discovery and trial. Plaintiff's Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2022. Defendant's Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2022. Discovery due by 2/17/2023. Joinder of Parties for Plaintiff due by 8/1/2022. Joinder of Parties for Defendant due by 8/1/2022. The parties do not agree to refer the case to a Magistrate Judge. Trial of the action is expected to take approximately 3-5 days. A jury trial has been demanded. (Taylor, Abby)
May 11, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 6/27/2022 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim)
May 10, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by BOB EVANS RESTAURANTS, LLC. (PASLEY, DAVID)
May 5, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Carter, Alexus)
May 5, 2022 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Carter, Alexus)
May 3, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to BOB EVANS RESTAURANTS, LLC. (Originally filed in Durham County Superior Court, Case Number 22-CVS-1585, issued 2/14/2022, and listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal.) (Carter, Alexus)
May 3, 2022 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against BOB EVANS RESTAURANTS, LLC, filed by LESLIE WISEMAN. (Originally filed in Durham County Superior Court, Case Number 22-CVS-1585, and listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal.) (Carter, Alexus)
May 3, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ZEBULON D. ANDERSON on behalf of Defendant BOB EVANS RESTAURANTS, LLC (ANDERSON, ZEBULON)
May 3, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant BOB EVANS RESTAURANTS, LLC. (PASLEY, DAVID)
May 3, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against LESLIE WISEMAN ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3290443.), filed by BOB EVANS RESTAURANTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of State Court, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of John Carothers, #4 Exhibit D - Settlement email, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(PASLEY, DAVID)
May 3, 2022 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Carter, Alexus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WISEMAN v. BOB EVANS RESTAURANTS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LESLIE WISEMAN
Represented By: ALEXANDER C. KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOB EVANS RESTAURANTS, LLC
Represented By: ZEBULON D. ANDERSON
Represented By: DAVID A. PASLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?