UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CURRENCY $12,604.00 IN U.S.
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: CURRENCY $12,604.00 IN U.S.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00563
Filed: July 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2022 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE NON-PARTY on August 18, 2022 via certified mail with the Verified Complaint of Forfeiture, Warrant for Arrest, and Legal Notice as to Corian Dye (STRUP, NATHAN)
August 16, 2022 Filing 4 USMS Return Executed for Verified Complaint of Forfeiture, Warrant for Arrest, and Legal Notice served on defendant property $12,604.00 in U.S. Currency on August 11, 2022, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (STRUP, NATHAN)
July 25, 2022 Filing 3 WARRANT FOR ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 7/25/2022 to arrest/release property. (2 certified copies to U.S. Attorney) (Carter, Alexus)
July 21, 2022 CASE REFERRED to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD RE: #2 Application for Warrant for Arrest. (Carter, Alexus)
July 21, 2022 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Carter, Alexus)
July 20, 2022 Filing 2 Application for Warrant for Arrest (), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(STRUP, NATHAN)
July 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture against CURRENCY $12,604.00 IN U.S. (Filing fee.), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration)(STRUP, NATHAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CURRENCY $12,604.00 IN U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: NATHAN L. STRUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CURRENCY $12,604.00 IN U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?