MURRAY v. HILTON GRAND VACATIONS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: CLAUDIA MURRAY
Defendant: HILTON GRAND VACATIONS, INC., HILTON GRAND VACATIONS COMPANY, LLC, DIAMOND RESORTS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. and DIAMOND RESORTS U.S. COLLECTION DEVELOPMENT, LLC
Consolidated 3Rd Party Defendant: DIAMOND RESORTS U.S. COLLECTION MEMBERS ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 1:2022cv00366
Filed: May 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2023 Filing 17 REPORT re #16 Status Report Parties Written Report as to Status of Arbitration Process by Plaintiff CLAUDIA MURRAY. (RUST, KEVIN)
April 4, 2023 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT Parties Written Report as to Status of Arbitration Process by CLAUDIA MURRAY. (RUST, KEVIN)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR on 12/15/2022, that the parties' Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration, (Doc. #14 ), is GRANTED, and the parties shall arbitrate this dispute in accordance with the terms of the arbitration agreement. FURTHER that this action is STAYED untilarbitration has been completed in accordance with the parties' agreement.FURTHER that on or before April 1, 2023, and every ninety days thereafter, the parties shall submit a written report and inform the court of the status of the arbitration process. FURTHER that Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, (Doc. #9 ), is DENIED without prejudice as moot. Depending on the outcome of arbitration proceedings, Defendants may then choose to re- file their motion to dismiss Plaintiff's complaint for consideration on the merits.(Taylor, Abby)
August 31, 2022 Motions Submitted to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR., re: #9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and #14 JOINT MOTION to Compel Arbitration. (Daniel, J)
June 9, 2022 Filing 14 JOINT MOTION to Compel Arbitration by CLAUDIA MURRAY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RUST, KEVIN)
June 2, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney JEFFREY A BACKMAN on behalf of Defendants DIAMOND RESORTS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., DIAMOND RESORTS U.S. COLLECTION DEVELOPMENT, LLC, HILTON GRAND VACATIONS COMPANY, LLC, HILTON GRAND VACATIONS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3311226.) (BACKMAN, JEFFREY)
May 27, 2022 Filing 12 Suggestion of Subsequently Decided Authority re #10 Brief, #9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants DIAMOND RESORTS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., DIAMOND RESORTS U.S. COLLECTION DEVELOPMENT, LLC, HILTON GRAND VACATIONS COMPANY, LLC, HILTON GRAND VACATIONS, INC., Consol Third Party Defendant DIAMOND RESORTS U.S. COLLECTION MEMBERS ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(TAUB, ROY)
May 19, 2022 Filing 11 DECLARATION filed by Defendants DIAMOND RESORTS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., DIAMOND RESORTS U.S. COLLECTION DEVELOPMENT, LLC, HILTON GRAND VACATIONS COMPANY, LLC, HILTON GRAND VACATIONS, INC., Consol Third Party Defendant DIAMOND RESORTS U.S. COLLECTION MEMBERS ASSOCIATION re #10 Brief, #9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Declaration of Brad Harris filed by DIAMOND RESORTS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., DIAMOND RESORTS U.S. COLLECTION DEVELOPMENT, LLC, DIAMOND RESORTS U.S. COLLECTION MEMBERS ASSOCIATION, HILTON GRAND VACATIONS COMPANY, LLC, HILTON GRAND VACATIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(CHARLOT, RONALD)
May 19, 2022 Filing 10 BRIEF re #9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . (CHARLOT, RONALD)
May 19, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by DIAMOND RESORTS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., DIAMOND RESORTS U.S. COLLECTION DEVELOPMENT, LLC, DIAMOND RESORTS U.S. COLLECTION MEMBERS ASSOCIATION, HILTON GRAND VACATIONS COMPANY, LLC, HILTON GRAND VACATIONS, INC.. Response to Motion due by 6/9/2022 (CHARLOT, RONALD)
May 18, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney ROY TAUB on behalf of Defendants DIAMOND RESORTS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., DIAMOND RESORTS U.S. COLLECTION DEVELOPMENT, LLC, HILTON GRAND VACATIONS COMPANY, LLC, HILTON GRAND VACATIONS, INC., Consol Third Party Defendant DIAMOND RESORTS U.S. COLLECTION MEMBERS ASSOCIATION ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3300817.) (TAUB, ROY)
May 13, 2022 Filing 7 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Carter, Alexus)
