GREENE v. RBC, INC.
Plaintiff: CHARLES GREENE
Defendant: RBC, INC.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00486
Filed: June 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12112 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2022 Filing 8 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES.(Winchester, Robin)
August 9, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney JAMES W. WIMBERLY on behalf of Defendant RBC, INC. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3355752.) (WIMBERLY, JAMES)
August 9, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney JAMES W. WIMBERLY on behalf of Defendant RBC, INC. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3355699.) (WIMBERLY, JAMES)
August 8, 2022 Filing 5 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by RBC, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(LASINE, ANDREW)
August 8, 2022 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by RBC, INC. Answer due 9/9/2022. Signed by Gloria L. Powell on 8/8/2022 on behalf of John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court.
July 27, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by RBC, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(LASINE, ANDREW)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for RBC, INC. Answer due by 8/10/2022. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 7/27/2022. (Brubaker, John)
June 29, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Carter, Alexus)
June 29, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to RBC, INC.. (Carter, Alexus)
June 29, 2022 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Carter, Alexus)
June 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RBC, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3327275.), filed by CHARLES GREENE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(FONG, WILSON)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREENE v. RBC, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES GREENE
Represented By: WILSON F. FONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC, INC.
Represented By: ANDREW SAMPSON LASINE
Represented By: JAMES W. WIMBERLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?