May 13, 2022 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Carter, Alexus)
May 12, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to HILTON GRAND VACATIONS COMPANY, LLC., DIAMOND RESORTS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., DIAMOND RESORTS U.S. COLLECTION MEMBERS ASSOCIATION. (Originally filed in Guilford County Superior Court, Case Number 22-CVS-4256, and issued 4/7/2022.) (Attachments: #1 Summons - DIAMOND RESORTS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., #2 Summons - DIAMOND RESORTS U.S. COLLECTION DEVELOPMENT, LLC)(Carter, Alexus)
May 12, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by DIAMOND RESORTS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., DIAMOND RESORTS U.S. COLLECTION DEVELOPMENT, LLC, DIAMOND RESORTS U.S. COLLECTION MEMBERS ASSOCIATION, HILTON GRAND VACATIONS COMPANY, LLC, HILTON GRAND VACATIONS, INC. re #1 Petition for Removal, Defendants' Notice of Filing Summons (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(CHARLOT, RONALD)
May 12, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants DIAMOND RESORTS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., DIAMOND RESORTS U.S. COLLECTION DEVELOPMENT, LLC, HILTON GRAND VACATIONS COMPANY, LLC, HILTON GRAND VACATIONS, INC., Hilton Resorts Corporation, Hilton Resorts Corporation, Hilton Resorts Corporation, Hilton Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts Finance Holding Company, Diamond Resorts Finance Holding Company, Diamond Resorts Finance Holding Company, Diamond Resorts Finance Holding Company, Diamond Resorts Developer and Sales Holding Company, Diamond Resorts Developer and Sales Holding Company, Diamond Resorts Developer and Sales Holding Company, Diamond Resorts Developer and Sales Holding Company, Consol Third Party Defendants DIAMOND RESORTS U.S. COLLECTION MEMBERS ASSOCIATION, Hilton Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts Finance Holding Company, Diamond Resorts Developer and Sales Holding Company identifying Corporate Parent Hilton Resorts Corporation, Corporate Parent Diamond Resorts Finance Holding Company, Corporate Parent Diamond Resorts Developer and Sales Holding Company for DIAMOND RESORTS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., DIAMOND RESORTS U.S. COLLECTION DEVELOPMENT, LLC, DIAMOND RESORTS U.S. COLLECTION MEMBERS ASSOCIATION, HILTON GRAND VACATIONS COMPANY, LLC, HILTON GRAND VACATIONS, INC... (CHARLOT, RONALD)
May 12, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to HILTON GRAND VACATIONS, INC. (Originally filed in Guilford County Superior Court, Case Number 22-CVS-4256, issued 4/7/2022, and listed as Exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal.) (Carter, Alexus)
May 12, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by CLAUDIA MURRAY. (Originally filed in Guilford County Superior Court, Case Number 22-CVS-4256, and listed as Exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal.) (Carter, Alexus)
May 12, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against CLAUDIA MURRAY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3297165.), filed by DIAMOND RESORTS U.S. COLLECTION DEVELOPMENT, LLC, DIAMOND RESORTS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., HILTON GRAND VACATIONS COMPANY, LLC, HILTON GRAND VACATIONS, INC., DIAMOND RESORTS U.S. COLLECTION MEMBERS ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(CHARLOT, RONALD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MURRAY v. HILTON GRAND VACATIONS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLAUDIA MURRAY
Represented By: KEVIN A. RUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HILTON GRAND VACATIONS, INC.
Represented By: RONALD A. CHARLOT
Represented By: JEFFREY A BACKMAN
Represented By: ROY TAUB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HILTON GRAND VACATIONS COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: RONALD A. CHARLOT
Represented By: JEFFREY A BACKMAN
Represented By: ROY TAUB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIAMOND RESORTS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: RONALD A. CHARLOT
Represented By: JEFFREY A BACKMAN
Represented By: ROY TAUB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIAMOND RESORTS U.S. COLLECTION DEVELOPMENT, LLC
Represented By: RONALD A. CHARLOT
Represented By: JEFFREY A BACKMAN
Represented By: ROY TAUB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated 3rd party defendant: DIAMOND RESORTS U.S. COLLECTION MEMBERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: RONALD A. CHARLOT
Represented By: ROY TAUB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?